Garcia v. Coleman et al

Plaintiff: Roland E. Garcia
Defendant: David Coleman, Ann Coleman and Amerivine, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv02279
Filed: April 26, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 113 Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or for a New Trial; and Denying as Moot 114 Defendants' Motion to Stay Execution. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
January 23, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JURY INSTRUCTION NO. 28. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 22, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS (All Jury Instructions, Nos. 1-49). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 20, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Nos. 1-20 given to counsel 1/16/2009). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009).
January 9, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 69 Defendants' Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 74 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1; and denying without prejudice 75 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
January 8, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING JURY COMMISSIONER TO FURNISH DAILY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/8/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
December 8, 2008 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Jury Trial reset for 1/16/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/8/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
October 20, 2008 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 Stipulation filed by Amerivine, Inc., David Coleman. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/20/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
September 8, 2008 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 46 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Coleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland E. Garcia
Represented By: John Bernard Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Coleman
Represented By: Alicia Marie Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Coleman
Represented By: Alicia Marie Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerivine, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Marie Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?