Glover v. Salinas Valley State Prison

Plaintiff: Bobby Gene Glover, Jr.
Defendant: Salinas Valley State Prison
Case Number: 3:2007cv01759
Filed: March 28, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING DISPOSITIVE MOTION(S). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/6/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
January 14, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND PARTCIALLY GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/14/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
October 26, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE; DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE THAT SUCH MOTION IS NOT WARRANTED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/26/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Salinas Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Gene Glover, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salinas Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?