Midjan v. Chan et al
Plaintiff: Indarwati Midjan
Defendant: Carmen Chan and Paul M. Leung
Mediator: Gail Killefer
Case Number: 3:2007cv01977
Filed: April 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO DISMISS LAWSUIT IN ITS ENTIRITY WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/16/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety (90) days, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel, that the agree d consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THEREON. The Case Management and Pretrial Order is modified, as follows: the non-expert discovery cutoff is May 19, 2010; the deadline to designate experts is May 25, 2010; the deadline to designate rebuttal experts is Jun e 8, 2010; the expert discovery cutoff is June 29, 2010; the deadline to file dispositive motions is July 13, 2010; the Pretrial Conference is October 26, 2010, and the Trial Date is November 8, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 25, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/10/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/10/07. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2007)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midjan v. Chan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indarwati Midjan
Represented By: William F. Alderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Chan
Represented By: Michael George Wah Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Leung
Represented By: Michael George Wah Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Gail Killefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?