Mediostream Inc. v. Priddis Music Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Mediostream, Inc. alleged that it had entered into an agreement with defendant Priddis Music, Inc. under which defendant purported to grant plaintiff a non-exclusive right to encode, host, integrate and make available tracks for plaintiff\'s online karaoke business. Plaintiff further alleged that defendant Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. subsequently contacted plaintiff, asserted that plaintiff had infringed upon its copyrights, and indicated that defendant Priddis Music had no rights to transfer to plaintiff.

Plaintiff: Mediostream Inc.
Defendant: Cotillion Music Inc., Dayspring Music LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Walden Music Inc., Warner/Tamerlane Publishing Corp., WB Music Corp., Priddis Music Inc., Warner/Chappell Music Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., Wordspring Music LLC and Word Music LLC
Counter-claimant: Priddis Music Inc.
Counter-defendant: Mediostream Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv02127
Filed: April 17, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2007 21
CLERK'S LETTER dated 9/25/07 to the U.S.D.C. Middle District of Tennessee re transfer of case. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2007)
September 24, 2007 20 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 12 Motion to Transfer Case (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2007)
September 13, 2007 19 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE SEPTEMBER 27, 2007 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 17 Motion to Continue (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2007)
August 28, 2007 16
Memorandum in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Stay PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OR ALTERNATIVELY, TRANSFER OR STAY ACTION filed byMediostream Inc.. (Schmid, Frear) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 10, 2007 15
Renotice motion hearing re 12 Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay Amended Complaint filed by Chappell & Co. Inc., Cotillion Music Inc., Dayspring Music LLC, Rightsong Music Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Walden Music Inc., Warner/Tamerlane Publishing Corp., WB Music Corp., Word Music LLC, Wordspring Music LLC, Warner/Chappell Music Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Mayer, Marc) (Filed on 8/10/2007) Modified on 8/13/2007 (far, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2007 11 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE JULY 26, 2007 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 7 Stipulation,, filed by Dayspring Music LLC, Warner/Chappell Music Inc., Warner/Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Wordspring Music LLC, Cotillion Music Inc., Walden Music Inc., Chappell & Co. Inc., WB Music Corp., Unichappell Music Inc., Rightsong Music Inc., Word Music LLC. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2007 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/23/07. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
May 14, 2007 5
CLERK'S NOTICE re: Amended Complaint (doc 4); Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2007)
April 18, 2007 3
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 17, 2007 2
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2007. Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2007 02:30 PM. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mediostream Inc. v. Priddis Music Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cotillion Music Inc.
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayspring Music LLC
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rightsong Music Inc.
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unichappell Music Inc.
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walden Music Inc.
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner/Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WB Music Corp.
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priddis Music Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Ralph Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner/Chappell Music Inc.
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chappell & Co. Inc.
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wordspring Music LLC
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Word Music LLC
Represented By: Marc E. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Priddis Music Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Ralph Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mediostream Inc.
Represented By: Frear Stephen Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Mediostream Inc.
Represented By: Frear Stephen Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?