Vernon v. City of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Wayne Kevin Vernon
Defendant: G. Perez, City of San Francisco and Heather Fong
Case Number: 3:2007cv01286
Filed: March 6, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Fees and Costs (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
December 23, 2008 112 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA MANDATE re 94 Notice of Appeal filed by Wayne Kevin Vernon. Appellant has failed to comply with the court's order filed 11/21/08. Court records do not reflect that appellant has paid the docketing fee. Accordingly, this appeal is dismissed. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 17, 2008 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re plaintiff's request to withdraw. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008) Modified on 12/18/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2008 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to file partially unde seal a mtn to withdraw as counsel and to stay entry of judgment on motion for fees and costs re 107 Stipulation, filed by Wayne Kevin Vernon. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/11/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
September 25, 2008 83 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 24, 2008 74 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
February 8, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Settlement Conference Rescheduled for 2/26/2008 10:30 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 2/8/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vernon v. City of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Perez
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Francisco
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fong
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Kevin Vernon
Represented By: Juan Enrique Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?