Fordjour v. Washington Mutual Bank et al

Plaintiff: Charles A. Fordjour
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, FA and Washington Mutual
Case Number: 3:2007cv01446
Filed: March 13, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Washington Mutual, Washington Mutual Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, FA against Charles A. Fordjour. 1. Plaintiffs motion to vacate the arbitration award is hereby DENIED.2. Defendants petition to confirm the arbitration award is hereby GRANTED.3. The above-titled action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
March 5, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 51 , 52 , 55 , AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR TRANSPORTATION TO ARBITRATION HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 5, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
November 23, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 57 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE; VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 23, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
February 9, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 40 , 41 , 43 , 46 PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO REOPEN ACTION, TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TRANSPORTATION TO ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS, TO JOIN ADDITIONAL PARTIES AND FILE SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADINGS; GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS TO FILE STATUS REPORT ON ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 9, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fordjour v. Washington Mutual Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Fordjour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Represented By: Michael Bruce Tannatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, FA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?