Ingles v. Menu Foods, Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Sherry Ingles
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund and Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv01809
Filed: March 30, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2007 Featured Case Sent by CERTIFIED MAIL a certified copy of 18 Transfer Order and a certified copy of the civil docket along with the entire original contents of the civil case file to the United States District Court of Newark, New Jersey. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 7/25/2007)
July 25, 2007 18 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court Newark, New Jersey. IN RE PET FOOD PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. DOCKET NO. 1850. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 7/25/07. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 7/25/2007)
June 29, 2007 17 Featured Case NOTICE by Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation of Multidistrict Consolidation Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. S 1407 and Request to Maintain Stay (Lubinski, Carrie) (Filed on 6/29/2007)
June 21, 2007 16 Featured Case NOTICE by Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation of Pendency of Other Actions and Proceedings and Notice of Transfer Order (Lubinski, Carrie) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 6, 2007 15 Featured Case Certificate of Interested Entities [Civil Local Rule 3-16] (Boone, Mordecai) (Filed on 6/6/2007)
May 18, 2007 14 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Maxine M. Chesney granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of attorney Michael P. Turiello. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2007)
May 18, 2007 13 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Maxine M. Chesney granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of attorney Edward B. Ruff, III. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2007)
May 18, 2007 12 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Maxine M. Chesney granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of attorney Priya K. Jesani. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2007)
May 16, 2007 8 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER staying all proceedings pending decision by MDL Panel on motions to transfer, and for preservation of evidence. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/16/2007. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2007)
May 15, 2007 11 Featured Case MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney Priya K. Jesani appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611006380.) filed by Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 5/15/2007)
May 15, 2007 10 Featured Case MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney Michael P. Turiello to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611006380.) filed by Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 5/15/2007)
May 15, 2007 9 Featured Case MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney Edward B. Ruff, III to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611006380.) filed by Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 5/15/2007)
May 15, 2007 7 Featured Case STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Staying All Proceedings and for Preservation of Evidence by Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation. (Lubinski, Carrie) (Filed on 5/15/2007)
May 9, 2007 6 Featured Case NOTICE by Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation of Petition to and Hearing Before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Lubinski, Carrie) (Filed on 5/9/2007)
April 26, 2007 5 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER extending to May 24, 2007 defendants' deadline to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/26/2007. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 24, 2007 4 Featured Case STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT by Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Sherry Ingles, Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation. (Boone, Mordecai) (Filed on 4/24/2007)
April 20, 2007 3 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherry Ingles. Menu Foods South Dakota Inc served on 4/4/2007, answer due 4/24/2007; Menu Foods, Inc served on 4/4/2007, answer due 4/24/2007; Menu Foods Income Fund served on 4/3/2007, answer due 4/23/2007; Menu Foods Midwest Corporation served on 4/4/2007, answer due 4/24/2007. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/20/2007)
March 30, 2007 Featured Case CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/30/2007)
March 30, 2007 2 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2007. Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2007 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/30/07. (Attachments: # 1 MMC Standing Order# 2 Standing Order)(aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/30/2007)
March 30, 2007 Featured Case Summons Issued as to Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/30/2007)
March 30, 2007 1 Featured Case CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Menu Foods South Dakota Inc, Menu Foods, Inc, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350.00,receipt number 34611004682.). Filed bySherry Ingles. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/30/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2007 (aaa, Court Staff).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingles v. Menu Foods, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc
Represented By: Mordecai D. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods South Dakota Inc
Represented By: Carrie Ann Lubinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: Carrie Ann Lubinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Represented By: Carrie Ann Lubinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Ingles
Represented By: James L. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?