Ledesma v. Ayers

Petitioner: Fermin Ledesma
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Case Number: 3:2007cv02130
Filed: April 17, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO HOLD FEDERAL HABEAS PROCEEDINGS IN ABEYANCE AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 24 Motion to Stay. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
February 8, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/8/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
May 1, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND STAY OF EXECUTION by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Deferring Request to Stay. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledesma v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fermin Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?