Baxter Healthcare Corporation et al v. Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Baxter Healthcare Corporation and Deka Products Limited Partnership
Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc. and Fresenius USA Inc.
Counter-claimant: Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc. and Fresenius USA Inc.
Counter-defendant: Baxter Healthcare Corporation and Deka Products Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2007cv01359
Filed: March 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 511 Motion for review of clerk's taxation of costs (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 502 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 504 Motion for New Trial (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER re 501 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/15/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 497 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF REMOVAL OF LIBERTY CYCLER FUNCTIONALITY RELATING TO, AND DISMISSAL OF U.S. PATENTS NO. 6,929,751 AND 7,083,719 re 496 Letter filed by Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/13/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 495 FINDINGS RE INVALIDITY OF CLAIM 12 OF THE '547 PATENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/6/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER to Pay Additional Attendance Fee. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/3/2010. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 465 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,324,422 WITH PREJUDICE re 454 Stipulation, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Fresenius USA Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/2/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/28/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/22/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 427 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/1/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 425 TRIAL RULES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/28/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 399 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Removal of Liberty Cycler Functionality Relating to, and Dismissal of, U.S. Patent No. 5,431,626 398 Stipulation, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Fresenius USA Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/18/2010. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 332 Motion to Strike ; denying 332 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 306 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (and deferring ruling in part) 309 Motion for Summary Judgment (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 349 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Revise Remaining Case Dates Through Trial re 347 Stipulation filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Fresenius USA Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/13/2009. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/26/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 304 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF REMOVAL OF LIBERTY CYCLER FUNCTIONALITY RELATING TO AND DISMISSAL OF U.S. PATENTS NO. 5,438,510; 6,503,062; AND 6,808,369 re 303 Letter filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Fresenius USA Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/28/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/30/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTATIONS TO INTERROGATORY NO. 5 re 278 Statement, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Fresenius USA Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/2/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 296 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET CASE DATES THROUGH TRIAL re 295 Stipulation, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Fresenius USA Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partn ership. Willfulness Discovery due by 4/15/2009. Disclosure of Experts due by 4/24/2009. Rebuttal due by 6/5/2009. Expert Discovery due by 7/2/2009. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 9/2/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 6/28/2010 08:30 AM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/30/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 283 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion to Compel the Production of "Foreign Associate" Documents re 224 Statement, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Fresenius USA Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/3/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/10/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER (Granting) re 242 Statement filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Fresenius USA Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/13/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER re 239 Stipulation, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA,Fresenius USA Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/12/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 234 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY COUNTS VIII AND IX OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 233 Stipulation, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Fresenius USA Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/18/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER DENYING FRESENIUS MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE re 222 Statement, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Fresenius USA Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/15/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL re 220 Statement, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Fresenius USA Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/12/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER re 216 Statement, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Fresenius USA Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/11/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER re 209 Brief, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Fresenius USA Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/21/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL REVIEW AND PRODUCTION OF BAXTER'S STEVEN AND STEVEN DOCUMENTS re 205 Brief, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Fresenius USA Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/19/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 202 Motion to File Documents Under Seal (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING AND HEARING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STAY PATENTS AND DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION TO STAY PATENTS re 198 Stipulation,, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Fresenius USA Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/21/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER re 176 Brief, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Fresenius USA Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/10/078. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 191 FIRST AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET CASE DATES OCCURRING BETWEEN THE MARKMAN HEARING AND TRIAL re 190 Stipulation, filed by Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc., Baxter International Inc., Baxter Healthcare SA, Fresenius USA Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Deka Products Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/3/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxter Healthcare Corporation et al v. Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baxter Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Zaug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deka Products Limited Partnership
Represented By: Maureen Katherine Toohey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Limin Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius USA Inc.
Represented By: Limin Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Fresenius Medical Care Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Juanita R. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Fresenius USA Inc.
Represented By: Juanita R. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Baxter Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Robert G Krupka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Deka Products Limited Partnership
Represented By: Howard Alan Slavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?