Board of Trustees of the Sign, Pictorial & Display Industry Welfare & Pension Trust Funds et al v. Event Productions Inc.

Plaintiff: Mike Hardeman and Board of Trustees of the Sign, Pictorial & Display Industry Welfare & Pension Trust Funds
Defendant: Event Productions Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv01816
Filed: March 30, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor Event Productions, Inc., in the amount of $33,406.51 (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
March 6, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF EXAMINATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/6/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
January 20, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 53 Proposed Order of Examination filed by Board of Trustees of the Sign, Pictorial & Display Industry Welfare & Pension Trust Funds, Mike Hardeman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/20/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
October 29, 2008 48 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor Event Productions Inc. Denis Egan in the amount of $33,406.51; re 46 Order & 47 Judgment (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 10/29/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Sign, Pictorial & Display Industry Welfare & Pension Trust Funds et al v. Event Productions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Hardeman
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Sign, Pictorial & Display Industry Welfare & Pension Trust Funds
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Event Productions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?