United States of America v. Gaw et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and All Plaintiffs
Defendant: Steve Gaw, Robert M. Clayton, III, Southwestern Bell Telephone, L.P., SBC Advanced Solutions, Inc., SBC Long Distance, LLC, AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc., TCG St. Louis Holdings, Inc. and TCG Kansas City, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv01242
Filed: March 2, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R Walker
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2009 Filing 25 JUDGMENT : IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Court's order of June 3, 2009, Judgment is hereby entered in this action in favor of the United States. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting United States' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6-3-2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
May 7, 2009 Filing 23 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. PROCEEDINGS:1. United States' Motion for Summary Judgment in State cases,doc no 536 in C06-1791.2. AT&T's motion to dismiss Application to Compel, doc no 22 in C07-1187. 3. The court heard argument from counsel.4. The court submitted the matters, the court to issue written ruling. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/7/2009)
April 9, 2009 Filing 22 Statement of Non-Opposition to the United States' Motion for Summary Judgment, Dkt. 536 filed byAT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc.. (Axelbaum, Marc) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
March 3, 2009 Set Schedule/Time for Hearing: Opposition to the United States' motion for summary judgment in the State Cases - 3/20/2009. United States Replies in support or its motion and Telecomm carrier defendants Respond to the govt's motion and any Responses thereto - 4/9/2009. Sur-reply of the State Officials - 4/23/2009. Hearing on the United States' Motion set for 5/7/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing : YOU ARE NOTIFIED THAT the Court has rescheduled the hearing on the United States Motion for Summary Judgment on the telecommunication carrier cases listed above for April 1, 2009 at 10:30 A.M. Please report to Courtroom 6, on the 17th floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California. Parties requesting a continuance shall submit a stipulation and proposed order. If parties are unable to reach a stipulation, the requesting party shall submit an exparte application with a proposed order. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
November 6, 2008 Filing 20 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-12-2008, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2009. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
March 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REVISED PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER re (370 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Order filed September 10, 2007 signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3-24-08. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
December 14, 2007 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc. re: Statement of Counsel for AT&T, Cingular and BellSouth in Response to the Courts Interim Order on Preservation of Documents (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 Filing 17 NOTICE by AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc. of Manual Filing Notification (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 Filing 16 NOTICE by United States of America of Manual Filing (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting #14 . The captions in C07-1187 and C07-1242 shall be amended by deleting the following named party: Steve Gaw, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the Missouri Public Service Commission. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 11, 2007 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption filed by Robert M. Clayton, III. (Whipple, Peggy) (Filed on 12/11/2007)
November 2, 2007 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed byAll Plaintiffs'. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 11/2/2007)
October 25, 2007 Filing 12 NOTICE by United States of America re #11 Memorandum in Opposition,, of Lodging of Classified Supplement & accompanying Declaration (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 10/25/2007)
October 25, 2007 Filing 11 Memorandum in Opposition re #7 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence, #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Coppolino Declaration & Exhibits Thereto)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 10/25/2007)
October 3, 2007 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed by All Plaintiffs'. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 10/3/2007)
September 21, 2007 Filing 9 Proposed Order [Proposed] Interim Order to Preserve Evidence by All Plaintiffs'. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
September 21, 2007 Filing 8 Declaration of Cindy A. Cohn in Support of #7 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed byAll Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/21/2007) Modified on 10/1/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2007 Filing 7 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence; Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Order to Preserve Evidence filed by All Plaintiffs'. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
June 23, 2007 Filing 6 Appendix re Memorandum in Opposition to Verizon's Motion to Dismiss Master Complaint filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tabs 4-12#2 Exhibit Tabs 13-20)(Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 6/23/2007).
June 23, 2007 Filing 5 Memorandum in Opposition re (273 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Master Consolidated Complaint filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 6/23/2007)
June 22, 2007 Filing 4 Declaration of Candace J. Morey in Support of (315 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment by the United States filed byDennis P. Riordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Z#2 Exhibit AA-II#3 Exhibit JJ-KK)(Morey, Candace) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 22, 2007 Filing 3 Memorandum in Opposition re (253 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on State Secrets Grounds filed byDennis P. Riordan. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 21, 2007 Filing 2 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker which relates to State Defendants motion to dismiss and AT&T's motion to dismiss in C07-1187 (Clayton), C07-1242 (Gaw), C07-1323 (Maine PUC), C07-1324 (O'Donnell), C07-1326 (Palermino), C07-1396 (Volz). The court submitted the matter, court to issue written ruling. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2007)
March 2, 2007 Filing 1 Case transferred in from the Eastern District of Missouri; Case Number 4:06cv1132. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.. Filed byUnited States of America. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Cindy Ann Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Gaw
Represented By: Peggy Ann Whipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Clayton, III
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Heitz
Represented By: Peggy Ann Whipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Bell Telephone, L.P.
Represented By: Amanda J. Hettinger
Represented By: John F. Medler, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon B. Rosenberg
Represented By: Stephen B. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBC Advanced Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda J. Hettinger
Represented By: John F. Medler, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon B. Rosenberg
Represented By: Stephen B. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBC Long Distance, LLC
Represented By: Amanda J. Hettinger
Represented By: John F. Medler, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon B. Rosenberg
Represented By: Stephen B. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Communications of the Southwest, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda J. Hettinger
Represented By: John F. Medler, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon B. Rosenberg
Represented By: Stephen B. Higgins
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCG St. Louis Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda J. Hettinger
Represented By: John F. Medler, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon B. Rosenberg
Represented By: Stephen B. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCG Kansas City, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda J. Hettinger
Represented By: John F. Medler, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon B. Rosenberg
Represented By: Stephen B. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?