Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc. v. L'oreal USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc.
Defendant: L'oreal USA, Inc. and L'oreal S.A.
Mediator: Michael Traynor
Case Number: 3:2007cv01669
Filed: March 22, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE IN SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 7, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
March 25, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. The parties are directed to file, no later than April 3, 2009, a copy of their settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 25, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
January 20, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER (The pretrial instructions attached to the initial Pretrial Preparation Order remain in effect).. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/20/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 7, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties shall appear for a Case Management Conference on January 16, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than January 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 7, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 11, 2008 117 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER CONTINUING Settlement Conference to 4/2/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/11/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
October 22, 2008 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. The dates provided in the Court's Pre-Trial Preparation Order are extended as follows. Jury Trial: July 6, 2009. Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff: January 23, 2009. Designation of Experts: No later than February 13, 2009, with rebuttal no later than February 27, 2009. Expert Discovery Cutoff: March 20, 2009. Filing of Dispositive Motions: No later than April 3, 2009. Pretrial Conference: June 23, 2009. Meet and Confer: No later than May 18, 2009. Further Status Conference: April 3, 2009. Further Status Conference Statement due: March 27, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
February 6, 2008 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART STIPULATED REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND FOR ORDER MODIFYING PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. The hearing date for L'Oreal S.A.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction is continued to May 2, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc. v. L'oreal USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P. Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'oreal USA, Inc.
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'oreal S.A.
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Michael Traynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?