All American Semiconductor, Inc. v. Hynix Semiconductor, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: All American Semiconductor, Inc., Jaco Electronics, Inc., Edge Electronics, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc. and Unisys Corporation
Defendant: Elpida Memory (USA), Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc., Winbond Electronics Corporation America, Nanya Technology Corporation USA, Winbond Electronics Corporation, Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., Nanya Technology Corporation, Mosel Vitelic, Inc., Mosel Vitelic Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric and Electronics USA, Inc., Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Infineon Technologies AG, Micron Technology, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd and Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
3rd Party Plaintiff: Dram Claims Liquidation Trust
Case Number: 3:2007cv01200
Filed: February 28, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2012 391 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/24/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
December 12, 2011 389 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CANCEL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 388 Stipulation filed by All American Semiconductor, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/12/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
October 7, 2011 387 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO POSTPONE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 386 Stipulation filed by All American Semiconductor, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/7/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
September 9, 2011 384 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO POSTPONE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/9/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
July 22, 2011 382 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO POSTPONE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 381 Stipulation filed by All American Semiconductor, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/22/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 15, 2011 380 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC. AND MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR re 379 Stipulation filed by All American Semiconductor, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/15/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 377 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO POSTPONE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2011 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/15/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
October 20, 2010 375 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO POSTPONE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (374 in 4:07-cv-01200-PJH),(407 in 4:07-cv-01212-PJH) and (456 in 4:07-cv-01381-PJH) Stipulation filed by Micron Semiconductor Products Inc., Micron Technology Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/20/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
July 12, 2010 369 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERERENCE IN ALL CASES Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/12/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
May 28, 2010 365 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (397 in 4:07-cv-01212-PJH) Stipulation filed by Micron Technology, Inc., (364 in 4:07-cv-01200-PJH) Stipulation filed by Micron Technology, Inc., (446 in 4:07-cv-01381-PJH) Stipulation filed by Micron Technology Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/28/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
April 21, 2010 363 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO NEC ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AND NEC ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC re 362 Stipulation filed by All American Semiconductor, Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/21/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
January 25, 2010 359 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (390 in 4:07-cv-01212-PJH) Stipulation, filed by NEC Electronics Corporation, JACO Electronics, Inc, Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc. Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/25/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 19, 2010 356 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to a dismissal of this action as to defendants Hynix Semiconductor Inc. and Hynix Semiconductor America Inc. without prejudice pursuant to a settlement agreement negotiated by the Parties and that the Court should reserve jurisd iction to enforce the terms of that settlement agreement. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees re 355 Stipulation filed by All American Semiconductor, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
December 10, 2009 353 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG AND INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP. re 352 Stipulation, filed by All American Semiconductor, Inc., Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/10/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
April 30, 2009 349 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS ELPIDA MEMORY, INC. AND ELPIDA MEMORY (USA) re 348 Stipulation filed by Elpida Memory (USA), Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc., Elpida Memory (USA), Inc. and Elpida Memory, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/30/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
February 5, 2009 340 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying (331) Application for Order to Show Causein case 3:07-cv-01200-PJH; denying (316) Application for Order to Show Cause in case 3:07-cv-01207-PJH; denying (343) Application for Order to Show Cause in case 3:07-cv-01212-PJH (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
December 18, 2008 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 265 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All American Semiconductor, Inc. v. Hynix Semiconductor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elpida Memory (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Isabelle Anne Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elpida Memory, Inc.
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winbond Electronics Corporation America
Represented By: William S Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanya Technology Corporation USA
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winbond Electronics Corporation
Represented By: Steven H. Morrissett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F\rederick Tubach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hynix Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Lee Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanya Technology Corporation
Represented By: E. Anne Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosel Vitelic, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosel Vitelic Corporation
Represented By: William M. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric and Electronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infineon Technologies North America Corporation
Represented By: Joshua Stewart Stambaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infineon Technologies AG
Represented By: Joshua Stewart Stambaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Steven Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Steven Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Electronics Corporation
Represented By: NEC Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All American Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaco Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: David Daniel Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edge Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: David Daniel Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Represented By: David Daniel Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unisys Corporation
Represented By: David Daniel Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Dram Claims Liquidation Trust
Represented By: James J. Ficenec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?