Jackson v. Horel

Petitioner: Joseph Jackson
Respondent: Robert A. Horel
Case Number: 3:2007cv01334
Filed: March 7, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
May 28, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
March 31, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Horel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert A. Horel
Represented By: Denise Alayne Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?