Villa v. Rowe et al
Plaintiff: John Daniel Villa, Jr.
Defendant: Claire Williams, Linda Rowe, Jennifer Swiney, Bhawna Jain, Vicki Fowler, Auguste Reallon, Shirley Keys, Joseph Kravitz, Maureen McLean and R. Snyder
Case Number: 3:2007cv01436
Filed: March 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REVIEW OF CLERK'S TAXATION OF COSTS by Hon. William Alsup denying 276 Motion for Taxation of Costs. Costs taxed in the amount of $ $5,360.25.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 263 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 5, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 FINAL CHARGE TO THE JURY. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 24, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 257 SECOND NOTICE OF COURT'S PROPOSED CHARGE TO THE JURY AND SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 23, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE OF COURT'S PROPOSED CHARGE TO THE JURY AND SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 22, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER TO JURY COMMISSIONER to furnish daily refreshments for members of the jury. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER REGARDING OBJECTION TO TRIAL SUBPOENA FOR DEFENSE EXPERT DR. WATKINS AND OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S CALLING DR. WATKINS AS WITNESS IN PLAINTIFF'S CASE IN CHIEF. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 15, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE CONFIRMING TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 10, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup entered 228 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE REGARDING UPCOMING TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 27, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE re 221 Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time To Set Hearing On Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum filed by John Daniel Villa, Jr.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 26, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER ON MOTION TO AMEND PRETRIAL ORDER AND REQUEST TO REPLACE TRIAL EXHIBIT NO. 33 by Hon. William Alsup granting 205 Motion to Amend/Correct ;.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE SHOWN AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE re 213 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Bhawna Jain, Linda Rowe, 214 Reply to Opposition/Response,, filed by Jennifer Swiney. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 19, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND VACATING HEARING Show Cause Response due by 12/14/2011.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 9, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO UNITED STATES MARSHAL PERMITTING USE OF EQUIPMENT AT TRIAL re 209 Notice (Other) filed by John Daniel Villa, Jr.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 8, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE re 203 Order, 204 Notice (Other) filed by John Daniel Villa, Jr.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 21, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 QUESTION FROM COURT (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER POSTPONING TRIAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/12/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER ISSUING WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 12, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE REGARDING TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 5, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION TO ALLOW TESTIMONY BY VIDEO-TELECONFERENCING. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 20, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Alsup terminating 102 Motion in Limine; terminating 103 Motion in Limine; terminating 105 Motion in Limine; terminating 106 Motion in Limine; terminating 107 Motion in Limine; terminating 108 Mot ion in Limine; terminating 109 Motion in Limine; terminating 110 Motion in Limine; terminating 114 Motion in Limine; terminating 115 Motion in Limine; terminating 117 Motion in Limine; terminating 120 Motion in Limine; terminating 121 Motion in Limine; terminating 122 Motion in Limine; terminating 123 Motion in Limine (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER REGARDING SETTING TRIAL DATE GIVEN LOGISTICS OF PLAINTIFF'S PAROLE HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 6, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 22, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 24, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE Jury Selection set for 7/18/2011 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 7/18/2011 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Pretrial Conference set for 7/5/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 12, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLETE DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 7, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 23, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 6, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER LIFTING STAY, ORDER REFERRING CASE to ADR Unit for Early Neutral Evaluation. Discovery due by 1/31/2011. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2011 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 3/3/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/5/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY 22 UNTIL ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/16/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villa v. Rowe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Swiney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhawna Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auguste Reallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Keys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Daniel Villa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?