Kanbar et al v. Kaufman

Plaintiff: Maurice Kanbar and Kanbar Spirits, Inc.
Defendant: Henry Kaufman
Case Number: 3:2007cv02123
Filed: April 17, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting leave to file motion to modify protective order. Motion to be filed not later than 7/26/10. Response to be filed not later than 8/2/10. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
January 14, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING to 2/19/2009 at 2:30 P.M. re [doc #109] Stipulation filed by Henry Kaufman, Kanbar Spirits, Inc., Maurice Kanbar. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/14/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 12, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re [Doc #103] granting defendant leave to file motion for sanctions pursuant to Civ LR 7-8(d). (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009) Modified on 1/12/2009 (cgk, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2008 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Walker on 11/13/2008. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
February 6, 2008 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER granting continuance of the discovery hearing from 2/7/2008 to 2/14/2008 at 2:30 PM re 55 filed by Henry Kaufman. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/6/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kanbar et al v. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Kanbar
Represented By: Michelle Lee Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kanbar Spirits, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Lee Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Kaufman
Represented By: Teresa McLoughlin Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?