Perez v. Rumi Construction et al

Plaintiff: Jose Edgar Perez
Defendant: Amana Engineering and Construction Inc., Rumi Construction, Janet Fayzbakhsh, Frayar Ghazanfari, A. Nasser Jandali and American Contractors Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2007cv02039
Filed: April 10, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2008 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/17/2008. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY re 53 Stipulation filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company, American Contractors Indemnity Company terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/17/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
October 7, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Settlement Conference set for 11/19/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/7/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Rumi Construction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amana Engineering and Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rumi Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Fayzbakhsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frayar Ghazanfari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Nasser Jandali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Edgar Perez
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?