JACO Electronics, Inc v. Hynix Semiconductor, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: JACO Electronics, Inc, Sun Microsystems, Inc., Unisys Corporation, Edge Electronics, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd.
Defendant: Elpida Memory (USA), Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc., Winbond Electronic Corp. America, Winbond Electronics Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation USA, Nanya Technology Corporation, Mosel Vitelic Corporation, Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc., Mosel Vitelic, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric and Electronics USA, Inc., Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Micron Technology, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc. and NEC Electronics Corporation
3rd Party Plaintiff: Dram Claims Liquidation Trust
Case Number: 3:2007cv01212
Filed: February 28, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2010 396 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO NEC ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AND NEC ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. re 395 Stipulation filed by JACO Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/3/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
January 6, 2010 388 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG AND INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP. re 387 Stipulation, filed by JACO Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/5/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
December 11, 2009 386 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 384 Stipulation filed by JACO Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/11/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
October 5, 2009 373 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE re 372 Stipulation filed by JACO Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/5/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
August 11, 2009 369 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 366 Stipulation filed by JACO Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/11/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 4, 2009 364 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION AND NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION USA re 362 Stipulation filed by JACO Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/4/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
March 24, 2009 357 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS ELPIDA MEMORY, INC. AND ELPIDA MEMORY (USA) re 356 Stipulation, filed by Elpida Memory (USA), Inc., Elpida Memory, Inc., Elpida Memory (USA), Inc. and Elpida Memory, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/24/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
December 18, 2008 341 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 273 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACO Electronics, Inc v. Hynix Semiconductor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elpida Memory (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Isabelle Anne Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elpida Memory, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Benedict Salvaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winbond Electronic Corp. America
Represented By: Steven H. Morrissett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winbond Electronics Corporation
Represented By: William S Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanya Technology Corporation USA
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanya Technology Corporation
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosel Vitelic Corporation
Represented By: Andrea P. DeShazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hynix Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F\rederick Tubach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F\rederick Tubach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosel Vitelic, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric and Electronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infineon Technologies AG
Represented By: Joshua Stewart Stambaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infineon Technologies North America Corporation
Represented By: Joshua Stewart Stambaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Steven Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Steven Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACO Electronics, Inc
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa C. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unisys Corporation
Represented By: Theresa C. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edge Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa C. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Dram Claims Liquidation Trust
Represented By: James J. Ficenec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?