Waisbein v. UBS Financial Services Inc.

Plaintiff: David Waisbein
Defendant: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv02328
Filed: April 30, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2008 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RE: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND COURT SUPERVISION OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 19, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
November 18, 2008 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUPPLEMENT STIPULATED REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. The parties are directed to file, no later than December 12, 2008, a joint supplemental brief to address the issue of whether the amount of attorney's fees proposed is fair and reasonable; alternatively, plaintiff may file a unilateral supplemental brief. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
October 31, 2008 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. The parties are directed to file in the public record, no later than November 7, 2008, redacted versions of the documents. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 31, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
September 29, 2008 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFORDING PARTIES OPPORTUNITY TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATED REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. The Court affords the parties the opportunity to file, no later than October 17, 2008, a joint supplemental brief. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 29, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
February 7, 2008 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE; SETTING HEARING. The reference to Judge Nielsen is withdrawn. Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery and defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment are set for hearing on March 7, 2008, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 7, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
February 1, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE. Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery and defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment are referred to the Honorable Wm. Fremming Nielsen. The parties will be advised of th e date, time and place of the hearing on said motions by notice from Judge Nielsen's chambers. The February 15, 2008 hearing on defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery and the February 22, 2008 hearing on defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings are vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waisbein v. UBS Financial Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Dodge Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Waisbein
Represented By: Marc Primo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?