WRI Golden State, LLC v. Save Mart Supermarkets

Plaintiff: WRI Golden State, LLC
Defendant: Save Mart Supermarkets
Mediator: Stewart H. Foreman
Counter-claimant: Save Mart Supermarkets
Counter-defendant: WRI Golden State, LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv01480
Filed: March 14, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2008 171 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William W Schwarzer on November 14, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
September 22, 2008 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45. Signed by Judge William W Schwarzer on September 22, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
February 8, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME RE PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION OF PERSON(S) MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR RITE AID CORPORATION. The time for plaintiff to take and complete the deposition of the person(s) most knowledgeable for Rite Aid Corporation is extended to February 29, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 8, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 6, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING EXPERT DISCOVERY. The deadline to disclose experts is continued to February 15, 2008. The deadline to disclose rebuttal experts is continued to February 29, 2008. The expert discovery cutoff is continued to March 21, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRI Golden State, LLC v. Save Mart Supermarkets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WRI Golden State, LLC
Represented By: John D. Fairbrook, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Save Mart Supermarkets
Represented By: Gregory Paul O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Stewart H. Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Save Mart Supermarkets
Represented By: Gregory Paul O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: WRI Golden State, LLC
Represented By: John D. Fairbrook, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?