Financial Technology Partners LP v. FNX Limited et al

Plaintiff: Financial Technology Partners LP
Defendant: FNX Limited and Farid Naib
Case Number: 3:2007cv01298
Filed: March 6, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2010 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' BILL OF COSTS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/7/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
December 10, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Parties to File Authority Regarding the Prevailing Party. Signed by Judge Jeffery S. White on December 10, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
November 13, 2009 171 Opinion or Order of the Court Second Amended Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 13, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 12, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 12, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
October 2, 2009 158 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 2, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 1, 2009 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 25, 2009 152 Opinion or Order of the Court Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 25, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
July 21, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 132 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Prejudgment Interest Brief. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson for Jeffrey S. White on 7/21/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009) Modified on 7/21/2009 (jjo, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/8/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 6, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court Court's Proposed Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 6, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 2, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/2/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 30, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 30, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
February 24, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 52 Motion for Jury Trial. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 12, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 57 Letter filed by FNX Limited, Farid Naib. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/12/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
January 21, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/21/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
December 17, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Dates. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 16, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
October 8, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 45 Stipulation CHANGING HEARING DATE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/8/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 3, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 43 Stipulation to Extend the Time Within Which to Complete Court-Connected Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/3/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
March 22, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING8 Stipulation MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/22/07. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2007)
March 14, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 6 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/14/07. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Financial Technology Partners LP v. FNX Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNX Limited
Represented By: Dan Christopher Burdett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farid Naib
Represented By: H. Joseph Escher, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Technology Partners LP
Represented By: Matthew Gordon Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?