Eap v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Charlie Eap
Defendant: United States of America and Daniel Earl Sperl
Case Number: 3:2007cv02301
Filed: April 27, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2010 401 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal with prejduice.(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
February 10, 2010 378 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving compromise settlement (case to remain open pending hearing on minors compromise hearing). Signed by Judge Illston on 2/10/10. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
November 12, 2009 373 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 2/5/10 @ 3 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
October 20, 2009 371 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the case management to Thursday, November 12, 2009 at 3 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
July 9, 2009 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SPOILATION MOTION (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
April 15, 2009 214 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER appointing Special Master. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
April 8, 2009 207 Opinion or Order of the Court TWELFTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/8/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 2, 2009 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ELEVENTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/1/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 31, 2009 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing special master. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/27/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 6, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part 148 Motion for Protective Order (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 5, 2009 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/5/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 12, 2009 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 153 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/12/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
February 4, 2009 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 124 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
January 27, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/4/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 2/17/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/27/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 26, 2009 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 145 Letter filed by United States of America, 144 Letter filed by Susan Wyckoff. Unless Judge Illston orders otherwise, plaintiff's any spoliation motion is due 4/1/09. Defendants' opposition is due 4/17/09. Plaintiff's reply is due 4/24/09. A hearing is set for 5/20/09 at 10:00 a.m., beofer Magistrate Judge Zimmerman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/26/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009) Modified on 1/27/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2009 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Telephonic Discovery Conference for January 23, 2009 at 10:00a.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/21/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 14, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing trial to 9/14/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/13/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 12, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court EIGHTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/12/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
December 15, 2008 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 53 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
November 24, 2008 112 Opinion or Order of the Court SEVENTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/24/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 6, 2008 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/6/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
October 30, 2008 99 Opinion or Order of the Court SIXTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/30/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 20, 2008 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting continuation of hearing (96 in 3:07-cv-03600-SI) Letter, filed by Susan Wyckoff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/20/08. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 14, 2008 87 Opinion or Order of the Court FOURTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/14/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 3, 2008 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Telephonic Discovery Conference for 10/10/08 at 9:00a.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/3/08. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
September 2, 2008 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eap v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Eap
Represented By: Joseph R. Igelmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Earl Sperl
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?