Wixon et al v. Wyndham Resort Development Corp., et al
Plaintiff: Clarke Wixon, Rebecca Wixon, Barbara Wixon, Kandice Scattolon and Norman Wixon
Defendant: Trendwest Resorts, Inc., John Henley, Wyndham Resort Development Corp., Gene Hensley, John McConnell, David Herrick and Peggy Fry
Special Master: Edward M. Swanson and Edward W. Swanson
Not Classified By Court: Gregory Miller and Zoe Smith-Fallgren
Interested Party: Cornerstone Research, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv02361
Filed: May 1, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Referring Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2013 Filing 1377 STATUS REPORT Final Joint Report Regarding The Settlement Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation by Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Loeffler, Alan) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
April 26, 2012 Filing 1376 Letter dated 4/23/2012 from Estela Untalan. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
November 8, 2011 Filing 1375 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 8, 2011 Filing 1374 MANDATE of USCA as to #1352 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory Miller, Zoe Smith-Fallgren (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
October 17, 2011 Filing 1373 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 3, 2010, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christine A. Triska, Telephone number (650)743-8425; christinetriska@sbcglobal.net. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2012. (cat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1372 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying #1355 Motion for Leave to File and denying as moot #1370 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Opposition. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 3, 2011 Filing 1371 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on December 3, 2010 and August 5, 2011 before Judge Jeffrey S. White, re #1367 USCA Case Number Transcript due by 10/31/2011. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 26, 2011 Filing 1370 Brief in Opposition to Objector-Appellants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 Filing 1369 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition Supplement filed byGregory Miller, Zoe Smith-Fallgren. (Willett, Stephan) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 1368 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Motion for Leave to take Depositions of Objector-Appellants filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 1367 USCA Case Number 11-17163 9th Circuit for #1352 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory Miller, Zoe Smith-Fallgren. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 22, 2011 Opt Out Letter from Chris and Michelle Jung (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 21, 2011 Filing 1366 REPLY (re #1355 MOTION for Leave to File to take Depositions of Objector-Appellants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 27(b) ) filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 19, 2011 Received Document OPT-Out Letter from John and Sandra Story. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 Filing 1365 RESPONSE (re #1355 MOTION for Leave to File to take Depositions of Objector-Appellants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 27(b) ) filed byGregory Miller, Zoe Smith-Fallgren. (Willett, Stephan) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1364 ORDER SHORTENING TIME by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting #1358 Motion to Shorten Time (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 13, 2011 Filing 1362 RESPONSE (re #1358 MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Objector-Appellants ) filed byGregory Miller, Zoe Smith-Fallgren. (Willett, Stephan) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 1363 Opt-Out Letter from Linda S. Austin. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1361 ORDER OF REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge ZIMMERMAN for Motion to Take Depositions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 1360 Proposed Order re #1358 MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Objector-Appellants by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 1359 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine in Support of #1358 MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Objector-Appellants filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #1358 ) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 1358 MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Objector-Appellants filed by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 1357 Proposed Order re #1355 MOTION for Leave to File to take Depositions of Objector-Appellants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 27(b) by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 1356 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine in Support of #1355 MOTION for Leave to File to take Depositions of Objector-Appellants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 27(b) filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #1355 ) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 1355 MOTION for Leave to File to take Depositions of Objector-Appellants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 27(b) filed by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 7, 2011 Appeal Filing fee: $ 455.00, receipt number 34611064378. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 1354 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #1352 Amended Notice of Appeal (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 1353 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #1352 Notice of Appeal (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 1, 2011 Filing 1352 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Gregory Miller, Zoe Smith-Fallgren Notice of Appeal. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 10/3/2011. (Willett, Stephan) (Filed on 9/1/2011) Modified on 9/2/2011 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2011 Filing 1351 Opt-Out Letter from: Nicholas and Brittany Vago. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 19, 2011 Filing 1350 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 5, 2011, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2011. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 9, 2011 Filing 1349 Opt-Out Letter dated 8/7/2011 from Stacy Wise and Lachelle Wise. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 9, 2011 Filing 1346 Letter dated from Daniel Van and Vanessa Van. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011) (hdj, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2011 Filing 1348 Opt-Out Letters from: Claudia and Steve Leatham, and Wendell James Westfall. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 8, 2011 Filing 1345 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 8, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1344 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING #695 Motion for Settlement; GRANTING IN PART #696 Motion for Attorney Fees. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 5, 2011 Filing 1342 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. Amendment to #1337 Proposed Order, to Exhibit A to the (Third Proposed) Final Class Action Settlement Approval Order and Judgment. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 5, 2011 Filing 1341 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/5/2011 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 8/5/2011). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/5/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 1343 Opt-Out Letters from: Gary Kjensrud & Ann Kjensrud and Laura Escobar. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 1337 Proposed Order re #695 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 1336 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine re Opt-Out List Attached as Appendix A to the (Third Proposed) Final Class Action Settlement Approval Order and Judgment filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1335 ORDER DENYING #1152 Request for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 3, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 1, 2011 Filing 1334 Brief Response filed byGregory Miller, Zoe Smith-Fallgren. (Willett, Stephan) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 29, 2011 Filing 1340 OPT-OUT Letter from Jed and Amber Caredio. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 1339 OPT-OUT Letters from Walter Wilson Jr., Brian Losie and Peggy Losie, John and Adele Aguilar. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 1330 Declaration of Clarke Wixon in Support of #1329 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #1329 ) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 1329 RESPONSE to re #1326 Declaration in Opposition by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 1326 DECLARATION of Stephan Willett filed byGregory Miller, Zoe Smith-Fallgren. (Willett, Stephan) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 1325 STIPULATION and Proposed Order regarding August 5, 2011 Final Settlement Approval Hearing by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 1338 OPT-OUT Letters from: Robin and Jennifer Shrodes, Robert and Wanda Harmison, Marcia Burciaga, Thomas Chase, Jeffrey and Julie Tatley, Shawn Holmes, Jacob and Cathy Tsui, James and Christina Hoover, Tina Hendrickson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 1322 ERRATA re #1313 Reply to Opposition/Response, #1314 Declaration in Support, of Elizabeth C. Pritzker by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 1316 REPLY (re #696 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses ) filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 1315 Proposed Order re #695 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 1314 Declaration of Elizabeth C. Pritzker in Support of #1313 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Q, #2 Exhibit R-U, #3 Exhibit V-Y)(Related document(s) #1313 ) (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 1313 REPLY (re #695 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation ) filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 1311 RESPONSE to re #983 Objection by Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Loeffler, Alan) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 1310 Declaration of Charles A. Bott in Support of the Proposed Settlement filed byWyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Bott Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Bott Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to Bott Declaration, #4 Errata 4 to Bott Declaration)(Loeffler, Alan) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 21, 2011 Filing 1333 OPT-OUT Letter (postmarked 7/11/2011 or later) from: Daean and Claudia Halver, Marlene and David Fitzsimmons, Christopher A. Mejia, Monty and Crystal Johnson, Steven and Linda Schadler, Mel Profit and Gail Hunt, Richard and Margaret Louise Kenny, George W. Johnson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 1332 OPT-OUT Letter (postmarked by 7/19/2011 or earlier) from: Cynthia K. Harris, Daniel J. Willems Sr., Susumu Seiki and Tsuyako Sue Seiki, Deborah Pettitt, Prosenjit Mukherjee,. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 1331 OPT-OUT Letter (postmarked before 7/12 or earlier) from: P. Abrescy Icasiano, Gary and Rosemarie Herrero, Donald Barry McKenzie and Jentie G. McKenzie, Gerald R. and Gail C. Delorme, Reese and Angelika Rae. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 18, 2011 Filing 1328 OPT-OUT Letter Clint and Terri Mayeur, Dapeng Fan and Zhi Qian, Olga Kodasevich and Jacob Sherman, David and Tiphanie Schiff, Austin H Wright and Mona M. Wright, Wallace Darrol Houser, Jr., Nancy R. Alderman, Wei Ming Pang and Teng Hoon Chua, Edie Hills, Patrick A. Smith and Dorothy V. Smith, Dennis and Rose McIlroy, Carol Livingston and David Awalt, Michael T. Watson and Joan K. Watson, John Kapelac, Mervyn Ross and Anne Bassett, Charles Thomas and Roberta McGuiness, Young and Mabel Yuen, Richard and Cheryl Connelly, John R. Stenberg, Jonathan Olschewski, Fred and Eileen McCreath, Lauren and Allan Schiiler, Norma Ashley, Lidia Lucaciu, Michael and Karen Woodard, Dennis W. Nevett, Sharon Kellie Williams, Virgina L. Serr. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 18, 2011 Filing 1254 OPT-LETTER from Dana and Barry Stewart. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 1327 OPT-OUT Letter (postmarked 7/11 or earlier) Jan Willette, Dennis L. Gum, Jacob and Andrea Marshall, Geral Shannon, Julie Tupling, Wayne and Debra Watson, Cynthia M. Merry, Raul R. Pineda and Dorothy G. Pineda, Denise M. Mitchell-Honc, Joyce Uyeda, Marie Slivocka, Jerry Shannon and Jean McCulloch,Shaun and Angelina Messina-Hodson, Kathleen C. Voigt, Ruth T. Falby, Linda A. Scott, Gerard and Lynda Evoy. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 1152 DECLARATION of Stephan Willett filed byZoe Smith-Fallgren, Gregory Miller. (Willett, Stephan) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 1324 OPT-OUT Letters: (Postmarked 7/9/2011 or later) from Charles Kennedy and Elaine Kennedy, Donald Kenmuir and Janne Kenmuir, Timothy W. and Margaret W. Smith, Gregory Guy, Wilhelmina and Duane Younger, Sheila Pitts and Darin Pitts, Richard and Marlene Greenhalgh, James and Lisa Wakley, Linda A. Peters, Tony and Ruth Esteves, Oleg Litwinow and Antoinette Guillou, Rex and Wilma Parnell, Troy and Brooke Pugmire, Natalie Gauvreau, Thomas and Tawnee Holzhauer, Suzette Kimball, James L. Webb, Paul S. and Sandra B. Prekeges, Bruce and Shelly Miller, Arlene Miller. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 1323 OPT-OUT Letters: (Postmarked 7/8/11 or earlier) from Larry J. and Karen D. Petersen, Ernie and Elfrieda Block, Kewal Uppal, Ralph and Christine Cannon, Ronald Cheng and Ada Cheng, Rosemary Joy Venos and Jeff William Venos, Michael Griffin and Carolyn Griffin, Gerald and Elaine Kreutziger, Vasillios Tzetzos and Eirian Tzetzos, Daystar Gower and Armando Andrade, Larry W. Krywaniuk and Sylvia D. Krywaniuk, Doug and Helena Livingston, Linda Ambrose, Marilyn L. Marian and John B. Marian III, Michael S. Fischer and Melaney B. Fischer, John B and Cornelia E. Pisanis. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 ORDER APPROVING AS MODIFIED #1085 Stipulation re Opt-Out Letters. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 14, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 1085 STIPULATION and Proposed Order ECF/CM Posting of Class Member Opt-Out Letters Mailed to the Court by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 1298 Opt Out Letters (Postmarked 07/09/2011 or Later) from Sheila O. Amacher; David & Brenda Poersch; Rodney J. Alcala; Cristina A. Kane; Ron & Linda Miller; Maria L. & Zenia J. Quintero; William C. & Karin O. Dove; Gilbert & Heaher Carrillo; Bonnilee Ashley; Nancy & Erv Erns; Walter & Shannon Adamus; Andrew W. & Leanne D. Enns; Rick & Sandra Romano; Kats & Teresa Sunada; Keith & Pamela Cummings; Quinn L. & Rebecca R. Dunn; Karen Laing; Murray & Dr. Kathleen Reay; and, Antoinette Ackenback. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 1297 Opt Out Letters (Postmarked 07/08/2011 or Earlier) from Wayne & Alison Bird; Danilo, Sr. & Mary Lou Jimenez; Johann & Sandra Swart; Robert & Vicki Hargrove; Edmund & C. Dunella Pedersen; John D. McInnes & Christine M. Gibson; Peter & Helen Sawatzky; Robert Ketting & Jackie Crampton; Philip & Karen Kuntz; Roland Kim & Joan Vivian Zerebeski; Jim & Kristen Budd; Brian Cullingworth & Charlotte Crowley; Lorna M. Wiebe; Stuart & Charlyn McLean; James & Joanne Hanna; Paul & Moira Sarling; Kurt & Bethany Finch; Lawrence & Patricia Moxham; Pierre Desmarais & Melanie Foisy; John & Julie Barrand; Rodney & Philomine Moore; Heather South-Smith; Donald J. & Sylvia C. Everts; Wayne & Lavern Gee; Susan Morris; Bram & Gina Eigenraam; Mark E. Bright; Allan K. & Donna J. Heys; Robert & Ida Chavez; Paul A. & Judith L. Glawe; Donna Atha; Delmer & DonaJean Sayer; Robert & Constance Kempf; Carl L. & Karla R. Carnes; Ajay V. & Seema Talwar; Umesh & Daksha Lal; Norval & Karen Lipsett; Brenda McCarron & Donna Woodward; Stephen & Jacqueline Hong; Priscilla Bradley; Mark & Marla Hayden; Janet Waines & Annie Newman; Frances Woodward; Kirk & Brenda Ward; Robert Stanley Watchorn; Shari Fader; Pat & Cristin Needham; Maribel Jordan; Svetlana & Larry Wise; Laura & Philip Rathy; Robert P. & Johanna Brosseau; Carla Olson; Carolyn G. Haven; Merv & Bernice Kirk; Harold & Mary Lou England; and, Bonnie Avery. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 1293 Opt Out Letters (Postmarked 07/09/11 or Later) from Virginia L. Gordon; Pearl M. & Kathryn R. Hogan; William & Cecile Hammond; Jilene Bosman; Jan Hutton; Linda David & Lindsey Stewart; Betty Bratten; Jane Davis; Junior F. Razon; Allen & Traci Koranda; Laurie Cummings; Deborah & Kenneth Kinney; Richard & Athena Wangsgard; Terry & Phyllis Posey; Hsin-I Hsu & Ying-Mei Chen; Vicki Cates; Whitney Stalder; Abraham & Eleodora Navarrete; Shawn & Carol McCoy; Clark & Mindy Ashby; Carla J. Weaver; Curtis L. & Elsie A. Stout; Douglas & Susan Hofacker; David & Vivian Kind; Jesus A. Anaya; Lind Ngo & Van Trieu; Roland & Dena Hudson; Scott & Kerrie Engelmann; Cassandra Boyle; Floyd & Batty Hodges; Steven J. & Marie H. Olson; Curtis C. La Follette; Tonya Killam & Hollie Fallstone; Jim & Arehn McCarty; Dan W. & Gae R. Frost; Mark R. Smith & Jennifer Rutledge-Smith; Steven Strain & Virginia Hornbecker; Janis Richmond; Shelly Whitten; M. Patty Dress; Nicole M. & Blair L. Rollenhagen; Jane Chambers; Gy & Janet Pickens; L. Kent & Lynette Allen; Michael A. & Julie A. Brandt; DeEdra L. Manning; Trevor & Alisa Johnson; and, Michael & Barbara Emary. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 1282 Opt Out Letters (Postmarked 07/08/2011 or Earlier) from: Reynolds, Charles and Pam; Roberts, Kevin and Sallie; Rothenburger, Ken and Sharon; Russell, Tom and Carey; Schaezlein, Jeffrey and Maleia; Scott, Gordon; Seese, Cheryl; Siddico, Curt and Noraye; Sloan, Douglas and Barbara; Smith, Kathleen and Claude; Smith, Linda; Smith, Roger W. and Delphine K.; Spring, Phil and Bryson, Christel; Tukuafu, Semisi W. and Namahana C.; Tyson, Peter and Debby; Watkins, Derek L. and Bonny I.; Wilkerson, Nathan A. and Katherine R.; Williams, Susan Joan; Wilson, Katie and Scott. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 1280 Opt Out Letters (Postmarked 07/08/2011 or Earlier) from: McDonald, S. Joseph and Patricia Ruth; McKellar, Hugh and Agnes; Meeher, Linda and John; Melchior, Herbert R. and Hilda P.; Melton, William A. and Sherryl L.; Middleton, Travis and Pearl, Sonia; Miller, Connie and Ray; Mori, Albert and Joan; Myers, Marissa and Benny G.; Nerman, David and Judith; Nelson, Ronald Dean; Neyedli, Michael and Victoria; Novak, John J. and Ann M; Parker, Barton and Barbara; Pesce, Lawrence D. and Sandra L.; Prestwood, Cynthia A.; Rae, Alan and Ramona; Rose, Tony and Varcy; Royer, Larry and Kathie; Runtz, Susan E. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 1279 Opt Out Letters (Postmarked 07/08/2011 or Earlier) from: Kelly, David and Dorthy; Kipferling, Rolf F. and Edith M.; Kirby, Kenneth and Rosemary; Knauss, Marion and Debra; Knepprath, Vernon and Christine; Kruse, Robert and Maureen; Kuklis, John F. and Kimberly A.; Kurzmin, Lazary and Elizabeth; Lambert, J. Bary and Peggy; Leslie, John; Lewis, Sarah and Ted; Bao Qing, Li and Qin Fen, Ma; Lin, Hui-Li; Lingren, Landis L.; Loewen, Dave and Grace; Littis, William and Sandra; Luevano, Dave; Marks, Glen B. and Linda; May, Richard G. and Jean W.; Mapes, Marshall and Alana. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 1277 Opt Out Letters (Postmarked 07/08/2011 or Earlier) from: Dixon, Cheryl and William; Dockter, Kevin J. and Linda L.; Donaldson, Sharon C.; Durand, Severn; Falby, Matthew J.; Farell, Steffany; Fernandez, Marivic; Fletcher, Clifford M. Sr. and Judith K.; Friberg, Mervyn and Linda; Gauthier, Eric and Jurdikova, Janette; Grove, Sharon and Patrick; Hajduk, Raymond J. and JoAnn L.; Hansen, Lori Ann; Harper, James M. and Colleen; Harris, Todd and Heather; Heeter, Daniel W. and Marilynn L.; Tsuyuki, Bela Jahn and Rick; Janzen, Erna and Klassen, Leonard; Jaymes, Charlie and Linda; Jordan, Duane and Sherie. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 1275 Opt Out Letters (Postmarked 07/08/2011 or Earlier) from: Adair, Ronald and Barbara; Alas, Pola Holguin and Ricardo; Armstrong, Kenneth D. and Vickie L.; Arnold, Kenneth and Michele; Banta, Robert E. and Luann S.; Barrand, Margaret and Limongelli, Fulvio; Barth, James and Darci; Basener, Lawrence R. and Wanda J.; Best, Merv and Dorrie; Bills, Lane E. and Evelyn, I.; Biswas, Borendra and Beverly; Bleak, Joseph and Cheryl; Blinzler, Donald M. and Marica K.; Bray, Lyle S. and Ruth-Anne; Clarot, Patricia and Gino; Civey, James and India; Coonc, Brian and Kelly; Cooper, Joyce; Della-Siega, Gene and Sheila; Demezas, Ana V. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 1268 Opt Out Letters (Postmarked 07/08/2011 or Earlier) from John & Bara Loveland; Hemendra & Samira Naiker; Frank R. Jimenez; Randie & lemai Ohtsji; Neil & Beverley McLennan; Leslie P.F. & Janice M. Wall; Gary & Beverely Burr; Linda & Thomas Lee; Charles & Heidi Wall; George & Milena Matic; Yvonne Thomas & Mike Blais; Ruth (Rhoda) Peters & David Alaric; Andrew & Lisa Legge; Sandra & Simon Marples; James R. & Susan J. McKenna; Bradley J. Stull; Jane Lee & Judy Harder; Jim & Laura Anderson; Mary Waterman; Sean Bravo; Jo Ann Newton-Hester & Bobbi L. Mattson; Victor & Ruth Patkowski; Shenton Tan & Beatrice Leung; Robert J. & Jean Maxwell; Michael & Laurie Hollamon; Gaylen Brannon; Timothy Kibler; David & Noel Nephew; Larry I. Rank; Ghita Lippolis; Koon-Yui Poon & Syvia Hang; Sonda A. Thompson; Glen Rigby & Inga Delville-Pratt; Henry & Joan Kroeker; Peter & Monica Stewart; Timothy & Heather Thompson; Isobel & Trevor Brown; Gilbert & Jeanine Lulay; Stephen & Ruby Kibbee; Gary L. & Nancy L. Bennett; Connie Brinton & Hugh Lindsey; Susan & Robert Ogan; Hilary Jensen; Karen Lottis; Dale Scott & Chris Smysnuck; Steven Leroy & Lynn Diane Tomsha; Shirley Broadbent; Dean & Wanda Nyquist; Verne F. & Margaret E. Hutchison; Keith Jackson & Nancy John; Samuel R. & Stephanie A. (aka Sammie) Kephart; harry E. & Robert M. Coffman; Jerry & Charlene Weddle; and Doua & Deborah Heu. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 1049 Letter of Objection to Settlement from Betty G. and David A. Sugarman and the following (Attachments: #1 Lundon Bywater, #2 Stanley Jozefowicz)(rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 1048 Letter of Obejction to Settlement Agreement from James B. Hawkins. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 1045 Letter of Objections to Settlement: from Martina Murray the following (Attachments: #1 Leslie Kienholz, #2 Charles A. Stanger, #3 Marine and Frederick Cerauskis, #4 Robert B and Brenda J. Linn)(rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1321 OPT-OUT Letters: from Keith A. and Marie Royer, Jeannine Keenan, Ronald L. and Rondi L. Vinnedge, Marilyn C. and Kenneth A. Kraft, Brent and Teresa Vander Pol, Randa J. and Jocelyn K. Richardt, Adnrea I. Murphy, Colin and Mary Hardie, Denise White, Judith J. Crowley, Carolyn Freeman and Danielle Freeman-Combs, Michael Gomes and Shannon Gomes, Kevin and Melanie Crumbley, Carolyn Tsujimoto, Maurine Simpson, Jim Roberts, Donald and Shawnee Schaeffer, Byron and Trisha Harris, Terry J. Hagen, Jerry Howell, Kris Howell. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1320 OPT-OUT Letters: from John & Cindy L. Ming, Brian & Susan Harrison, Ted Whitescarver and Rebecca Whitescarver, Karen Phongluangtham, Larry E. and Bobbi Sue Gray, James L. and Linda D. Williams, Brian and Donna Routh, Abbie and Gary Gross, Robert W. and Candy J. Burroughs, Tim Newsom, LaRae and Mark Conley, Regina Pirrucello and Pat Earp, Leslie J. Rivera, Elizabeth and Raymond Kaltenbach, Caroline Bouvier and Timothy Row, Lis Sheppard, Allen Scott and Joanni Scott, Michael Lopez and Glenda Lopez, William C. and Nancy L. Bucklin, Anna Banks Simeon, Mark J. and M. Kathleen McLean. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1319 OPT-OUT Letters: from Ann Kauf, Forrest Dexter and Debra Houston, Harold & Elinor Martin, Dianne Williams, John M. and Kim C. Whittey, Drew and Sharon Wakeland, Ray and Sherrie Schwehr, Catherine Fergusson, Marlene Sereno, Hugo O. Osalla, Jr. and Yoland M. Osalla, Erin Smith and Julie Sandoval, Dawn Marie Christensen, James M. Hampton & Dulie M. Hampton, James and Helen Davis, Jose Mauricio Pleitez, Mary E. Nunn, David & Judy Ross, Gayla M. Roberts, Donald & Vicki Trafton. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1318 OPT-OUT Letters: from Ralph W. & Judith A. Liedtke, Lauren McCabe & David Avalio, Joe V. Andersen, Clarence and Cheryl O'Brien, Evelyn Price, Monica Tavcar and Rhinehart Sabado, John P. & Sheryl L, Deckard, Pamela and Carl Corey, Amadeu and Helen Picado, Lyle T. and Ann L. Roy, Alan H. Ashby and Brooke A. Ashby, David Thompson, Terrence T. Hampton and Michael G. Gatlin, Gary D. Otis, Edward L. Mattfeld & Patsy J. Mattfeld, Derek Sutton, Daniel J. & Marguerite McDevitt, Robert & Barbara Mitchell, James and Cheryl Lockard. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1317 OPT-OUT Letters: from Linda I. Jennings and Richard E. Baugh, Matthew and Laurie Schneider, Lawrence Allen Stauffer and Melanie A. Kirk-Stauffer, Marianne H. Maninang, Herman R. and Denise B. Vandermey, Cornelius H. and Joyce M. Rieske, Cathleen & Paul Chamness, Virginia Lynn Welling, Henry Montes, C. Bradley Barr & Nikki Parker-Barr, Carol Ann Sipe and Ed Haffner, Tecia Garcia, Bryan D. & Shelley D. Thies, Danette McReynolds and Joy I. Martinez, Jurgen and Ann Piehl, Gloria Rodriguez Adams, Scot Yamashita, Mary Williams, Gary McCruter & Lashanda McCruter, Janet D. Jones, Lendell Keeble & Deanna Jackson-Keeble. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1312 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Kenneth Chargin & Roberta Chargin, Richard Helmuth & Isabel Helmuth, Kelly Coonley, Robert W. Geary, Lucy A. McGowan, William F. Hedrix & Mary A. Hedrix, Kyle Koerner & Angellee Koerner, Roy J. Pancoast & Barbara Pancoast, Gary Cater & Nancy Cater, Diana Whittington, Raymond Carrier, Andrew Lampkin & Stacey Lampkin, Sherrie Bruce, Guy Rogers & Sandra Kramer, Reed Peterson & Ralonna Peterson, Leo S. Holdaway & Beth W. Holdaway, Alan J. Smith & Patricia R. Smith, Maryhelen Dowling Johnson, Bruce C. McArthur & Wanda L. McArthur, and Verlene E. Jones. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1309 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Rosemary L. Roseland, Karl B. Kreitzer & Frances E. Kreitzer, Kathleen Sommer & Daniel Sommers, Jerry Robertson & Madeleine Robertson, Virgil Mayer & Allycemae Mayer, Baha Halaby, Cliff Coler & Pamela J. Scholwin, Bob Williams & Betsy Williams, Sye Keene, Corine R. McCray, Andrew J. Miller & Arnell R. Miller, James Taylor & Lindsay Taylor, Elizabeth Wiseman & Bret Shivers, Eric Gladding & Amy Gladding, Brian T. Johnson, Harry C. McClintock, Jim Jones & Virginia Jones, Charles Hennel & Margaret Hennel, Mark Zimmerman & Sharon Zimmerman, and Sidney P. Johnson & Nadine T. Johnson.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1308 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Christopher L. & Dawn D. Peterson, Jeff & Barbara Gordon, Llewllyn & Martha S. Ligocki, Zbigniew & Katarzyna Pietrzyk, Monica Nelson (Speller), Marcia Rae Wilson, Sylvia J. Trepp, Colleen A. & Harold L. Hartman, Anthony & Carrie Johnson, Carrie Louise Brown, Louis Friedkin & Carolyn Scherr-Friedkin, George & Rhea Wallis, Robert & Teri Yeh, Donna & Randy Springer, Richard & Sharon Hopkins, James Lee Ennes & Desiree Rangel-Ennes, Lucille Phoenix, Wayne R. & Glenna J. Atwood, Karen K. & Daniel R. Bloomquist, Kristy A. Hotes (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1307 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Abraham and Arlene Enns; Judith A Bailey; Leon David and Meg (Margaret Mary) Burns; Arnold and Cherilyn Anderson; Ramiro Perez and Norma Perez; Huey McEwin and Judy McEwin; Thomas and Rachael Conner; Richard and Marilyn Keil; Martha A. Buffa; Pamela S. Glover; Dustin and Jennifer VanDyke; Mary-Ann M. Erskine-Pourier; Carlos D'Achiardi; Victor Cervantes and Julie Cervantes; Steve Maxwell and Rebecca Maxwell; Simone Haleftiras and Jeanne Kincheloe; Vici Krall and Daniel Medina Guerrero; Andre F.A. Fournier and Ella Louise Fournier; Mark K. Maki; Roger Hubbell Jr and Judith Hubbell; Thomas Kim and Joanne Kim. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1306 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Todd B. Hansen & Debbie Hansen, Sharon Joy, Brian C. Beals & Janice K. Beals, Brian Sutherland & Brenda Sutherland, Ronald F. Webb & Mary L. Webb, Robin L. McLean-Foreman & Anne V. McLean-Foreman, Morris Lorber & Sophan B. Lorber, Frans Hager & Marilyn K. Hager, Susan R. Gemeinhardt & Stanley B. Cook, John Martin De Vries & Suzanne De Vries, Russ Crossley & Rita Crossley, Joseph Mitchell & Ingrid Mitchell, David Ellis & Sheryl Ellis, William Colley, Mark J. Myers & Christina L. Myers, John Landis & Gail Landis, Kent Hynes & Lisa Hynes, Edward Schwallie & Maureen Schwallie, Joseph U. Stazzone & Christine M. Stazzone, and Nancy Kernutt & Michael Kernutt. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1305 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Lisa & Gary Knopp, Dennis & Sharon Gilbert, Michael & Catherine Saylor, Michael G. & Susan J. Mayes, Robert & Ann Lundquist, LeeAnn Schroth, Mathew & Jenny Kordell, Karna S, Town, Lynne & Stephen Storrar, Judith Chilcote, Mr. James & Yukiko Meany, Daniel & Lori Mailloux, Karen Heneghan, Robert G. & Sandra Timmer, Patricia Burkenpas, Terry L. & Karen Ann Myers, Norman W. & Jean D. Johnson, Bryon & Melissa Zirker, Roger D. & Marie A. Labelle, Verlinda & Lawrence Rathke(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1304 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Steven K. & Virginia D. Wingert, David VanLandingham, Federick Elwin Stannard I & Marian Elizabeth Stannard, Paul D. & Elizabeth H. Wiegel, Michele Kennedy & Michael Gephart, Garry G. & Ethel M. Crosser, William & Sharon Massena, James & Caroline Beeman, Richard & Cindy Rackley, Cedric & Michelle Graham, Kwan & Lo-Ying Wong, Kurt & Judith Stoffel Loewen, Glenn J. Melton, Philip & Judy Arms, Robert & Linda Cordell, Michael H. & Tracey L. Noot, Roger A. & Nan L. Harrison, James & Cecilia Adrian, Christopher L. Michler, Arden & Nitaya Davis, Wayne L. & Charlotte A. Duchow(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1303 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Sue L Wilkins and Jon D Wilkins; Deborah Gardner and Nicole Cotton; Stephen Kuester and Marjorie Kuester; Bryan and Christina Yazzie; Barbara Barnett; Martha B Watts and Robert J Watts; Boyd and Elizabeth Edman; Robert E Keating and Sydna J Keating; Lowell J Layton and Michie K Layton; Robert P Post; Carlos A Holanda; Andrea Buckley and Jon DeLuca; Wolf and Vera Neumann; Theresa M Wright; Jennifer Mansson; Lynn Cornett and Patty Cornett; Ralph M Parisi and Karyn L Parisi; Dennis R Davies and Julie D Feller; David K Swenson and Susan J Swenson; Frank and Sharon Day; Karis Vandehey; Michael and Yvette Reynolds; Lewis Scamman and C. Diane Scamman; Cory Crawford and Karen Crawford; Bruce and Gerri Ferguson; Lawrence and Betty Kettel; Wayne A. Raschke and Joyce E. S. Figueroa de Raschke; Thomas J Monahan and Mary A Monahan. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1302 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Theodore & Carolyn Wilson, Suzanne Lee-Odell, Dean M. Sultani, James B. & Kenya E. Tuttle, Paul J. & Mikel M. O'Brien, Jim & Dorothy Shiermn, Michael R. & Janice Seguin, Lloyd & Leslie Wiley, Gerald L. & Vickie J. Burroughs, Robert & Jennifer Wilkin, Cassandra T. Nguyen & Thanh S. Luong, Donald & Crystal Hunt, Leonard & Vicki Wheeler, Richard S. & Mary H. Noah, Cesar & Deanna Alaniz, Hospicio & Ofelia Belisario, Francine D. Lind-Mellard & Steven R. Mellard, Wilma M. & Rhonda L. Stevenson, Jack L. & Diana L. Barich, Samuel D. & Cheryl L. Wheeler, Dona Scandura (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1301 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Sandra and Jimmy Williams; David Haynes II and Nicole Haynes; Tina Blanding and Todd Hammer; Mychal Loving and Bethlyn L. Wright Loving; Al Krause and Ruth A. Higgins; Mary E. Hertzke and Eugene R. Hertzke; Myrna Sattler; Arne and Diane Wennerberg; David Paul Eggold and Judith Lynn Eggold; Timothy D. Seawell and Charlotte V. Seawell; Judith and David LeBlanc; Kevin and Leigh Tucker; Audrey Kunieda; Chad and Andrea Mulder; Penny Friedman; Donn R. Davis and Judith H. Davis; James and Connie Larsen; Brian and Chandra Hughes; M. Kerry Fagerberg and Kate L. Fagerberg; Glenn and Teary Wedin; Kareen M. Testa; Gene L. Geiger and Janice E. Geiger; Larry A. Layton and Trudy Layton; Ben Bunn, III and Marla Bunn; Darryl A. Mann; Daniel and Tamara Bowers; Terry Watne and Joanne Watne; Scot D. Weaver; Jim and Karen Harless. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1300 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Walter M. Wilson & Sharon L. Durbin, Karen Nelson, Carlend Griscom & David Stoltje, Joli Hansson, Lee Ann Romberger, Robert J. & Linda J. Draper, Sharon Johnson, Dallas D. & Sheila R. Durkoop, Harold & Elizabeth Horrigan, Barbara A. Toney & Shirley A. Slick, Priscilla & Stephen Bressler, Ronald & Sherlene Mendive, Stephen & Susan Herbert, Will Sadler, John W. Zurfluh, Mark W. Olson & Karla Anne Raby, Jerry & Marianne (deceased) Mulenos, Dan & Mary Whitehurst, Beth L. Quale, Russell & Judy Leonard (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1299 OPT-OUT LETTERS from John Sorensen and Valerie Sorensen; Ahmed Ghanem and Maureen Lee; Ron R Meachum and Yvonne L Meachum; Ralph and Susanne Flanagan; Mark and Kristine Russell; Brad Sheneman and Brady Sheneman; Clayne V. Raybould; Walter D Segler and Tana Y Segler; Eric Glissmeyer and Martha Glissmeyer; Rita and Rodney Shown; Amanda M Bratton; Gary May and Janet May; Patrick T Henry; McArthur and Allison McDaniel; Byron and Sylvia Baker; Rolland and Paulette Baxter; Sarah Clawson; Barry P Reynolds and Sonya D Reynolds; Clifford K Wanebo and Marian J Wanebo; Roditha de Asis and Rona Quiray; Kathy J Brown; Timothy D and Shirley A Erickson. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1296 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Wayne and Jeanne Nelson; Keith and Deanna Meyer; David and Karolyn Lamson; Dennis and Denise Sampson; Nyle Boyd; Millie MacKenzie; Michael and Robin Conrey; John W. and Mary B. Dolbey; Todd Little; William and Nancy Mittelstadt; Kristopher and Karen Olson; Larry and Carol Henderson; Marlon and Mariann Browne; Gina J. Lovelace; Whitney Lard; Richard and Natalie Reebel; Angie Roache; Donald and Elizabeth Karpen; Jerry and Pam Sessions; Robert and Patsy Gasser. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1295 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Robert L. and Mary A. Harris; John and Gloria Traviss; Matthew and Onika Mayer; Lloyd and Mary Pugh; Heinz and Joella Stettinius; Melissa and Gerald Denny; Andrew and Renae Weber; Christel E. Starry; Michael S. and Marcia R. Rogers; Charles and Lana Zelenak; Lisa and Barry McNeillis; Timothy and Debra Allbee; Thoams and Jaqueline Lewis; Daniel and Wendy Herforth; Rhonda Hogue; Peter M. and Gail Paradis; J. Marie Golden; Donald and Deborah Layson; Ronald and Tina Tull; Donald and Nancy Martin. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1294 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Harold and Lori Findley; Clifton and Margo Blalock; Glenn and Maria Carr; James and Jamie Gill; Mark and Teresa McGary; Bernadette Shahin and Kenneth Penders; Michael and Inocensia Dawson; Tom and Joan Fedder; James and Bertha Finlayson; Marica Rodd; Bruno and Felicia Pella; Colin and Mariah Esko; Sharon Guber; Jessy and Diana Lakin; John and Inge Puckett; Gloria Waters; Wiley and Selestine Hardy; Marvin and M. Kaye Mitchell; Laura Joy Campbell and Michaella S. Diggins; Stephen and Stephanie Pidgeon. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1292 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Deborah and Warren Medley; Thomas J. and Amy S. Riffe; Debra and Michael Charron; Jennifer and Todd Billups; Ernest and Jeanne Beals; Bruce and Betty Hatch; Mitch Maier; Carl D. and Deborah S. Green; Martin and Jo Bonin; Emmett and Janet Kirkham; Jackie and Teresa DuBose; Douglas Oliverius; Margaret and Alfonso Lucero; Marvin H. Scott; Robert L. Crow; Monica and Robert Cox; Martin Acaster; John and Kathryn Cory; Yamil Lucena and Carelyn Martinez; Ricky and Patti Siler. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1291 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Cliffton E. Webster & Laura L. Ferreira-Webster, Nivia Schnieper, Albert C. Hines & Anita M. Hines, Hal Maughan & Keri Maughan, Phillip N. Trujillo & Caroline Trujillo, Robert D. Smith, Leanne M. Zandell, Teresa H. Hall & Thomas K. Hall, Caroline H. Poulas, Gary Thinnes & Carol Thinnes, Guy Fitzgeral & Carol Ann Fitzgerald, Dean Allen & Becky Allen, Brian K. Clute & Carol B. Clute, Patricia Johnson & Jay Johnson, George W. Burden, Jr. & Julie Burden, Jon McIntyre & Barbara McIntyre, Gare E. Case, Leonard E. Sanderson & Poppy M. Sanderson, Dennis Casey & Joy Casey, and Michael A. Imbruglio. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1290 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Nidia Espaillat, Ronald J. Bosisto, Thomas W. Bennett, Arnold L. Hultberg & Geraldine B. Hultberg, Carl E. Wilkerson & Debra L. Wilkerson, Adam C. Joyce & Carol Joyce, Arlene K. Sambila, Brad Pederson & Mindy Gretty, Jeannine J. Belles & Daniel A. Belles, Richard L. Knudson, Gilles Chapellon & Ravak Chapellon, Matthew Grossaint & Starell Grossaint, Evangeline Schasse, Frankie Zehrung, Kelden Sheridan, Derek Weber, Susan E. Arkle, Kimberly K. Griffin, Thomas Wanless & Verena Wanless, and Antonio F. Saucedo & Lorena M. Saucedo. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1289 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Sara and Anthony Dople; Robert and Margaret Johnston; Clara Cassata and Russell Gulnick; Carole and Bill McDonald; Dennis and Renee Norton; James O. and Joan E. Norris; Ernest and Marcia Ledbetter; Aaron Starkovich; Ken and Nancy Harvey; Curtis and Patricia Bryant; Michael and Annette Kemp; Kathy Martin and Mary Frantz; Steven and Cherie Wallace; Paul and Kathryn Schraeder; J.C. and Sharon Greenlee; Heath and Julie Beesley; Josh and Misty Hansen; Terence Carey; Chris and Bonnie Buckland; James and Marcia Tomlin. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1288 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Craig W. Roggow; Daniel Morris and Wendy Wakefield; Stanley Boren and Christie Noble; Robert and Marina Batchelor; Cheryll Brown; Jacqueline Vullierme; Larry and Shelly Catron; Raymond and Paula Siburkis; Michael and Rene Howell; Mary Jane and John Edward Schurr; Terry Hofrichter and Kris Holley; Henry and Laurie Wade; Ronald Munce; Jeff Cooper and Aileen Blackmore; Lorna Delaney; Randy and Joyce Norris; Margaret and Michael Colasurdo; Scott and Diane Burns; Key and Ryan McMurry; Carl and Bobbette Olson. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1287 OPT-OUT LETTERS: David and Laurie Eash; Jolie and Rob Lofink; Robert and Mary Dassinger; Scott and Joanna Burkland; Grant and Katherine Paulsen; Jerry Esser; Erick and Joanne Fleischman; Anne and Anthony Chin; Larry R. and Sally J. Brown; Kathleen J. Park; Bill and Diana Brown; Bruce and Janet Emig; John and Diane Draper; William and Esther Haburn; Cindy L. Meyer; Stephen J. Wachter; Don and Rita Gillespie; Henri Moreau. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1286 OPT-OUT LETTERS: LeRoy C. and Arina C. Vierck; Sarah Mahler and Eric McDonald; David and Pamla Jensen; Kelly Krause; Philippe Elmers; Heckotr and Melissa Iruegas; Tom and Diane Swint; Deborah Waugh; Cherie Keating; Roger and Beckie Schurman; Martha Matsushima; Mary Griest; Vicki and J.E. Pollock; Maya Shelly and Arnie Bliven; Gerald and Janice Alsum; Debbie Scheer; Lesa and Michael Deeker; Mark and Jill Ramboz; Jac and Kathi Tiechner; Clinton Lowry and Aimee Bernardo (Lowry); Diane Quillin Boyd. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1285 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Loren Eugene and Ruth Evelyn Runyan; James and Tonda Morgan; Alisa Buchanan and Chad Roskeley; Lyle and Dixie Bair; C. Daniel Martinsen; Debbie Hogan; William Zimkus and Pamela Levey; Andrew Staley Cheryl Porter and Mark Shaw; Erin Budwick; Shirley Kirkpatrick; Edward and Adair Hendrickson; Glenda Blackburn and Keva Jordan; Dawn and Jacqueline Jackson; Bradley and Linda Schrott; Ray H. and Dorothy D. Clark; Phyllissa and Joseph Conlin; Gregorio and Lindy Ybarra; Ricky and L. Marie Tolman; Alexandra Cope. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1284 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Christian Shawn Bennett and Miye Kim; Kathy Iverson; Scott and Julie Cheek; Veronica Nelson; Robin and Rob Gangle; Lee and Gladys Jennings; Norma Shockley; Geraldine Murray; Paul and JoAnn Fallstone; Ron and Lisa Hanson; Monica Donald; Donna McGovern and Arthur Winter; Gary and Kelly DeHaan; Evelyn Jimenez-Rodriguez; Claude and Hallie Kitchens; Pamela Lane; Andrea L. Myers; Kevin and Sally Sherlock; J.H. Hopson and Linda Kamler; Laura Astorga and George Villegas. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1283 Opt-Out Letters From: Bryan & Lisa Ropp, William & Michele Smith, Charity Wright, JoAnn Stillman, Ken & Lisa Ward, Karl Geidans, Ben & Lara Newburn, Larry & Karla Shulander, JoAnn & R Allen Breckenridge, Charles & Janet Reed, Kent & Annette Chambers, Richard & Vicki Terry, Uwe & Heidi Kahlke, Steve & Janelle Cavenee, Clinton & Jane Moffitt, John & Dawn Johansen, Teresa Nunez, Willard P. Peterson, John & Carole Yocum, Brian Wong, Amy Hara (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1281 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Linda L. Wire, Inderjit & Harcharan Deol, Brian K. & Carla F. Parrack, Laurie E. & Christofer S. Berwald, T.J. & Nellie O'Hara, Joliena Tylor & Stanley Riffle, Tim & Dolly Kitchen, Edward & Charlene Yaremchuk, Helen Lin & Peter Kwan, Marcel & Maureen Savard, James & Laura Dean, Margaret Batalden, Susan & Rodney Rafter, Ronald & Sherry Gilroy, Ronnell & Candi Runyon, Nancy & Robert Maas, Douglas C. & Diane L. Sanderlin, Halicia Perkins, Lynne E. Martinez, Catherine Romero & Andrea Limb (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1278 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Joanna Hoang Rudenko, Allen R. Conner, June Breidt, John & Christina Howard, Floria Tanksley, Tom & Virginia De Marti (Demarti), Thomas Fagard, Ralph J. & Sandra L. Bender, Carlos E. Carranza, Thomas & Debra Stapleton, Peter Nguyen & Trang Tran, Kathry Anderson, Susan Bosnich, Joel & LeaAnn Martin, Ruth Pagel, Dante T. & Nelia M. San Miguel, WM Owners, Inc., & Crystal Pokorny, Roger L. Sorrells & Barbara J. Sorrells (Deceased), Robert G. Carol J. Jones, Stella Kpperud (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1276 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Robert & Cheryl Lowery, John Dong & Corrine Lim, Wendy & Cynthia Baxter, Anthony & Brenda Zwlerzynski, Donna M. Breault, Douglas & Cynthia Griffin, Patricia J. Streloff, Bruce Walton, John & Debra Snyder, Elizabeth Scalf, Kent & Linda Tingey, Dr. Robert & Betty Jake (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1274 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Raymond G. & Deloris Newsome, Monte & Lisa Vaughn, Heather Meleski & Michelle Kocher, Trude E. Hursh, Daniel & Kristian Capener, Larry J. & Sandra L. Zumwalt, Wilfredo & Lilia Vargas, Howard Royce & Gilda M. Barron, Ernest & Viva L. Blackmon, Alicia W. Barney, Linda B. Simmons, James R. Lowe, Leslie Cooper (Carmell), Adrian Steinwedel, Victoria Norman, Leroy & Jeannine Martin, Michael Holloway & Twylla Terry-Holloway, Richard N. Darden III & Judith A. Darden, Steve Harkness, Victoria Lyn Lewis(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1273 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Hugh & Susan Garvey, Robert B. & Laurie J. Geschke, Ryan & Jodi Perry, Christopher Neal & Andree Robinson-Neal, Ronald & Lillian Vega, Thomas A. & Beverly J. Moreno, Richard L. & S. Emel Cook, Lauren B. & Krystyna Reed, Tom R. & Camille E. Houston, Tom Mellor, Daniel K. & Susan K. Woodard, Diane & Elsie Archuleta, Eusebio & Sharri Rangel, Marileth & Felic Coria, Richard A. & Cheryl R. Johnson, Alan & Linda S. Feigenbaum, Michael & Chris Mahoney, Rick Patterson, Craig & Reava Davis, Dwight & Adrienne Shimoda (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1272 Opt-Out Letters From: Floyd & Linda Shreeve, Wixon Wyndham, Helsa Peterson, Clark & Linda Welden, Samy & Samia Salama, Peter Ways, Gretchen Gundrum,Jonathan Levine, Elizabeth Pritzker, Tony & Suzanne Williams, Kent & Sheila Murdock, Brad & Monica Sanada, Lyle & Ann Marie Campbell, James & Christine Birchman, Craig & Susan Morgan, Gary & Barbara Crain, Ronald & Linda Gonzales, Juan & Britney Reyes, Lori Lovelace, Aaron Morrison, Betty Kathleen Boam, Guy & Helena Harrison, Mitchell & Cindy Rausa (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1271 Opt-Out Letters From: John & Nancy Mahi, Brenda & Scott Hansen,Matthew Bullock, Sara Wysocki, Lorraine L. Cox, Verneska Conrad Johnson, Thomas & Moira Adamo, Charles & Sondra Wagener, John & Michele Konrad, Donald & Patricia White, Francisco & Christine Cornejo, Sheryl L. Abrams, Keith & Karmin Kippen, D.H. & J.A. Morelli, Jacques & Nicole Burgoyne, Jose Luis & Kathy Rojas, Jason & Joanne Johnson, Richard Draeger, James & Jenny Meays, Carolyn Rand, Gary Loyd, Daniel & Melinda Keane, Miltin & Denie Packard (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1270 Opt-Out Letters From: Linda H. Lee, Patrick & Starla Ellwood, Paul & Barbara Mazzio, Gary & Janet Epp, Robert & Terri Lolcama, John & Gillian Chappell, Robin & Lorrie Rarey, Daniel J. Adam, Kimbrely Ann Nickerson, Gerald & Mary Aiken, Richard & Wendy Testa, Jay & Leann Parker, Larry & Marie Easter, J. Dawn & Leonard Wilson, Rudolph J. Dichtl, Elizabeth Benavidez, James ANderson, Ellida K. Lathrop, Cynthia E. Burklow, Larry D. Adams, Stephanie Harris, Karen Rausch (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1269 Opt-Out Letters From: Mario & Flory Sancho, Monica Guerrero, Diana Karady, Dennis & Virginia Worden, Cornelio & Zenodia Alejo, Laurie L. Aguilar, Veronica Wallace-Henderson, Jeanette Thomas, Jonathan Levine, Elizabeth Pritzker, James & Christine White, Jason & Blanche Potter, James & Judy Contreras, Deanne T. Joe, Thomas E. Seiler, Anibal & Isabel Martinez, Alejandria Madrid, Kimball & Terry Doxey, Randy & Linda Barker, Douglas & Kim Farr, David & Sharlene Moore (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1267 Opt Out Letters (Postmarked 07/09/11) from Judy & Nathan Cisney; Jack O. & Linda J. Kantola; Leah Russell & Myra Waters; David & Marcy Toulon; Albert & Barbara Verm; Patricia B. Daffurn; Allen & Heather Hillman; Joelle Collins; Jeremy James Luckau; and JoAnne Gabellini. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1266 Opt-Out Letters from Ian W. & Mary L. Gamble, James Louis Pappas, Diana Bliss, Debra Ann Pappas, Judity E. & Steven M. Spector, Spencer L. & Robin L. Groshong, Joseph D. & Alancia N. Unser, Michael & Rebecca Selander, James B. & Margaret A. Shaklee, Sandra W. Bagley, Sharon James, Myrna Harms. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1265 Opt-Out Letters from Bonita Olsen, Diana & Kenneth Davis, Eugene L. Jojola, Brian S. & Brianna L. Longworth, Frank & Kathleen Cain, Larry & Kathy Van Beek, Dustin & Kathy Guilbert, Hans & Beverly Vander Veen, Chad & Julee Simmons, Douglas Crick, Heather & Lonnie Lawler, Fabian & Veronica Lopez, Shane & Kim Wichers, Steven D. & Nancy L. Chilson, Molly Zimmerman, Craig & Leanna Sebring, Willis J. & Diane H. Erickson, Ruth Ann Parish, Rique E. & Nona M. Prince, Marie E. Elliott & Ronald J. Elliott, Mary & Larry O'Donnell. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1263 OPT-OUT LETTERS from John Clausing; Wei Chen; Eric C. Kraus and Dorothy A. Kraus; Chris C. Ayers and John P. Ayers; Homer Paul Allen Sr.; Keith and Nicole De Fini; Emily Elizabeth Pensak; Paul A. Schneider; Barry L. Ross and Beverley L. Ross; Gary and Shawna Yasuda; Robert M. Hoskins; Kathleen Penne; John and Patricia Fewkes; Gene A. and Bonita L. Lynn; Howard R. Tuohy and Cynthia D. Tuohy; Martin Wech Jr.; Russell and Nicole Watts; Jose and Arlyn Vallejo; James H. Larsen and Nancy C. Larsen; Dennis and Stephanie McMillian; Barbara L. Perea; Dale C. Edstrom and Sue A. Edstrom; Mahmood U. Sheikh and Amity R. Sheikh; William and Lorraine Burgher; Karen D. Erickson; Donny and Diane Kindle; Daniel and Heather Morgan; Phyllis J. Crow. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1262 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Denise and Barry Ledbetter; Joseph and Edith Schmitz; Barbara Ogawa; Dale Bollar and Carolyn Bollar; Chandler L. Trusty and Elaine M. Trusty; Robert H. Weaver; Debra K. Mitchell; Robert A. Schnerch and Elinor H. Schnerch; Wesley and Candace Frye; Ernest and Peggy Strong; Michael A. Takagi; Manuel Arias Jr and Susan C. Fitzgerald; Darren and LeAnn Wood; Mark and Ann Wickstrom; Hal and Karen Melowitz; Sylvia Thompson; Valerie Jan Williams; Gary R. Ries; Dwayne R. and Virginia G. Stoughton; Steve and Janelle Cavenee; Greg Smith and Sterling Assets, Ltd. IRV Trust; Richard T. and Mona M. McCallister; Carly Waterafield Saieg and George Saieg; Tracie Noggle; John Michael Britton and Elsa Martinez-Gonzalez Britton. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1261 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Christopher Scott; Nadine R. Montreuil; James and Julia Garland; Glen P. Smith and Carol A. Smith; Steve and Darla Cunningham; Robger and Kaylyn Robison; Carl and Margaret Brame; Terri E. Soderberg and Andrys Gubens; Peter E. McIntyre and Carol E. McIntyre; Jeffrey M. Means and Eva Tracy Means; Kasey and Judy Bounds; Karen L. Monteith; Charles Michael Erdmann and Patricia June Erdmann; Donna L. Schultz; Benjamin O. Dy and Carolyn M. Dy; Ronald L. and L. Kay Pillo; Tom D. Nguyen; Don and Merrilee George; Lawrence R. Barnes Jr. and Nancy K. Barnes; Michael and Jennifer Feighny; Aaron B. Cooper and Mary L. Cooper; James R. and Charlotte G. Smith; Jim and Jennifer Myers; Juan and Maria Tanguma; Rick and Nancy Pryor; Wood T. and Amy S. Harper II; Judy Emery and David Emery; Keith and Mary E. Kumpula. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1260 OPT-OUT Letters: from Craig R. and Deborah L. Peterson, Sharee Feldman and Michael J. Zeff, Michael & Shelley L. Hamel, Troy and Frances Fisher, Patricia Nies and Brian Hoffmeier, Patricia A. Spaine, Cindy Gentry, Leland J. Wendland and Loraine D. Wendland, Douglas L. Chaffee, Lorraine E. Fullerton and Gordon W. Fullerton, Shirley A. Wolf, Michael and Lisa Morrison, Rod and Barbara Stelter, Fredric and Joan Latty, Scott Mielcarek and Debbie Mielcarek, Margaret Sikorski, Lennis M. Camfield, Jr. and Teresa L. Camfield, Robert P. Bieniek and Sylvia J.R. Bieniek, Brian W. Kremler, Paul F. Newman and Elizabeth R. Spangler. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1259 OPT-OUT Letters: from Jean Foley, William R. Fritz and Nita M. Brueggeman, Byron J. and Geisa F. Mott, Elizabeth Mendoza, Debra F. Barger, George W. and Dorothy E. Back-Eklund, Mark S. and Rosemary Y. Purcell, Jerry H. and Rebecca E. Uhlig, William W. and Cindy S. Bartman, Glen and Rene Smith, Christopher and Michelle Kopperud Seymour, Bob and Linda Cameron, Sergey Sirotinskiy, Lillian Montejano and William Montejano, Tommy S. and Geraldine Montoya, Thomas and Bonnie Kopp, Kyle Olson and Jessica Cheek Olson, Brian and Cynthia Nieto, Jeffrey and Kaynel Chase, Andrew G. and Lisa r. Hecht. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1258 OPT-OUT Letters: from Rickard L. and Sarah S. Diemert, M. Kirk and Wendy M. Brimhall, Ben Bunn Jr. and Jan Bunn, Barbara Brundage Yunker, April and Joseph Myers, Samuel A. and Judy Cardenas, Cheryl Lynn Osborne, Jennifer and Allen Herman, Mario Lamas and Fabian Romero, John M. and Ava B. Geddes, JoAnn O'Brien, Scott D. Brooke, Patti Page, Hien Thi Hill, William Aaron Silver, Marlene K. Silver, John R. and Anita M. Floden, Rita Marie Miller, Sharon Seabrook, Bruce and Cathy Ableidinger, David Feinstein and Kim Feinstein. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1257 OPT-OUT Letters: from Guito and Kymberle Meranvil, Charles W. and Darcy E. Krusinski, Philip C. and Patricia E. Yaeger, Thomas W. and Irene M. Sparks, Sharon and Derrick Fontenot, Delle E. Brandt, William J. and Mildred Freeney-Hilton, John and Nancy McKnight, Stanley A and Leonore Sweet, Donald L. and Donna M. Campbell, Dean P. and Irene S. Hughes, Mark and Mindy Salmans, Aubrey and Deborah Miller, Peter J. Frost and Bernadette A. Huston, Phyllis M. Carli, Dave and Misty Muse, Dennis and Rita Hensley, J'Amy McLellan, Daniel Samelson, Mildred A. Kingham and Barton W. Kingham. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1256 OPT-OUT Letters: from Richard & Tammy Merrill, Douglas Lee and Jeanne Claire Palin, Kathleen Olson, Darrell and Dana Welch, Peter and Kirsten Mundy, John B. and Bonnie J. Gregory, Jim and Robin Soderberg, Richard G. and Karen J. Zielsdorf, Sharon K. Strebin, Lori Wisdo, Stephen F and Betty Jo Reese, Richard R. and Laurel A. Grimsted, David W. and Nancy Lee Anderson, Robert H. and Doris K. Reynolds, Paul and Sharon Anderson, Bradley and Rhonda Moore, Anne Solis, Steven R. and Marie Hornback, Roger and Nancy Nelson, Mark and Pamela Beckley. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1255 Opt-Out Letters from Allen & Sylvia Bergstrom; Michael & Elizabeth Dunford; G.I. & Jodel Wilson; Jermaine Love Heidi Buser; Evan Evans; Bob & Brenda DeVyldere; Daniel & Charlene Knudsen; Kelly Jenkins; Veltorina Lauterio & Iris Goshen; Terry & Nadine Allen; Mary Epps & Robert Patterson; James & Debbie McPhie; Amir Alimardani & Afrouz Gerayli; David & Cathy McCrory; David & Jenifer Bertz; Tim & Rita Donis; Wayne & Ann Petersen; Rick & Melanie Lightbody; Lawrence & Barbara Kampfer, and Keyley Kampfer & Michael Eves; Edward Jr. & Linda Carlson. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1253 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Davina Joshlin and Sean Joshlin; Marshall and Elizabeth Stoddard; Richard G. Nielson and Andrea K. Nielson; Robin C. Knoll and Vanessa Volland; Rick and Teresa Privette; Russell and Dianne Smart; Richard Peterson; James D. Hibbard and Jan W. Hibbard; Christine J. Chenoweth; David and Linda Trautman; William I. Powell and Winnie J. Powell; Patricia J. Sunset and Paul H. Sunset; Stephen F. Gaines and Kathleen Gaines; Steve Barker and Laurel Barker; Linda Blowers; Janice and Roger Zander; Phillip T. Vance and Jessica A. Vance; Kelly G. Mitchell and Kaisa M. Mitchell; Kathryn Cleveland; Wesley Alan Fujii and Jennifer E. Fujii. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1252 Opt-Out Letters from Kenneth & Lynda Kelsay; Greg & Tara Morejon; James & Helen Sobiesczyk; Jeffrey & Carol Hudson; Jeff Gustafson; Thomas & Linda Pitschka; Lewis & Beverly Paulson; Robert & Rae Hernandez; Jeffrey & Kellie Lindstrom; Carol Morgaine & H Wendlandt; Kurt Johansen; Stanley & Marlys Benge; Gary & Judy Hutton; Loren & Patricia Turvey; Donald & Jacqueline Kauffman; Lisa Ortquist & Shane Day; Richard Harpham; Don & Gina Burnet; Michelle Mosgrove; Julia & James Keizur. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1251 Opt-Out Letters from Ronald & Karri Jo Livingston, Shanita N. Duncan, Mary L. Jorgensen, Tammie Williams & Ethel Crowell, Mary I. Betz, Robert & Shannon Fankhauser, Robert E. & Cindy Speakman, Carlos & Julita T. Rummier, Ami & Charles Adkins, Ray T. & M. Joan Smith, Dennis Skyles, Jonathan J. & Linda S. Wilkes, Lionel & Edith Smith, Sophia Poythress-Streets, Eliseo M. & Regina R. Lopez, Jerry W. & Camille W. Hirschi, Ronald & Diane Bender, Henri Moreau, Christopher W. & Kimberly S. Farrell, Byron & Carol Gage. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1250 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Gustave E. Hanson & Mary Lou Hanson, Susan Veatch Golds (also known as Susan Veatch Pettis), Richard Goodman & JoAnn Goodman, Darlene Pead & Orin S. Pead, Carol L. Smith, Chris Christofferson & Karen Christofferson, Patricia A. Morris & Edward L. Morris, Darrel & Robin Heckendorf, Frank R. Beaty & Judith A. Beaty, Charles Hall & Thelma Lee Hall, Scott R. Anderson & Tammie L. Anderson, Lary D. Meyer & Ruth A. Meyer, Dale Wilson & Susan Wilson, Michael W. Garey, Lisa M. Nielsen, Keith Qunell & Sharon Qunell, Jennifer Thompson, Rozlynne Rush & Michael Stacy, David Billard & Kathleen Billard, and Lyn M. Stockwell. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1249 Opt-Out Letters from Michael D. & Jan H. Brown, Frank & Isabel Waddell, Glenn & Debbie K. Eickmeyer, James & Gerri Tedrick, Harold & Jeanette Campbell, Maril Johnson, Richard & Sara Kettel,, Benjamin L. & Terry L. Willis, Ramona L. Wright, Kathleen A. Heron, Tom J. Battle, Alfred Leon LeRoy, Kenneth & Krista Brown, Charles T. & Donna L. Mitchell, Lyndsey Gewecke, Arthur L. & Cynthia A. Bennett, Michael & Janet Kelly, Todd S. & Nicole T. Owen, Kevin L. Perkins, Rodney C& & Destia DuPen Hermes. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1248 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Walter J. Endicott & Cynthia J. Endicott, Jerome M. Wasson & Marilyn T. Wasson, John Bennett & DeAnne Bennett, Larry Alan Wendt & Kathleen Lorraine Wendt, Christopher David Wilkes & Cheleen Ann-Catherine Mahar, De Anna Nugent, Guy R. Anderson, Melvin Sommer & Sybil Sommer, Sylvia F. Robinson & Geraldine Thompson, Mary S. Clarke & Stephen L. Clarke, Ronald A. Griffey & Viola J. Griffey, Paul F. Talbot & Peggy A. Talbot, Kathryn M. Sharp & Cameron M. Sharp, Norma L. (Olson) Wilbur, Frank E. Johnson & Marcy Johnson, LLoyd Gardner & Donna M. Gardner, Russell Smart, Barbara Ann Montgomery Mrizek, Diane R. Anderson Wenke, and Michael R. Staley & Denise Staley. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1247 Opt-Out Letters from John & Glendene Hoover; Wendell & Ruth Peterson; Darrel & Harriet Dixon; Richard & Connie Kepler; Elmo & Sarah Langham; Jane Beeghly & Jon LaBranch; Richard & Nancy Carroll; Jerry & Terri Clark; Lark & Ronald Shugar. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1246 Opt Out Letters from Emil M. Franklin; Thomas & Katherine Flint; Gwen M. Farley; Roger & Jacqueline Smith; Krystal H. Sakagami; John E. & Lorri P. Robinson; Peter Fuk Lung Yeung; Dinko & Ruzarija Zampera; Merle & Bethany George; Craig & Suzanne Ogram; Tom & Silvia Twilligear; Thomas & Susan Waggener; William A. & Susan F. Bloch; George & Gloria Kuchenbecker; Susan & Neal Salove; Robert & Heather Queen; Jeff & Lynne Sharpe; Jack H. & Kathleen M. Gill; Tina Linehan; Larry & Debra J. Shepherd; Jasen & Ayumi Petersen; Stephanie Dowbusz; Ken & Rani Kettel; Mary Mott; Hank & Kathy Poortinga; Donald J. & Elaine Snapper; Rama & Guna Vinod; Gurlal & Ninder Dhaliwal; Abraham & Arlene Enns; Sandra L. & Shelley M. Smith; Donald & Janice Goodman; David & Katherine Atkinson; Keith E. & Tammy M. Heitzman; David & Sharon Howson; Ronald H. & Junae B. Williams; Janet Oliver; Suzanne Anderson; Kevin & Shelly Zollman; Robert & Michelle Stauffer; Thomas S. & Eulalie Ann Davis; Gary & Gail Pfingsten; John & Michele Gardner; Randy & Anesha Slocum; Deborah McKeown; Maryanne Hubbert & Margaret E. LaCrosse; Donald W. Smith; Peter S. & Rene L. Galloway; Thomas E. & Betty J. Kelly; and Randy L. & Dianne Norton. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1245 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Donald J. Mandella & Marie C. Mandella, Partick Kapfhammer & Barbara Kapfhammer, John Haynes & Linda Haynes, Diana J. Armstrong, John R. Knisely, Ed.D. & Pamela Ann Kniseley, Keith Kretschmer & Adine Kretschmer, Debra Lynn Trujillo & Eduardo Garcia Trujillo, Virginia L. Bittler, Gary Gutow & MaryLue Gutowl Jennifer Jane Whatley, William E. Maurer & Dolores D. Maurer, Susan K. Davis, Linda Tomlinson & Scott Tomlinson, Rosemarie Dinwiddie, Barbara J. Gillis & Diane D. Baillargeon, Robert Paul Haub & Mary Eileen Dibb, Cheryl Marzec & Robert Marzec, Cravens Wanlass & Doreen Wanlass, Marvin Frey & Tracy Fillmore-Frey, Brian Rowland & Julia Rowland, and Maurice Epstein & Muriel Epstein. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1244 Opt Out Letters from Michael & Samantha Savage; Dylan & Jennie Ankney; Mark R. Fossum; Sharon & Bernard Allen; Dennis E. & Laura D. Kinne; Robert H. & Judith E. Brooks; Sue Ann & Robert O. Craddock; Kenneth & Sharon Young; Claire L. Zimmerman; Roy Dunn; Kelly M. & Jeri J. Hickey; Frederick & Wilma Plog; Blaine & Jan Polendey; Jeanette & Robert L. Miller, Jr.; Sally & Richard Poole; Judy Moses; Brongwyn & Leanne (Scott) Williams; Daniel A. & Joanne M. Tennant; Glenn & Rebecca Verkerk; Dean S. Warhaft; Curtis Lafate; Jeffrey S. Davis; Sarah & Gary Brimhall; Yvette & Rob Speers; Margaret Christensen; Jim & Denise Dewey; Roy F. & Patricia E. Southern; Kevin R. & Katie L. Bushnell; Gayle Moutard; Dale & Katherine Esser; Ljiljana Vrankovecki; John & Deborah Haas; George & Dee Mount; Willie J. & Shirley T. Cowan; William & Marcia Honer; Edward & Winifred Durkin; Suzy Patch; Henri Moreau; Donna Reid; Patricia J. Pearce; Debra Ann Pappas; Ronald Lee Mosgrove; Wayne B. & Leona R. Gammon; Kathy J. Ragsdale; Douglas & Alisa Koehn; Gary & Heather Strudler; Julie Petersen; Lloyd Emry; William Sager & Carolyn Hansen; Wes Wright; and James Louis Pappas. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1243 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Michael E. Mitchell & Joan M. McGuirk, Phillip Jack & Laura Medved, Paul Schwarze Minty a/k/a: Paul S. Minty, Raymond H. Renken & Barbara Renken, Robert J. Wyckoff & Kim Lavato, Edward O. Byrne & Lioudmila Belova, David W. Robinson & Sandra K. Robinson, Glenda Seely, Leroy Robertson & Deborah Robertson, Daisy B. Ryals, Renee Tatum, Marie-Emmanuelle J. Pierre, Alice Lee, Carol L. Haertlein & Jimmy Shannon, David Streeter & Michelle Streeter, Barbara E. Breck, Beverly J. Green, Ronald Anderson & Judy Anderson, Peter Rosen & Gray Rosen, and Steven Vollmer & Susan K. Vollmer. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1242 Opt-Out Letters from Alicemarie & Michael Roper; Kenneth & Jeanne Garrison; Winston & Jennifer Yeung; Sean Kovacs & Patricia Juarez; Kenneth & Carolyn Shaner; John & Bonnie Hawkins; Janice Stoppleworth; Brant & Linda Ward; Alfred & Rosanne Beltram; Randy & Dorene McCowan; Leon & Bobbi Medina; Billye Silvester; Chad & Tiffany Erickson; Stuart & Susan Bailey; Heidi & William Benson; Jerry Allen & Christine Weiler-Allen; Sandra Peterson & Walter Reed; Steve Eyerly & Kristine Bernard; Lonnie & Margo Jensen; Claude & Kris Rider. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1241 Opt-Out Letters from Mark & Cristina Johnson; Deane & Ann-Marie Woodland; Terry & Heidi Szerszen; Michael & Louene Perry; Shiela Southern; Kara & Robert Wood; Bradley & Maureen Maples; Carolyn Williams; Erik & Lorraine Delap; John & Kimberly Betzsold; Kenneth Byers & Martha Rosenberry; Lane Morgan; Paul & Leslie Heath; Richard & Teresa Kummer; David Morris; Jeffry & Deborah Ingman; Jay Paul; Lynn & Diana Sharp; Kenneth & Lynn Patten; Peter & Jean Anderson. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1240 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Richard R. & Patricia K. Burkhart, Delores & Marvin Schulz, Robert L. & Betty E. Fogel, Susan L. Wallace, John G. & Michele R. Silva, Ralph F. & Irene B. Wuscher, Steven & Linda Robinson, Thomas F. & Ernestine Bliss, Ron M. & Mary Ann Jackson, Tadashi & Carolyn Ishihara, Richard E. & Bernice A. McLaughlin, Ron Lopez, Uriel Diaz-Chavez & Mona Klotz, Robert & Janice Camero, Richard & Dorothy Lathrop, Ronald & Sharon Swanson, Jay & Linda Hoff, John E. & Marka L. Perkins, Michael R. & Elbia Lissette Pendleton, Madge Davis (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1239 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Justin Hoover & Diana Hoover, Donald C. Johnson & Laura P. Johnson, Linda Grane, Robert Grossman & Beth Grossman, Chris Newman & Klarissa Newman, Bill E. Bigelow & Jean E. Bigelow, Wilda Madsen, Jody Daugherty, James Bachman & Jennie Bachman, B. Rick Whitney, Andrea Severin & Rodney Severin, Larry Becker & Lynne Becker, Guy Gerrells & Sandra Gerrells, Nancy S. Robinson, Tim S. Phillpott & Kathi M. Phillpot, Roger Timpe & Jerine Timpe, Bill Cooper & Ardeen Cooper, Shannon Johnson & Aleyna Reed, Patricia Billig, and Curtis Rueter & Ruth Rueter. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1238 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Michael J. Bates, Kevin & Doreen Brown, C. Edwin & Colleen M. Alter, Barton Lee Thacker, Terry & Bernice Mullenburg, Elizabeth T. Roberts, Donna J. Carroll & Elizabeth L. Wells, James M. Abe, Jess F. Willard, Elizabeth Underwood, S. John McDonald & Angnes J. Forras, Harry J. & Pauline L. Coveny, James J. Ware, Jr., & Deborah D. Ware, Kenneth & Shirley Kreitzer, Catherine & Jack Doo, Leonard Mellow & Gale T. Ford-Mellow, Ray & Teresa D. Cathey, Jerry & Ellen Espinosa, Kenneth A. & Mourlene H. Wright, Richard O. & Lea A. Devincenzi, Grover & Carol Day(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1237 Opt Out Letters from: Beaton, Matthew and Lisa; DeJong, Richard A. and Laurie M.; Douglas, David and Susan; Forsey, Roger Dee and Mary Ruth; Harger, Warren D. and Linda L.; Hoffman, Charles and Kathy; Iseminger, Robert B. and Bonnie L.; Jungnitsch, James and Delrita; Lowder, Doug and Bangon; Louis, Margaret; McMillan, Paul and Nann, Karen McMillan; Peters, Karen L.; Petereit, Hans and Cheryl; Rognlie, Scott and Donene; Russell, Don G. and Julianna M.; Schroeder, Alberta E.; Shaw, Ronald and Christy; Sullivan, Gary; Temperton, George A. and Grace A.; Watts, Chris M. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1236 Opt-Out Letters from Lora & Ewald Ufert; Mary Moulton & Colleen Krikland; Harjit & Jaspreet Singh; Anne & Delbert Armstrong; Judith Hensley; John & Lisa Briggs; Gordon & Carol Cresse; Larry & Carole Harper; Ronald & Brenda North; Thomas Sopwith; Paige Parker; Jack & Shirley Jackson; Gerald & Sandra Clark; David & Kerry Nelson; James & Marie Pellham; Simone Carter; Greg Lang; Peggy & John Booker; Leslie Harris; Charles & Peggy Pulsipher. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1235 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Linda Larsen, Douglas & Gail Adamson, Richard & Linda Jones, David & Dawn Herlache, Raymund & Juliet de Jesus, Kirk L. & Karen S. Cresto, Robert & Ann Schibig, Jon D. & Patricia G. Seeger, Sharon Stephens, John Michael Zimmermann & Carolyn Beardshear, Whitman Theodore & Leah Jean Swansburg, Bernice Hayibor & Bruce Mann, Fang Fang, Patricia Dicks, George Kuan, David & Delores Kelley, Devon & Katherine Townsend, Zachary & Karen Croxen, C. Frederick & Joanne M. Clifford, Richard & Wendy Whittington (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1234 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Raul & Olga J. Arreola, Jimmy J. & Deborah C. Jones-Beasley, Thomas L. & Diane F. Cox, Anthony & Katherine Loparco, Peter A. Solan, Donald M. & Patricia S. Raleigh, Umberto & Mary Simone, Nicole Tepner, Holly & Raymond G. Harris, Kenneth & Tina Hoffman, M. Eugene Blumenfeld, Carlton Wayne & Nora Hamer, Maudeane E. Taunton, Richard D. & Shirley C. McKinnon, Michael L. & Karen J. Hammack, Steven Richard & Patricia Marie Smith, David P. Wasmundt, Jr., & Barbara J. Wasmundt, Richard M. & Deborah L. Farrell, Alan & Debra Meyers, Chin Teong Lee (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1233 Opt-Out Letters from Edward & Marie Bapple; Vernon & Theresa Greenland; Victoria Lynn Shaw; Paul Higham & Richard Higham; Rebekah Ulibarri; Juan & Vilma Possie; Daryl & Taunya Page; Jeanette & Irvin Moore; Brittany Richers; Erich & Susan Woelich; Walter & Pamela Garcia; Jeff & Crystal Norton; Lynn & Clifford Connors; William Groenig & Jeannette Janssen; Edwin Jr. & Charla Wheeler; Robert & Mary Mozingo; William & Merry Harding; Jim & Donna Foster; Clasina Dreisbach; Varnell & Susan Roberts. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1232 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By John & Sharon Campbell, Fred & Marilyn Zimmerman, Alice B. Evans, Charles & Shirley Beauchamp, Jeanie Rickman, Michael Sondheim, Scott & Daneen Rhode, Fredric & Patricia Tarrach, Joy Pratt & American Mortgage Professionals, Inc., Larry & Margaret Vander Pol, Nancy Franssen, Richard D. & Evelyn B. Meyers, Frank S. & Angelina L. Torres, George E. Dickson, III & Theresa A. Dickson, Mahlon R. & Brenda E. Stephens, Gerald Waterhouse & Bobbi Bentley, Bonnie Swartosky, Miron F. DuPont & Leeann G. Ghiglione-DuPont, John & Jennifer Coyle, Tomoo & Ayumi Watanabe (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1231 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Michael & Tara Spencer, Neil & Brenda McLeod, Nancy I. Kushner, Linda Eckroth, Armando & Christine Quezada, James F. & Maude Kerns, Walter & Roiann Santos, Spencer A. & Mary Louise Fowler, Phillip & Maria Arneho, Brian & Lisa George, Sally & Vince Avolio, Betty Lam, Milton Rudy & Opal N. Powell, Edwin & Janice Cozzens, Zane & Kim Christofferson, Brent A. & Margaret M. Yochem, James leese, Laurlei Louise Lowe, Dan & Adah Watts, Steven M. & Debra Gardner (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1230 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Lyle & Susan Hagedorn, Thomas & Janice Frankum, Frank & Jean Hubbard, Louis J. Schuster, III & Marilyn K. Schuster, Thomas & Sharon Campbell, Evan D. & Nanette R. Theobald, Robert S. & Marlene D. Bowers, Amy Spray, John N. & Carol A. Bettandorff, Lee & Lorraine Borchers, Robert C. & Cassandra C. Coe, Leonardo & Marietta Crisologo, Betty J. Elliott, Gregory P. Kitz, Edna P. Cate, Eugenie D. Rivers & George S. ledyard, III, William D. & Jana L. Olson, John & Cheryl Kuntz, Ivonne J. Degler-Hamilton (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1229 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Alex & Anna Vega, Brett & Ana Gibbons, David & Donna Campbell, Mr. & Mrs. David R. Martin, Nancy Graham & James Hollister, LaMont & Peggy Woods, Manfred & Sharon Franz, George Douglas & Susan T. Holt, Alfred B. & Deanna N. Knickerbocker, Kenneth R. & Walina M. Chapman, Susan M. Druery, Loretta Worthington & Maria Zeeman, David & Linda Green, Alfred & Carrie LeBrun, Donald & Elinor Perlich, Gretchen Oversloot Saxer, Lisa L. Bain & Stephanie A. Rathe, Dayton Ewing, Jiunshien Her & Chin-Lin Chien, Daniel & Bertha Rivera (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1228 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By R. Troy Barela, Kelleen (Kelly) M. Hails & Karl F. Meyer, Greg & Kim Rosen, Marilee Kohlhas, Donna Witcher, Virginia M. Castro, John & Julia Consentino, Lisa O'Neal, Mark & Donna Howard, Estela Lora, James A. & LaDella A. Farmer, Linda J. Carpenter & Stephanie A. Smith, Dolas D. & Diana K. Bain, Phillip M. & Marsha D. Parks, Robert A. Burch, Jennifer Kho & Irene Kho, Vanessa Sigurlin Hadady, John & Julie Leckman, Ammon & Mirtha McBain, Saeed Hashemi (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1227 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Christine F. Fulton, Earl & Mary Thorsfeldt, Ronald R. & Elaine K. Moore, Belinda Vega, John J. & Gail M. Kelly, John H. Wilma Pickrell, Marina Pereverzeva, Danielle & Michael Lesperance, Richard F. & Sherri L. Lindloff, Noreen Kelly, Pamela J. Clark, Leon & Elizabeth Leadon, Joyce Randall, Jeffrey & Kristen Cowan, Beverly & Mitchell Roder, Stephen & Gretchen Gallo, Rodney & Jeanette Hurlow, Leo & Karen Lee, Lorrie & Brad Bakke, Gerald D. Matthews, Jr., & Sandra J. Matthews(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1226 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Luis Martinez, Jr., Robert Knight & Barbara St. Louis, Mike & Ginger Murner, Jan M. Garin, O.R. & Georgia Lile, Suzanne M. Rasberry, Doug & Marcy Court, Luis R. & Pamela J. Lopez, Carah Reed, Thomas & Maria E. Campa, Joel Fleisher & Mary-Louise Sonntag, Shoutao Chen & Xiaoyan Zhang, Paul & Laurie Olson, Edgar R. & Carlota C. Tovar, Joe Santangelo & Ann Jajilan, Victoria Vega, Luciana Mendonca, Glenn A. Carrier & Judith L. Gaydon, Wendy Susan Wythe, Scott & Heather Dutton (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1225 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Jan P. Kwit-Conklin, Rose Ann L. Beagle-Beckerle, Margaret Hanks, David & Sylvia Compton, Mary P. O'Donnell, Nosrat Zareh, Paula D. Chambers & Desiree A. Swanson, Eric R. & Kysha N. Mitchell, Sandra Wagner, Russell Muraoka & Darlene Okura, Gordon & Doreen Peterson, Christine A. Long, Arnold & Bao Salonga, Heather & Robert Flanagan, George & Ana Borba, Mark H. & Diane S. Holtze, John George & Bonnie Lee Clawson, Gerson & Maribel Guerrero, Larene & Christopher Ring (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1224 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Alice Lee, Demetris Blackman, Arthur Eugene Bokemeier & Grace Whiteside, William D. & Carol S. Long, Gordon & Sandy Hatt, Phillip R. & Jo Ann Rundell, Lisa Lefevre & Scott Battles, William & Diane Barrett, Ronald & Hee Kyung Okamura, Gary Posner & Engracia Lozano (Posner), Thac Huu Nguyen & Ngoc Le Dang, Veronica A. Greene, Donald P. & Diana N. Monahan, Meredith Leonard, William Augenstein, Janet L. & Weldon B. Holmes, Harold & Mylene Selby, Tennyson Heen & Cheryl Ching, Gene H. Zaglin & Benjamin L. Strazze, Jr., Dwayne Hearn (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1223 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Steven & Iris Gibb, Lotte I. & Ronald L. DePoule (deceased), William B. Frank, Michael & Colleen Mikkelson, Cybal F. & Christopher Hall, Rick & Judy Wright, Charlene Rossi fka Charlene Rossi Belnap, Paul S. & Marsha A. Castle, Julie Howard, Javier & Muriel Gallegos, Bonnie R. Henriquez, Leigh Spearin-Barovsky, Phyllis R. Phillips, Peter A. & Jennifer L. Prekeges, David & Sheena McKinney, Richard G. & Carla W. Stevenson, Bernard & Christine Garbe, Stasha Drzewiecki, Joe & Diane McGovern, Thomas J. & Judith L. Redenbaugh (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1222 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By John S. Williamson, Jr., & Jan T. Williamson, Charles & Myra Hullfish, Andrei & Luba Pleshuk, Linda Sherill, Helen M. Mickiewicz & Mario Seidita, Elizabeth & Terry Thorman, James & Kelly Van Winden, Belinda Rector, Glen H. Kramer, Andrew & Jessica Merryweather, Marino Toualtos, Jerry & Toni Mensch, Dr. Roger G. & Aileen Dear, Kevin Lingener, Denise A. Bell, Tom & Sarah Hintz, James H. Oakley, Victoria Spencer, Scott & Carla Hadsall, William Sharman(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1221 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By John & Barbara Geisler, Jeanine Perry & Elizabeth Andrews, Wayd & Alice Weber, Georjean Stoodt, M.D., M.P.H., Lucy P. Skourup, Thomas E. & Karen E. Fox, James & Debora Frolich, Allen & Venice N. Jensen, David & Cindy Fisher, Jon Larson & Angela Henszel, Sheldon & Elizabeth J. Cohen, Bob W. & Marcia L. Krause, Sharon & Dudley Strain, Gordon & Theresa Deeds, Peggy Osborne, Robert & MaryAnn Gardner, David H. & Sherry N. Duff, Willard Butler, LaRon Butler, Jerry George (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1220 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Douglas C. Kidd, Thomas N. & Linda D. Turnbull, Peter B. Bade, III, Esq., Scott R. & Doris Fae Dorr, Edward Lucien & Margaret Perry Gouzenne, Jack & Iris Fitzgerald, David L. & Judith L. Sanabria, Michael A. Berriz, William L. Green, Deborah Williams, Sandra J. Ellyson, Harold W. & Mary Alice Waymire, Sallie Polk-Steere, Miles & Marilyn Otoupal, Cliff & Vicki Luber, James A. & Barbara T. Niles (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1219 Opt-Out Letters from Lawrence D. & Barbara J. Byman, Lynn C. & Marlene P. Richardson, David & Carol Wilson, Ray & Marjory Barilleaux, Edee Horn, Roberta C. Blanc, Denali Granholm & D. Bruce Simpson, John & Gwendolyn Greene, Susan & Mark Bantz, Ray & Carole Fritz, Earl & Terri Broderdorf, Elaine L. Norris, Timothy La Fuze & Esther Guzman, Seth & Heidi Herway, Diana Fisher-McInerney, Ralph & Annalee Edwards, Dennis G. & Lorell A. Ortega, Jennifer Powers, Terry & Kerri Wright. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1218 Opt-Out Letters from Kathryn Cooper and Nicole & James J. Davis, Charlotte Gilchrist, Lawrence J. Ebstein II & Emily R. Ebstein, James & Naomi Milton, Terry L. Paddon, Wayne & LaDonna Shielee, Steven C. Strouhal, Abram & Erin Underwood, Keith & Patricia Elmore, Scott Miler & Cheryl Brown, Kristine S. & Richard R. Beam, Nancy L. & Kenneth M. Bisbee, Fred & Roxanne Cavazos, Andrew & Barbara Pitterie, Lynne Staver, Raymond S. & Joyce I. Gee, John P. & Donnella Slayton, Darlene J. Tucker & James D. Brown, Vaughan & Carolyn Mason, Veroy T. & Shawna K. Bolles. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1217 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Doreen M. & David W. Smith, Bernard & Brenda Daverin, Ruth & Ralph Huber, Eugene Wallace, Betty Sparrow Doris, Theresa Koenig, Tamra L. Coyne, Carroll A. & Philip W. Dodd, Rebecca L. Harding, Terry F. & Diane G. Crockett, Cecilia Kuehl, Marcella & Steve Harris, Frances C. Sheire, Sharon P. Selders, Kurt & Robin Hegstad, Michael & Beverley Moore, Louis J. & Yvonne C. Ascoli, Robert & Alta Anderson, Jim & Anne Stice, Rick D. & Linda G. Cheney(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1216 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By James & Lee Haworth, Patricia Ellermeier, Scott Haynes, Larry & Roxann Amorelle, Daniel A. & Molly A. Baker, John & Jamie Bagge, James E. Parrish, Sr., & Sharon C. Parrish, Robert & Joann (Haas) Sleadd, Robert J. & Debra L. Pfeifer, Marina Loosli, Judith C. Warren, Charles & Melba Johnson, James & Linda Lamon, Nancy Baxter, Alex & Michelle Trujillo, Daniel G. Dunn, Nicole Haines, Stephen & Sandra Barton, Karen R. Oster, Tina V. Nguyen (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1215 Opt-Out Letters from Henry W. Sintay III, Venice Rogers & C. J. Summerhays, Gracie Cervantes, Linda F. & Karl J. Henderson, Richard C. Lambert, Glenn & Melissa Gibson, Dwight & Marie Roberson, John & Rebecca Simmons, Diane & Gene Deford, Terry & Shirley Brewer, Shari & Randy Tastad, James E. & Roxana Moore, Douglas & Dorothy Freimuth, David L. & Barbara H. Astle, Norm & Nancy Winters, Myrvin & Joan Chose, Alan M. & Bette E. Mohr, Justin & Tamara Blatny, Donald & Sharon Jahraus, Raymond A. & Peri K. Clark. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1214 Opt Out Letters from: Ranton, Judith L.; Redfield, James L. and Paula G.; Reed, Ethel, M.; Renz, Michael and Heather; Richardson, Vernon and Suzanne; Roadman, Kenneth Brent and Vicki Lynn; Roth, Lela H.; Ruddell, Larry and Susan; Scarborough, Tom and Judy; Schlauder, Wallace J. and Diana M.; Schwarzbach, Frank and Denise; Sellers, Arlen and Mary Ann; Seller, Charlotte; Stalnaker, Alan and Susan; Stewart, Gail; Tan, Daniel and Teresa; Turner, Larry G. and Bonita K.; Verhoeven, Linda; Waller, Wayne and Ramirez, Peggi; Watanabe, Tammy; Weyer, Ronald and Sandra; White, Robin; Will, Theodore W. Jr. and Sylvia E.; Winner, Linda and Jonathan. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1213 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By John Allen & Cheryl Lynn Lien, Martha L. & David C. Wilborn, Carl J. & Ann L. Bothman, Nena M. Gray, Lee & Ellon Cornelius, Frederick & Shelley Heller, Sam Guida & Judy Clark Guida, Russell & Patricia Billings, Paul Bohlman, William H. Mills, Roger & Christie Suss, David & Jennifer Springer, Darla Hartmann, Bill & Norma Stacey, Daniel & Anita Schmidt, Timothy Franklin, Glenn R. Lyons, Laurie Holdsworth & Charles Boyer, Richard 7 Laura Packard, Roger N. & Ann Alum Bird (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1212 Opt-Out Letters from Peter & Tiffany Hentschel, Raymond & Tina Kelemencky, Randy & Julie Ohm, Gordon & Sharee Morrey, Fred M. & Wanda R. DworkisJ. Winston & Marlene Clouss, Izaak N. Zink, James Glen & Melissa Ruth Welker, Mitzi Spalding, Albert D. Trost, Jr. & Lyndi J. Trost, Molly A. Quillin, Bruce L. Anderson, David & Sharon Young, Ralph G. & Shannon T. Bird, Gary & Barbara Bernhardt, Gasper Patrico, Maurice & La Quisha Times, Annette Morejon, Stephen N. & Laura M. H. Flood, Greg & Shauna Ramirez. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1211 Opt Out Letters from: Kennedy, Tracey and Joe; Kenney, Wayne and Ruth; Korb, Nancy and Sturtevant, Karen; Kranenburg, Jill and Gary; Lehman, Jerrold and Linda; Leibrand, Howard and Marilyn; Loop, Sandra A.; Ludlow, Brent and Anne; Lunghamer, Ann and Lawrence; Margetts, Paul Frederick and Zella Margaret; Martin, Michael and Claudia; Mitchell David and Amy; McGregor, Trent and Beverly; Murchison, Linda J.; Murdock, Lynn and Sonia; Nattress, Betty C. and Page, Bonnie; Newman, Layne and Jessie; Olsen, Ronald and Debbie; Outlaw, Jamie; Perry, Guy Michael; Pol, Leonie M; Phillips, Marilyn and Ray; Presson, Jonathan C. and Judith A; Radatti, Angelo and Joyanne; Radich, Anthony and Norma. (wsnS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1210 Opt-Out Letters from Susan Beardsley & Noal Preslar, William & Barbara Boyle, Roger & Janelle Coakley, Richard C. & Ann E. Gray, Don & Lori Williams, Sherryl D. & Eugene Robinson, Hillary Axford & Timothy Hinds, Robert W. & Susan R. DeVore Michael J. & Eileen M. Johnston, Mark & Crystal Totten, Peter & Rosemary E. Brinsek, Michael W. Lewis, Susan W. Frost, Clifford J. & Marion R. Peterson, Glade & Rayna Austin, Jane E. (Hafer) Wagers, Heidi & Gerald Montiel, Gene & Marilu Boe, Richard D. & Barbara Williams, Kim & Canda Linder. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1209 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Barry E. Fitzgerald & Dana Derrick (Fitzgerald), Elvin & Teresa Lerew, Michelle M. & Robert W. Babbel, Sally & Leslie Schaffer, Carmela Ann Jordan, Fritz Brian & Traci Robyn Jenkins, Brandon & Brenda York, Paul F. & Danielle A. Dacy, Phyllis M Snyder & Richard R. Snyder, Jr., Hilario & Lois Pardo, Bruce & Teresa Pyper, Yu Gui, Liang & Young Hong, Zheng, Marilynn Pearson, Rhonda & Glen Neff, June C. Smith, Bryce & Jeanne Maples, Gregory L. & Laura K. Gardner, Nicholas C. & Debra J. Smith, Allen & Nancy Lochner, David D. & Allene K. Stairs(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1208 Opt Out Letters from Nathan & Crystal Holden; Ron & Angela Peschke; Clay & Fay Cottingham; Sam K. & Mary Jo Eck; Richard & Renne Loucks; Richard E. & Penny L. Severin; John & Karen McDowell; Kimberley & Bruce Hasson; Michael P. & Jennifer D. Livi; Mark & Shannon Brand; Dennis J. & Laurel L. King; Frederic S. & Deborah A. Miller; Paul & Carol Budke; Leo & Linda Prentice; Roger D. Stickley & Doris D. Stickely Revocable Trust; Norman Lee & Susan M. Mark; Bruce A. & Joy M. Bilodeau; Celeste A. Kirk & James R. Van Osdell; Ryan Arakaki; Patrice Kilmartin; Loren & Michelle Gardner; John Richard & Julia Ann Raynor; Keith Kopitzke & Rosellen Kimbrough; Roger A. & Diana Kay Wheeler; Jon & Pamela MacLellan; Sandra L. Wiese; Virginia Reber; Robert & Audrey Lewis; Steve & Roberta Thompson; Ron & Sherry Newcomer; Tanya M. Field; Mariella Joyce Anderson; Ephraim & Elaine Morris; Robert Elton Bright; Linda Wentworth; Joyce Woods & Mark Brumley; Shirley Landels; Julius F. Bechly; Joe B. & Pauline F. McWhorter; Frank W. & Rose E. Soto; John & Charlene Pavlik; Ralph & Deanna Erickson; Paul & Tamie Sperling; Merle V. & Susan L. Tebbe; Margy Zylder; Peter H. Davidson; Daniel & Stephanie Kinley; Lloyd & Luana McAferty; Jack F. Korosky; and Sandra T. Allison. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1207 Opt Out Letters from: Downing, Randy and Lynette; Edlin, Ronald and Connie; Eissens, Brandon and Sherice; Farnes, Jesse and Becky; Fuentes, Esther and Armando; Gentry, Marcella L.; Gestrin, Robert W. and Verna J.; Geyer, Erik and Jennifer; Gravett, Donald and Debra; Grimes, Robert and Holli; Grudkowski, Dennis and Bahinova, Ouliana; Gubler, Keith A. and Marsha Lynne B.; Halliday, Ann and Terry; Hammack, Wallace, C.; Hardesty, John K.; Herrmann, Leslie; Hesselbacher, George and Judith; Hester, Jayson and Adrian; Holloman, David and Linda; Horton, Treneater C.; Howard, Daniel and Sandy; Hutter, Klaas and Dwenda; Johnson, Duane and Mary; Jones, Beth L. and Linter, Lynette; Jones, Ronald T. and Patricia W.; Kaulbars, Debra and Gerry. (wsnS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1206 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Robert A. & Maureen L. Short, Robert G. & Leslie F. Simmons, David Castro & Michelle Murphy, Richard A. & Sarah S. Bradbury, Randy & Jennifer Ward, Shawn & DeAnn Andreasen, Michael & Amy Mielke, Warner & Jacqueline Bruckner, David & Sandra Shinn, Jack W. & Marcella O. Lynch, Paul & Jeri Baron, Todd Gorham, Calvin R. & Tracey L. Elliott, Tyrone & Emily Henrie, Evelyn J. & Russ D. Johnson, Fred G. & Susan L. Baida, Donald & Melinda McClure, Darin & Denece Vincent, Chelsea Rae Larsen, Polly & Jeri R. Young(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1205 Opt Out Letters from: Abbott, Gary and Barbara; Aleksich, Mark and Darlyne; Anderson, Karen and Dana; Armenta, Nathan S. and Teresa M.; Bair, Jay D. and Trina J.; Bailey, Edward & Anne; Banks, Rod J. and Susan M.; Bauerle, Debra; Bekc, Sandra L. and Richard J.; Benson, Mark and Kathryn; Bias, Jo; Bleak, Morgan Wells and Jane DeLong; Bosarge, Garrett B.; Bosman, Delbert H. and Patricia A.; Brewer, Rone and Marcella; Bryson, Donald and Candice; Cahill, Matthew D.; Calderon, Richard and Nancy; Chappell, Jeffery and Margaret; Chatwin, Rick and Susie; Chilson, Ryan and Emily; Condron, Golda; Cruz, Rhonda E.; DeGal, Frank and Carole; Disney, Timothy and Leslie. (wsnS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1204 Opt Out Letters from Timothy & Patricia Ackerman; James C. & Rhonda L. Southern; Lawrence & Martha Knox; Ronald L. & Susan D. Bjorklund; Leenora Miller; Gregory & Carrie Stein; John & Carmen Southern; Jeanne Wright; Jackie K. Westover; Thomas R. Holz; Steve J. & Mayva J. Yaroslaski; Howard H. & Kaydene A. McIntosh; Belva Thompson; Mike & Daysi Nielson; Robert L. & Linda F. Bohn; William P. & Elizabeth A. Haberlach; Robert S. & Rebecca L. Webber; Robert S. Patterson; Carla Kuntz; Robert F. & Sandra R. Fry; Barbara Leanne & Mark E. Turner; Gary & Elene Patton; Hal & Sue Fitzke; Kim Sanders & Mike Hathaway; Albert A. & Marilyn Stephens; Heidi Dversdal; Orman & Deloyce Warren; Mark & Elizabeth Dieckhoff; Israel Miller & Totress Beasley; John & Michelle Foley; Susan Holland & Keith Armstrong; Zulie & Noor Visram; Susan & Jeff Tabler; Patrick & Michelle Murphy; Donald & Linda Williams; Dennis & Carey Fiess; Judy & Andy Kidd; Dale E. & Victoria D. Beaver; Shenton Tan & Beatrice Leung; Edmund A. & Connie K. Dunkinson; Denise M. & Heather A. Greear; Rodney K. Johnson; Helen D. & Arthur E. Maronek; Richard L. & Roberta J. Jones; John & Lynnette McGinnis; Bruce C. & Catherine A. Barry; Rene A., Jr. & Linda E. LaMarche; Roy W. Brewer; Shaun & Amy Schenkelberg; and, Iris Wehrle. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1203 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Mrs. Vera Tolbert-Brown & Mr. Sherman Brown, Barbara Zevela, Christean & Wayne Merrell, Anthony R. & Barbara Capobianco, James W. Wrider & Terrill L. Lane, Alfred Z. & Mary H. Campoy, Mark & Rebecca Acierno, James Edward & Linda Diane Newcomb, Dan & Georgia Hensley, Mike & Kelly Reinicke, David L. Badion, John R. Rojas, Mr. & Mrs. Richard & Kathleen Gruen, Elaine C. & J. Antonio Ayala, Jay S. & Karen L. Green, Angelina Nelson, Shirley J. Roberts, Dale & Lola Jean Bolton, Lyle & Denise Weber, Donald L. & Janice G. Gilbert (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1202 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By John J. Cherney, Jr., Robert Kraft, Harvey S. Greer & Allison L. Frazier, Dennis P. Destefano, Ellen M. Howard & Dorothy E. Stevens, Susan Inbar-Grecco, James H. & Sandra A. Trout, Sheila & David Lossner, Patrick & Vanessa Bauer, Lincoln B. & Janet P. Sorensen, Michael J. Terry, Andy & Susan Sevilla, Sabrina Miranda, Michael & Cathy Spatuzzi, John & Hazel Solis, Benjamin & Lisa Clede, Jee Young Kang & Bobby Kou, Sally J. Farrell, Donnell W. & Sally J. Farrell, Novella B. & Grace M. Gregory, Linda D. & Bruce L. Tolbert, Fred J. & Donna J. Dawson (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1201 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Frances Stocking, Ed & Patricia Vergara, Alice Brannan & Jane Buirgy, Arnold & Jacquelyn Thomas, Robert & Virginia Pearson, Edward & Shirley Princl, Samuel William Billison, Jr., & Joanneelizabeth Billison, Carlos Eric de leon, Barabara & James Morrison, James & Tamara Kiman, Dean & Jane C. Murphee, Dyann Reilly, Kimberly & John Squire, James & Christina Birchman, William & Sue Snyder, Charles & Kandice McCallum, Jason Coon & Terri Rollins-Coon, Thomas W. & Julie A. Fraser, Brian P. & Mary Beth Kelly, Robert E. Housley, Jr., & Youngeun Kim (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1200 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Aray & Kyra Taddesse, Janice W. & Roger M. Griffin, James 7 Anita Robinson, Jill Cannefax & Carroll Cannefax (deceased), Felix Conteras, Jr., & Elizabeth Contreras, Cal & Kathi Borman, Robert Green & Judith Rice, Edward L. & Linda Wolf, Bert & Bobbie Weyland, Lisa & John Helvey, Bonnie J. & Peter A. Kranenburg, Diane & James E. Raaum, William D. & Karen M. Jones, Steven R. & Dawn D. Neumiller, Frank & Bonnie Lancaster-Jones, Theresa Roscoe, Ronald W. & Helen M. Hicks, Corlee Corning, Jorge Riquelme, Ronald & Dorothy Terry (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1199 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Delores E. & Edward M. Andrusky, James E. & Kimberly A. Andrews, Frank A. & Suzanne F. Bishop, Bill & Tracee Schnell, Ronald R. & Antoinette K.D. Starrett, Joyce B. Beazer, John S. & Vikki L. Goodman, Raymond & Mary Pettersen, Anne M. & Irvin J. Hollingsworth, James & Catherine Griswold, Manuel B. Anduha, III & Tracy L. Anduha, Phuong Nguyen & Charlene Pham, Peter Dinh & Patricia Ngo, Rodney E. & Joan M. Moye, Roger & Diane Eelkema, Mark R. & Victoria L. Nelson, Tim & Marie McManus, Gary L. & Virginia A. Van Meter, Susan L. & Norman H. Karrer, Michael F. Burror & Donna Reed(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1198 OPT-OUT Letters: from Robert L. Hazell, David R. and Lisa J. Boucher McCall Gerry Donohoe and Michelle Johnson, S. Darlene Luvaas, Mark and Karen Evans, Thomas Shepard, John and Sherly FitzPatrick, Dean L. Scott, Mary Lou Love, Douglas E. and Christine L. Phillips, Carolyn R. Ah Sam, Malarei M. Ackerson, Judith Alexander, George A. and Dorothy J. Cantrell, Terry Della, Mary Riley, Brandy and Paul Selby, Michael A. and Debera Centofante, Todd and Kimberly Funasaki, Charles D. and Sheila Leingang, Bernard M. and Anastacia R. Tagalan. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1197 OPT-OUT Letters: from Alan & Francetta Preston, Christon C. & Donna Butler, Carl Wayne and Kay Lynn Howard, Nellie Ann Tresch, Stanley H. and Violet J. McCreary, Tim & LeeAnn Campbell, Gailen Zody, Rene Peralta, Michael and Ronda Welker, Gary D. and Sylvia Ackerman, Danielle L. Mullen, John C. and Bonita C. Ott, Rena C. Montanez, James and Marcia Olson, Margaret and Peter Mould, Jordan Haythornwaite, Nathan and Ivonne Heber, George C. and Mary Jane Dodge, Dimitrios and Nadia Mumulidisz, Tom & Kathryn Patten. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1196 OPT-OUT Letters: from Robert Phelps and Sandi Phelps, Richard and Ricarose Novy, Gene Grefe and Charlotte Grefe, David J. and AnnaMarie Tighe, Lillian Sidhu, Michael McLean, Dolores Skold, Neil & Carla Murdock, Susan Judd, Samuel G. and Bernice F. Wadsworth, Jacob and Pamela Ellis, Stephen D. and Mary M. Morgan, Ronald Jay Dowdy & Jean Y. Dowdy, William E. & Cheryl A. McCraw, Robert and Laurel O'Loughlin, Ed and Barbara Berthiaume, Keith W. Oien and Nancy Lee Oien, Clarence & Constance Rosenbalm, Kevin and Eugenia Beckstrom. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1195 OPT-OUT Letters: from Richard Poppert, Alvin J. Coleman Jr., Misty N. Coleman, George Stoess, Todd and Diana J. Burlington, Terry & Kathy Patton, Mary O'Sullivan, Mike Foss, John and Maxine O'Brien, Terry Canfield, Brian R. and Grace M. Kutzke, James J. McKelvey & Noncie D. McKelvey, Linda L. Ellis Mellott, Dewey K. and Karen M. Abbott, Michael R. Zuvela and Darla S. Zuvela, Edythe Hudson, Susan D. Mechals, Pam Schill, Debra K. Hughes & Dale B. Hughes, Richard L. Koon, Christopher adn Dori Torrence, Tim and Jeannette Friesen. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1194 OPT-OUT Letters: from Henri Moreau, Debby, J. McCormack, Steven J. & Linda L. Wilhelmi, Linda & Tim Gridley, Joyce M. Clark, Richard A. Fesler, David McNamara, Joyce McNamara, Wendy Barlow, Larry J. & D. Jean Bybee, Mark L. & Leslie V. Donaldson. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1193 Opt-Out Letters from Wayne & Jessie Maupin; Richard & Patricia Olson; Polagaya Fine; Joan Cartwright; Christopher Price & Emily Oakden; Dave & Dorothy Godrrey; Luanne Anderson; Kirk & Lisa Groenig; Ronald & Lois Toon; Jana & Jay Pleggenkuhle; Maria Tuttle; Theodore & Sherri Madison; Susan Coffman; David White & Danita Kelly; Donald & Marsha Corning; William Holt; Ruben & Emma Luevano; Robert Rodriguez & Julie Noack (Rodriguez); Ernest King, Jr.; Brian & Annmarie Gillam. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1192 Opt-Out Letters from Darryl & Kelly Weddington; Ann Schramm; Robert & Mary Jo Schmidt; John Appeldorn; Curley Holden Sr.; Geoffrey Fulton & Christine Longley; Ryan & Naomi Jaffe; Carol Littleton; Helen Tindall; Jane Masayo Kawasaki; Glen & Lorraine Hampshire; Tyler & Melissa Tippetts; John Gould; Nick Xalis; Israel Cerano; Carol Cerano; Elizabeth Ransdell; David Bender & Catherine Harker; Ronald & Luetta-Rae Girardin; Phillip & April Gardner. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1191 Opt-Out Letters from Joel & Colleen McCloud; Craig & Naomi Minette; Thomas & Patricia Brown; Jim & Deanne Padrick; Delisia Gonzalez; Ruel & Sandie Oller, Manuel & Resurreccion Oller; Richard & Denise Pine; Sandra Alva; Gary Spina; Joseph & Nancy Penzola; John & Linda Jordeson; Annette & Alfred Bork; Mary & Harry Macksey; Ronald & Mond Kayton; Nola & Justin Judd, Jonathan Milligan & Justin Judd; James & Cynthia Jackson; Karen & Dennis Treichel; Michael & Tamara McCoy; Richard & Joan Gilcrist; Thomas & Darby Schofield. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1190 Opt-Out Letters from Robert Weeks & Deanna Hopper; Violet & Maher Kozman; Roger & Esther Macadaeg; John Miller & Lynne Brooke; Diane Brown; Raymond & Debra Jones; Roy & Marjorie Henderson; Susan Curtis; Fred & Emiko Miller; Kenyon & Lynn De Vaney; Christopher McDonald; Dana & Denise Thornton; Jennifer & Eric Starkey; Chris & Jasmin Stacey; Richard de Villers; Daniel Stimbert & Karen Stimbert; Marshall & Janice Applegate; Mary Fischer; Clayton & Wendy Fast; Rachel Williams & Jed Stickgold. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1189 Opt-Out Letters from Anthony & Elizabeth Springman; Sharon & Michael Purser; Katsuo & Kazuyo Kano; Vince & Kerri Houser; Joseph & Leila Martin; Bonnie Meyers; Elgin Laizure; Robert Conner; Louis & Laurie Bauman; Michael Rainey & Joyce del C Rainey (Botacio); Ken & Barbara Hatch; Robin & Andrew Warninghoff; Gregory & Lauren Curnutte; Karen & Bruce Dunker; Ana Rubio & Jeff Bailey III; Mark & Andrea Gunther; Glenn Baxter; Gary & Carla Hakes; Trevor & Daisy Wong; Alan & Brenna Williams (Fawcett). (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1188 OPT-OUT LETTERS from L. Brent Van Reenen and Susan G. Van Reenen; Kathy Scofield and Terrence Scofield; Jerry Schneider and Robyn Schneider; Jack L. Picard and Julie M. Picard; Ron Kirkpatrick and Patricia Kirkpatrick; Michael Poe and Nancy Florence; Michael Johnson and Karen Johnson; Christine L. Collins; Richard V. Miller and Marylen E. Miller; Lucia C. Klaas and Robert K. Klaas; Howard Thomas Heath; Andy Lee and Yaling Tung; Michael B. Ottman and Janice A. Ottman; Leigh Wilson and Ed Elam; Mary Ann Borchert; Rebecca Ryan; Kristin Maceranka Sandford; Richard Hail and Marcy Hail; Douglas Higuera and Laurie Higuera; Edward Lechner and Linda M. Lechner. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1187 OPT-OUT LETTES: Karen Reffel, Thomas E. & Sylvia Saddler, Christopher B. & Deborah L. Dutoit, Sotiros (Sid) & Betsy Pisanis, Donna & Gary Meyer, Linda M. Rehm, Maryann E. Nuckolls, Larraine Darrington, Dan & Georgia Hensley, Daniel R. & Mercedes B. Dominguez, Melanie Hill, Roy M. Harris, Cindy Chiaverini (Pending last name change to White), Arthur & Mary Smith, Gary & Sandra Deutscher (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1186 Opt Out Letter from Mowen Yang; Valerie Marlow; Dennis K. & Tina L. Bauer; Patrick & Patricia Reek; Carol E. Orsi-Sebastiani; Harold M. & Lenore M. Carille; Susan Mirabelli & David Carmichael; Betty Beard; Duane & Barbara Ireland; Randy & Linda Banks; Pamel F. Down; Miguel & Josie Pichardo; John A. Thorson & Rosemarie Thorson; Linda Hax & The Linda Hax Trust; Lily & George Young; Craig A. Tuss & Barbara L. Tuss; Michael Leuthold & Susan Hills; Carol M. Lown; Sonia & Arthur Ergin; and Lance & Holly M. Lasky. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1185 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Dennis Dawson and Jan Dawson; David Grunenfelder and Alana Grunenfelder; Terry H. Suwyn and Sandra L. Suwyn; Bradley Wolfe and Lois Wolfe; Gloria E. Greene; Martin Lieberman and Ricki Lieberman; Clyde Hendrickson and Norma Hendrickson; Darrin Whitaker and Rebekah Whitaker; Patricia Mae Shelton; Alice Weaver; Krista A. Medina; Diane Yu-Quigley and Kevin Quigley; Charlotte Edginton; David Jordan and Amy Jordan; Melvin Peters and Barbara Peters; Linda A. Niedziejko; William Norman and Deborah Norman. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1184 Opt Out Letter from Gerd K. & Cheryl L. Werner; Carolyn Kay Holcomb; Luciano & Emy Chan Meiorin; Dennis L. & Andrea Canfield; Leo L. & Linda K. Valley; Carolann K. Ford; David Gruenhagen; Truly G. Bemis; Lloyd & Barbara Frasier; Merlin & Kay Moon; Rita Fehr; Sarah Molina & Robert Rectenwald; Ronald L. & Leonie Grill; Martin & April Beals; Rudy & Hilda Reimer; Gary & Carol Neal; Helen J. Kwong; Peter Woelk; John Brown; and John R. Hull. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1183 Opt Out Letters from: Schmitt, Ronald and Kathryn; Senator, David; Shapiro, Debbie; Shepard, Beth E.; Short, Darrel J. and Marcia J.; Skagen, Ted H. and Ludie L.; Slack, Mary Kristin and Siebrands, Alda L.; South, Julia and Rodger; Stamp, Tammy; Steffen, Robert A. and Marsha M. Trustees of the Robert A. and Marsha M. Steffen Living Trust Dated April 28, 2003; Stegemann, Duane F.; Stewart, Susan E.; Thiessen, Michael; Thomas, Gary and Yvonne; Toepfer, Aaron C. and Laura J.; Torseth, Morris and Klaas-Torseth, Corina; Tucker, Kenneth R. and Evelyn L.; Turner, Marilyn; Turner, Nathan and Jennifer; Valencia, Miguel A. and Diane Rhetta; Van Beek, Harold J. and Debbra J.; Webb, G. Merrill and Lynette. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1182 Opt Out Letters from Lynn & Katherine Reinhardt; Joseph D. Jackson & Luvenia Collins; Laura & Brianna Schuchardt; Ronald J. Gell & Cynthia Marquoit; Keith & Lisa Leffingwell; Theron Friberg; Walter V. & Jane S. Thomas; Miye Arikawa & Derek Lee; Martin & Laura Feldt; Donna M. Strickler; Christine Villanis; Randolp & Megan Teates; Richard & Christine Hawkins; Robert & Sharron Eberhardt; Charles & Lorene Lillywhite; Gabrielle Jackson & Robert Linn; Segundo & Jennifer Aquino; Dan M. & Vickie L. Poulsen; Bliss & Mary Ann Roberts; and, Robert Medina & Debra Williams. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1181 Opt Out Letters from: Hatten, Janet; Lavoioe, Michael and Jean; Neff, Ronald M. and Juliana A.; Negrete, Ernest and Priscilla; Neir, Charles J. and Kathleen K.; Oberlender, Yvonne W.; Ormond, Barbara; Palmer, Tommy R. and Karen L.; Pelland, Brian and Laurie; Petersen, Mark and Carla; Poloney, Elizabeth Davis and Mark; Reynon, Larry and Sharon; Pigeon, Todd and Susan; Porter, David W. Jr.; Remington, Debralee C. and Dennis F.; Roberson-Strange, Jer; Rublee, Margaret and Vernon; Rude, Mae and Kathy; Sanabria Cruz, Jose Luis and Peterson de Sanabria, Renee K.; Sario, Markku A. and Jacqueline B; Schauer, Audrey J. and Gilbert E. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1180 Opt Out Letters from Catherine Spanton-Bilyard; Peter V. Lancisero; Linda & Robert Stroope; Amy Rebecca Lynch; E. Marie Torrillo; Colin & Maryrose Watson; James & Linda Griffis; Philip & Judy Backlund; Dorothy & Michael Virgil; James L. & Maria A. Kay; Toni Sadlowski; Melvin & Delores Dennis; Richard G. & Linda A. Wasill; Wayne & Joan Davidson; Donald & Nelda Grant; Miles G. Joseph; Sholomo & Deborah Libeskind; Jan Limburg; Frank G. & Rosaine B. Vasquez; and, Norman E. & Modeen S. Koch. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1179 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Paul Davidson and Shirley Davidson; Delbert L. Oien; Vince Prebanda and Sandra Prebanda; Peter Pelkey and Patricia Pelkey; Frank Billington IV and Wendi Billington; Craig Beals; Anne McAvoy; Diana L. Devine; Theodore J. Mannaert and Catharina M. Mannaert; Robert Candelaria and Janis Candelaria; Regina Laird; Wendell Hathaway and Linda Hathaway; Toby J. Weber; Bruce A. Heath and Kristine M. Heath; Diana Jo Evans and Billy D. Evans; Cory Carter; Ronald M. Lamm; Barbara Silvey and Norman Silvey; David J. Barnes; Jeremy Julian and Michelle Julian; Gary Brewer and Linda Brewer; Jacob Lambert and Victoria Lambert; Rick Lessley and Kathy Lessley. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1178 Opt Out Letters from: Melton, Samuel E. and Marilyn R.; McNeal, Vicki; Moore, Ivan and Beth; Lombardy, George and Phillis; McKeown, Dennis and Nancy; Moreau, Henri; Mahoney, Michael and Chris; McManis, Donald L. and Elizabeth E.; Laine, Paula; Lipa, Shirley; Lee, Sylvia; Karstens, Pamela; Lipkin, Mark; Martinez, George; Marcoux, Joshua; Lara, Jimmie and Stephanie; Keast, Harry R. and Elizabeth S; Lovgren, Robert Chris and Jacobs, Merrie Lee; Linfood, Gae. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1177 Opt Out Letters from: Holmberg, James G. and Lyn R.; Heuer, Gwen and Taulbee, Walter R.; Figueroa, Scott and Mary Lynn; Huibregtse, Charles D. and Gail F.; Hogan, Timothy T. and Pamela J.; Farago, George and Katalin; Franzen, Wolfgang Otto; Hafen, Mazle, K. and Kristen C.; Frost, Richard W. and Theodora M.; Gibbons, Richard and Alexandrina; Flock, Janice L.; Gomez, Carmen and George; Hennel, Charles and Margaret; Gilman, Chester L.; Groneck, Paul and Houghton-Groneck, Gena; FitzPatrick, Vincent and Sally; Forinash, Rose M. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1176 Opt Out Letters from: Di Giacomo, Kathy and Robert; Chambers, Kenneth and Barbara; Campoy, Augustine Z. and Leah J.; Billings, Roger E.; Adams, James E. and Sheila E; Farshoukh, Razan and Nabil; Engen, Ralph and Julieanne; Cooley, Gerrie A. and Christina L.; Cooper, Eileen and Peter; Carpenter, Frank and Merrilee; Croonquist, John E. Sr. and Elizabeth A.; Bennett, Chester A. Jr. and Shelia Kay; Douglas, Frank and Patty; Baker, John F. III and Kristine; Davis, Shirl and Bonnie; Bowling (Riley-Tidd), Rebecca; Bergsagel, Luis and Colleen; Biddinger, Stephen and Robin; Bottomly, Tennie; Berry, Allen R. and DiAnne; Dutton, Scott and Heather. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1175 OPT OUT Letters from: Diana C. Wigand; Thomas W. & Beverly J. Cox; Donald F & Norma Lynn Lary; Donald E. & Patricia L. Netherda; Jerry & Bonny Pettigrew; Raymond & Lillian Howard; Greg & Shelley Leith; Charles K. & Caroline E. Elliott; Sharyn O'Hara and Erin O'Hara; Linda M. & Michael R. Gutierrez; Chazen Family Trust, Melvin & Dorothea Chazen; Yevonne Luo; Guadalupe Chavez; Keith & Betty Rodman; Frank Smith and Sherry Seitzer; Bridget Duggan; Elizabeth S. Rivera; Gene & Ruth McCracken; Rebecca DeSagun; and, Allen L. Danzig and Judityh S. Herz. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1174 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Evan Barton; Kenneth R. Sebby; Michael Willis and Dorothy Wilke; Edward Lucke and Joan Lucke; Dawn L. Kraft; John Schostak and Shelley Dorfman Schostak; Michael T. Flatley and Linda L. Flatley; Donna Kelley; John Presler and Silva Presler; James S. McClelland and Wanda E. McClelland; Irene Haines; Monika I. Voege; Dennis Schmit; Judith R. Nessen; Tracy Bailey and Loan Bailey; Diana Swartz; Ukwenga Oleru and Ngozi Oleru. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1173 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Allan R. Northrup and Sharon K. Northrup; Jim Aitchison and Laverne Aitchison; Gary Albert and Barbara Albert; Elizabeth Posner and Toto Jost; Ronald P. Brown and Fran L. Brown; Samuel Collins and Andrea Collins; James F. Parazoo and Carolyn A. Parazoo; Barbara Myers; James D. Opitz and Eleanor S. Opitz; Gerald P. Nystrom and Eleanor Q. Nystrom; Frank L. Mc Aninch and Katherine J. Mc Aninch; R. Scott Weaver and Bonnie Weaver; Maria R. Edge and Richard L. Edge; James Skaggs and Patricia Skaggs; Amanda Minoza and Jennifer Minoza; Robert L. Maxey and Delorus M. Maxey; Linda Sue Matson; Ronald V. Raschio; Danielle Scofield and Allan Niemi; Edwin D. Jackson, Sr. and Gloria Jackson; Neil Holley; Larry Powell and Bettina Powell; Barbara Pullar; Christina Carmelich. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1172 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Donald & Elizabeth Bolton, Fred M. & Betty L. Phillips, Jane Connors & Clyde Nelson, Robert E. & Julie M. Wetzel, Paul J. & Constance R. Kleine, Richard C. Graham, Joanne Blayman & David Rhodes, Kristina S. & Robert Brown, William A. Kearney, Jr., & Laura L. Kearney, Algene Ott Mendiola, Lyle Thomsen, Roger K. & Bonita Sorensen, William A. III & Deltha F. Jacob, Jennifer Boettner-Kral, Carmen Hernandez-Flores & Amelia Flores Herandez, Jeffrey D. & Carol S. Laux, Donna Kortman, Dawn Sommers, Richard & Claudia Frisbie, Patrick & Linda Hoffert (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1171 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Jeffrey & Kimberly Louie, Luis M. & Barbara A. Crawley, James & Anne Krause, Penny Goodrich, Jennifer & Glenn May, Tracy Link, Valerie Thurlow-Campbell, Helga Hrowal, Lisa & Brian Michler, Diana Lynn Nicosia, Randy L. & Joyce N. Crow, Katherine Chin, David & Doris L. Aybar, Fidel & Maria Elena Zamudio, Rodney & Philomine Moore, Emma Manalo, Brian & Kathryn Ballard, Jill & Shiou C. Kwan, Jesse & Stephanie Empey, Thomas & Elizabeth (Libbie) Hamann (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1170 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Robert L. & Cathy Townsend, William E. & Jacqueline S. Carpenter, Keith Torlief & Sheryl Lee Engstrom, Larry & Ina Nepsund, Joseph Morris & Emily Ross Morris, Patricia (Trish) Ybarrondo, Estrella M. Pipo, Thomas J. Siler, Sr., & Cathleen McGrath Siler, Ricardo & Evelyn Benavides, Preston & Tracy Aldous, Anh & Arnaud Dufour, Shelah Spiegel & Rudy B. Morgan, William Pulliam & Peggy Anderson, Sam Loo, Babbette M. Sell, James V. Jagger, Fabiola E. Villamil, David H. Horne, Sung & Hanna Kim, Juan A. & Cyndi Sharp (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1169 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Arlen R. & P. Theresa Schmidt, Leroy Gill, Lee Ann Carter, James & Constance A. Murphy, Elizabeth S. & Hazel D. Houston, Mike & Shannon Sutherland, Michael & Trisha Mastromarino, Dale & Trischa Blok, Teresa L. Primrose, Rose Mary Camren & Alex Blackwell, Dennis J. & Gail E. Wildermuth, Peter & Monica Stewart, Winfried Mark & Sylvia Marie Dirks, Bohdan John Huzyk & Vera Diane Harding, Ronald & Esther Rempel, Gail Young & John Erickson, Mr. & Mrs. JL Stypa, Kai & Heather Barnhart, Dale H. Angerman, Robert S. Runkle & Mary Beth Jorgensen (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1168 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Edward J. Smith, Jeffrey Lynn Miller, Ray & Lucy Higgs, James P. Weis & John R. Fleming, Matthew & Patti Westby, Stanley P. & Deborah A. Fillips, Doreen M. & Milton D. Wolf, Dieter & Diane Herforth, William A. & Joan A. Wilson, Olivia Jane Dudley, Gary D. & Judy L. Crick, Molly M. Carey, Beverly & Barbara Minnis, David & Elizabeth Krommenhoek, Steven D. & Christine P. Reed, Brett R. & Kelly Bezzant, LaRue Barlow, Deon & Helen Johnson, R. Lance & Tiffany A. Mendenhall, Zanita H. & Robert D. Vincent (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1167 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Matthew A. & Caitlin A. Bodin, Dennis G. & Christina M. Ott, Derek & Jilliam Bain, Bruce C. & Dorothe S. Whyte, Barbara L. White, Linda Vander Wende, Sean & Hallie Murray, H. Bruce & Barbara J. Cullings, Robert & Karen Wilcox (aka Robert L. Wilcox 7 Karen L. Wilcox Family Trust), Scot D. & Stephanie L. Bitters, Kevin Clark, William & Yvette Salama, Candice L. Harrington, Debbie & Boaz Aylott, Richard Tussing, George K. & Linda D. Kaeo, Karyn Vogt, Elaine Ly, Stephen & Jacquie Rivera, Harold F. & Theresa McNeel(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1166 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By James Jason & Jennifer R. Sultzer, Joe & Elizabeth Bradshaw, Robert & Linda Taylor, David & Janis Ridlon, Colleen M. Kelly & Keith D. Anderson, Lynn N. Jenks, Beth Butler, David L. & Valerie L. Mellon, Calvin Riggs, Brenda & Richard Frutschy, Clay & Karen Mottaz, Thai Nguyen & George Rubio, Heriberto Reynaga & Maria Ramirez, Debbie K. Caudle, Robert & Joan Burns, Jack & Helen Hustad, Kirby R. McDonald, Rebecca Kocis, Salvadore & Gayle Mori, Lynn & Gilberta Hendrickson Family Trust Fund (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1165 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Joseph E. & Laura L. Funderburgh, Mary Jo Steele, Patrick A. & Carol L. Mack, Christine Shean, Maureen & Richard Tuttle, Donna Caesar & James Riddlesprigger, Larry D. & Cheryl K. Price, Gloria M. & Norman R. Hudson, Diane & Jeffrey Monsen, Scot A. & Denise R. Osborne, Joshua & Joy Howard, Michael B. & Kay Robertson, Gary & Jarette Haarklau, Richard & Ruth Bailey, R.F. Peters, Susan & Christon Horstman, Rodney Craig & Diane F. Reaveley, Steve & Rebecca Price, Jeffrey L. Ostler, David & Judy Garff (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1164 OPT-OUTS LETTERS: By Ralph & Barbara Lovelace, Mitchell & Patricia Candido, R. Mason & Kimberly Eves, Brian & Jody Hanna, Jack & Barbara Ashworth, Elliott R. & Dale I. Estes, Edward R. & Carol I. Maas, Clinton & Tracy Sisco, Mr. Stephen & Mrs. Kathleen White, Greville Geoffrey & Virginia Lee Edgelow, Gaybrielle & Alan Butler, Stephanie Renee Seales, Barbara M. & Robert L. Leutwiler, John H. & Suzanne A. Christensen, Dale & Carole Pflederer, James E. & Elizabeth Vincent, Peter & Olga Furda, Hubert N. Flowers, Jamie & Cash Cockerill, David C. & Sue A. Gehr (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1163 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Andrew Yan; Carol Commendatore and James J. Commendatore; James Besendorfer and Lila Besendorfer; Eric Van Stralen and Diane Van Stralen; Dean E. Pollinger and Sharon K. Pollinger; Robert A. Larkin and Lisa M. Larkin; Shawn Kennedy and Margaret Kennedy; Gilbert Yuen and Joyce Yuen; Madeline Kroblauch and Renee Dowlin; Rochelle Selvin; Kellie deRuyter; Karen Powk; Ruby Bukovac Hardy; Marion J. Aiken and Barbara M. Aiken; Carol Garcia and Anthony Garcia; William O. Moore and Audrey Moore; Victor Richardson and Patricia E. Richardson; Dean Cowles and Andra Cowles; BJ Blakely; Susan C. Imig; Carl Peterson and Amparo Peterson; Maria Evelina Tablan and Claire N. Ramos; Kevin Jones and Rosemary Jones; Elana Rolene Singleterry; Robert Watts and Sherrie L. Watts; Robert Willson and Marcia Willson; R. John Vanderberg and Bonnie Vanderberg; Keith L. Flickinger and Naomi Flickinger; Darlene Justice; Jeannie M. Francis; Sandra P. Thompson. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1162 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Thomas M. & Vera Jan Colllier, Patrick L. & Yvonne M. Weidner, Joanne Haddy & Paul Vukelich, Wade A. & Kimberly G. Padgett, David & Debra Brimhall, Lenora Crowson, Michael C. & Lisa Leavitt, Aaron M. & Christina N. Hackett, Jean O. Reinicke, Scott & Briana Grow, Lawrence & Frances E. Wright, Paul Wayne Douberly, Judith Friedlander, Milton M. & Melissa J. Bliss, Chad & Melissa Thornburgh, Steven G. & Janet J. Bailey, Jerry L. & R. Carlene Palmer, Donald & Joan Green, Robert & Sandra Justis, Samnang & Sophary Thach, Roy G. Graham (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1161 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Paul H. & Kiris M. Silva, Mary McClure & Frank E. James, Terry L. Prewett & Billy Howard Prewett (deceased), Aaron & Jerrily Crandall, Galen L. & Lila Preston, Eric R. & Marilyn J. Nevala, Deanna J. Weber, Christopher A. & Amy J. McHenry, Edwin F. & Joyce A. Vogt, Thaddeus Berry, Stanley & Trisha Arnott, Pete & Joyce Merrill, Rodger & Christie Spero, Lynnie & Deborah Arnott, Tad Folendorf, Linda & Randall O'Haver, Shirley M. Ingram, Tami Elliott, Elias C. & Adela V. Villarreal, Ruby Matthews, Randall & Lynn Marry Reynolds (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1160 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Geraldine G. Smith, Lance Stover, Tereasea Stover & Linda Wise, Renee Knapp, K. Karin Stormo & Richard E. England, James C. & Marilee F. Lake, James V. & Patsy A. Phelps, Sally C. Harris, Jose & Josephine Stacruz, William C. & Pat D. Donnelly, Antoinette M. & O. George Wells, Richard & Evelyn Primo, Darrell G. & Margaret J. Kemper, Christy L. Wilner, Jack C. & Suzanne Wilson, James D. Kathrine D. Brittingham, Ronald & Wilma Wagner, Joseph D. & Anna Elam, Roger E. & Lisa L. Anderson, Ronald L. & Carol J. Robinson, Thomas J. & Phyllis A. Albus (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1159 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Bernadette & Eduardo Gamez, Dennis Scott & Kathleen Mary Moses, Benjamin & Valerie Young, Chris & Angel Williams, John & Christina Besand, Laurette Gerber, Jime & Lori Mader, Karen Hible, Julie Sanchez, Arthur Creek & Shana Harvey, Terry & Anna Hoard, John & Michelle Wilbur, Arthur & Mary Ciuffo, Larry A. & Darlene A. Hartnell, Leslie & Linda Feigel, William S. Wright & Lily O. Viray-Wright, Ed & Linda Highman, Kathleen E. Watts, James & Nancy Knode, Kathleen M. & David K. Roland (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1158 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Jeffrey Allan and Eleanor Snively; Charles Barton and Patricia Barton; Rodney Earls and Elizabeth C. Earls; Noma L. Horne; Ronald Hayes and Holly Hayes; Willard A. Mears and Meredith J. Mears; Jon P. Lannom and Sally D. Lannom; Gregory H. Bancroft and Ann M. Bancroft; Daniel C. Bangle and Melinda F. Bangle; Steve Davis and Maureen Davis; Hilario T. Moncado; Matthew T. Washington and Susana Washington; Thomas Clemmer and Rosita Clemmer; Harold Winkler and Joyce Winkler; Judith Anne Peltier; Thomas C. Kenny and Suzanne C. Kenny; Kristine E. Sevy and Jeffrey E. Sevy; Ana R. Carone; Carley P. Angell; Clyde W. Barton and Wendy W. Barton; C. Michael Lawrence and Lori Lawrence; Alfred C. Brum, Jr. and RoseMary O'Malley-Brum. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1157 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By James F. Greenwood, Allison & Bill Reid, Robert A. & Debra A. Bacon, Gary & April Horne, Gerald & Jane Wiser, Douglas N. & Patricia M. Pearce, Gary D. & Sue Ransom, Dave & Denise Cottrell, V. Lee & Terry Budell, Peg Hunter aka Peggy Hunter, Suzanne Maloney, Sheldon J. & Vicki H. Oakeson, Denise J. Achelis, Edward & Stephanie Callahan, Jesse & Katrina Bullock, Scott W. & K. Claire Barton, Stanley & Valerie Elison, Natalie Daniels, Jeffrey M. Nelson, Michael Carson Ricks & Patrick Joseph O'Connor (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1156 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Jennifer Lofberg, Terry S. & Toni M. Hayes, Bret D. & Sandra J. Bryan, Helen & Paul Holt, M. Kathleen & James Ochs, Jr., Ann M. Perkins & Pamela L. Martin, Michael & Elizabeth Allen, David B. & Clare Burton, Lenore E. Doyle & Beth L. Johnson, Charles E. & Mary S. Whitmer, Wanda L. & James R. Hightower, Robert F. & Evelyn L. Burt, Joe Machnik, Ralph M. & Cynthia C. Sims, Mark Roberts & Debbie Deibert, Jeremy & Deon Douglass, Diana & John Lacayo, Lonnie I. & Susan J. Lynch, Paul & Patricia Carroll, Lisa B. Haden(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1155 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Pamela J. Tew and Terry N. Tew; Richard Lindolff and Sherri Lindolff; Joy Panella and Albert Panella; Marsha Gallardo and Michael Gallardo; Carol L. Babcock; Leslie R. Dooley; Sandra Tiffany; Brenda Chavez and Alfred P. Chavez; Victor Yoder and Cheryl Yoder; Leonard L. Bull and Judelle K. Bull; Toni A. Brough; Richard D. McCurdy and Jane L. McCurdy; Charles E. Morgen and Kathleen A. Morgen; Carolina Juarez and Charles Afflerbach; Cheryl C. Shawl; Stephen Allmer and Penny Allmer; Marlene R. Tobia; Julie A. Glass; Christine Livingston; Jennifer Sharp; Walter E. Hargis and Judy L. Hargis; Don J. Moore and Julie A. Moore; Jack Messer and Harriett Messer. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1154 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Michael Castro & Marjorie Biagi, Chuck & Karin Diepholz, Celia Farr, Kimberly R. Homstad, William P. & Betty J. Ball, Susan I. Moore, Geri Boyd, Linda L. Witherell, Barbara J. Overton, Larry & Lisa Souza, Katherine & Charles Lapinsky, Nazer V. & Teresita S. Lagrimas, Balente Lozano, Jr., & Antonia R. Lozano, Rudolfo Flores & Anya Hall-Flores, James E. Marion, Keith A. & Marce M. Gresham, Jerry & Susie Sawyer, David & Staci Hoskins, John P. & Audrey d. Carroll, Judith A. Glenn(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1153 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Terry L. Smith, David W. & Mary Anne Alexander, Yolanda A. Martin, Linda Lee Reyelts, Michelle S. Olsufka, Clyde & Michele Nordgren, Mike Nguyen, Audrey Thompson, Harold Vinson, David Wischmeier, Taunja & Kevin VanderVaate, Ms. Virginia Jones, Alonna L. & Steven L. Farrar, Jerome & Michelle Aigner, Robert & Angela Smith (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1151 Opt-Out Letters: from Bob and Anna Lum, Scott and Julie MacGregor, Elizabeth L. & Theodore D. Olszowy, Julia Fritz, Lorana J. Myers, Lauren L. and Cheryl A. Locey, Christa & Mariano Domingo, Helmut and Erika Sawatzky, Mary L. Sandage-Valencia, Roger Liu and Meiju Chi, Don and Nancy Bell, Greg and Diana Kenyon, David Sullivan, Jim Busselberg, Scott and Shirley Sutton, Mark D. and Robin Lynn Hansen, Judith E. N. Quimby (Charles Quimby, deceased), Pamela Wilcut, Kent and Rozanne Ruseell, Annette Pratte, Morley & Phyllis Margolis. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1150 Opt-Out Letters: from Carl F. and Peggy D. Raynor, Heather Johnson, Susan Ishida, Robert W. and Marita C. Smith, Denise Newman, Gennifer Hamilton, Ruthann Gedeon-Gaude, Scott and Trudy Reese, Donald M. and Sonja M. Gill-More, Paul and Danielle Lovette, Jo Hofmann, Michael Brass & Donna Brass, Chris & Dominga Brenneisen, Daniel Rojas, Judith Custy Myers, Kim and Donna Rosiar, Arlene A. Tiegs, James A. Dawson, Brynn Darlington, Mike Siegrist, Lewis and Angela Griggs. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1149 Opt-Out Letters: from Michelle Jernigan, Rickie D. Nelson, Holly Toboni, Mark E. and Cheryl R. Klein, Stephen E. Francoeur, Deborah Hermes, Ted Etsell and Lee Lovitt, Daniel P. and Patricia A. Conant, Lloyd and Beth Davis, Marlon T. & Virginia R. Ibarra, Veronica Baird, Kenneth and Lois Moore, Dean and Delinda Logsdon Roger W. and Karen E. Erickson, Henry Sandoval and Dolores A. Carbajal-Sandoval, Sandra O'Reilly, Ian Barclay Berry, Nicole Mitchell, John Howard, Sam Michael, Mary Jane and George Correa, Ronnie L. Berrow. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1148 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Milford Horton & Frances Horton, Della M. Smith, Scott Kameda & Amy Kameda, James Bradley Knott, Mark Stephen Souder, Christopher J. Lickey & Janet R. Lickey, Lois Johnson & Lori Liebhauser, Jack G. Gates & Fan M. Gates, Lloyd Rash, D. Garth McLeod & E. Sharon McLeod, Joseph M. Baca & Michelle J. Baca, John T. Roberts, Sheryl Nygard & Elizabeth Seltzer, Jack L. McClure & Joan A. McClure, John Spangberg & Gretchen Spangberg, and James R. Drotter & Barbara K. Drotter. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1147 Opt-Out Letters: from Kim Freeman Tate and Joe Tate, Tracy A. Willis, Sherman W. Waihwright, Terry L. & Carole J. Sattler, Brent D. Urchike, William H. & Joan W. Kohl, Mary L. Moore, Mary K. Sedillo, Frank E. Sedillo, Anthony Padilla, Cheryl L. Padilla, Maria and David Granger, Robert and Ann Schibig, Gerald H. and Arthada J. Sawyer, Robert S. and Janet M. Foster, Anthony J. & Sally N. Chiappone, Oscar Serna and Laura Cortez, June La Velle Smith, Harry W. and Edda Lichtenberger, Robert L. and Patricia K. Urchike, Brigette and Sidney Smith. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1146 Opt-Out Letters: from Wendy & Tim Worrell, Valen & Lynn Lee, Lynn Ehrlich, Tim & Erin Hammack, Karen and Ed Gonzalez, Joseph A. Mainello, Karin A. Mainello, James M. Trez and Rosemary R. Trez, Robert N. Vaught and Teresa Bombardier, Robert J. Kocher, Peggy Laden, Joyce Moore, Dorothy Setliff-Ohling, Sandra K. Harris, Alice E. Pegues-Miller, Wendy A. Brand, Maria Smith, Rodney J. and Carol A. Wittinger, Tom and Barbara Hauswald, Beth Fishman McCaffrey. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1144 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Carol Tough Gardner, Cody Olsen & Lucinda Olsen, Michael Peterson & Erika Peterson, Kimberly M. Powell-Wagner, Eloise Waugh, Becky Rose Fleishman, David Fischer & Rochelle M. Fischer, Mary E. Fink, Lawrence Davis & Barron Bracey, Martha M. Campiotti & Richard H. Campiotti, Lois Johnson, Jeanmarie Grieco-Kolb, Carolyn Wooldridge & Jim Boyer, Wilburn D. Maddox & Judy Maddox, Michael W. Kelly, Diana Canant, Richard Kloster & Cathy M. Kloster, Marshall W. Bugge, Bryan J. Reich & Panisima Kanokkaew, and Linda Scoggin. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1142 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Lynn Taylor & Judy Taylor, Harvey Oxman & Ruth Oxman, Sylvia McKewon, Carie Koch, Daniel J. Hess & Joanne P. Hess, Michael T. Fiore, Roberta Dominguez, Richard D. Cargo & Debra K. Cargo, George P. Stoddard & Cherie Stoddard, Robert F. Miller & Deloris S. Miller, Timothy J. Morrone & Lori S. Morrone, Raul Acosta & Jannette Acosta, Lori G. Dold, Nancy J. Meuer, Ernest Ruoff & Jennifer Ruoff, Robert J. Wilson II & Marcela M. Wilson, James N. Mantle, Charlie Eugene Red & Vickie Lynn Red, Donald Berry & Ellen Berry, and James M. Rutledge & Betty Rutledge. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1141 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Weston Scow & Kristen Scow, Dr. Yvonne Katz, Stuart Blanco & Diana Blanco, Lori Hasson, Joann Cole, Xiao Lu Wu, Richard F. Hernandez, Dena L. Freeman, Brenda Tolbert & Sonia Tolbert, Saige Losli, David Peterson, Max Dodson & Marilyn Dodson, John Stock & Virginia Stock, Nadine Chiechi, Darl Thornton & Gard Thornton, Susan J. Allanson, Lee Borchers & Lorraine Borchers, Lori Steinhorst & Darlynn Villanueva, and Ken Jordan & Catherine Jordan. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1137 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Edwin Taves and Marilyn J. Taves; Rebecca Egleston; Susan L. McReynolds and James M. McReynolds; John Strong and Susan Strong; Thomas R. Tucker, Jr. and Helen S. Tucker; Joel A. LaMotte; Robert Wendt and Donna Wendt; Norman B. Parks and Doris J. Parks; Mary Ann Morrison; Kevin Richardson and Cheryee (Mar) Richardson; Jayson Yavorsky and Wihianna Yavorsky; Jonathan Levine and Elizabeth Pritzker; Teresa Lombardi; Jacklyn Salazar-Allen; Kathleen Nelson and Eric Nelson; David A. Okuni; Nathan W. Harvey; John C. Richardson and Arlene M. Richardson; Dana Gray and Linda Gray; Donna L. Grajek; Per Flygare and Mary Flygare; Timothy J. Randall and Jackie L. Randall; Marianne K. Mack; Victor M. Williams, Jr. and Sharon L. Williams. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1136 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Shelli Williams & James Felty, Kaiden Evinlyle, Marilyn Warrick, Robert F. Ettner & Nola M. Ettner, Dottie Bishop, Eugene A. Schlaline & Charlene M. Schlaline, Mark Cappelletti & Amy Cappelletti, Douglas K. Pittam & Sondi M. Pittam, Robert G. Fletcher & Xuan T. Hollis, Richard C. Swiggett & Barbara B. Swiggett, Kimberly Butte, Lawrence B. Kiriluk & Carol L. Kiriluk, Dean R. Lincoln & Kryssia E. Lincoln, Ava Barish, Renee Marie De Leon-Garner, Robert Welch & Robyn Welch, Franklin D. Krook & Nancy L. Krook, Brian Ward & Jenny Ward, Kristen Lowrey, and Audra L. De Groote. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1132 OPT-OUT LETTERS: from Alberto and Theresa Topete; James and Lila Besendorfer; Alfredo and Dolores Reyes; Steven Shermoen; Loren Lund; Greg and Cynthia Peart; Kenneth and Julie McGuire; Robert Chase; Vernon Robinson and Cecelia Long; Scott A. Dunn; Silvia and Kevin Dennis; Irina Shishikina; James and Leanne Growe; James Clemons and Blanche Hill; Linda Athins; Melody Lois Connor; Timothy and Judith Spradley; Michael and Edythe Kuhn; Mark and Susan Warren; Linda Bode William; Grover Vogt. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1129 OPT-OUT LETTERS: from Larry and Patricia Keisling; Gene and Wendi Scheel; George and Kathleen Noggles; Chun Yen Chen; Marianda Fuglsang; Lois Richter and James Drummond; Marc Kirshman; Joy L. Marshall; Donald Cushing; Brian and Donna Routh; James M. Bell; Gloria Mandile; Amy and Dana Goulston; Tiffany and George Dozzie; Nancy and Charles Caudle; Ron and Regina Bernier; Barbara Creighton; Edward Dale Harper; Darmon and Cheryl Harris; Pablo and Dominga Sierra; Wes Keysor; Patricia and Byron Delgado; Domnica Grossu; Judith Everts Cranmer; Rudolph and Haleen Armijo; Pearl Johns; Robert Noreen Peterson; Glen and Grant Hunsicker; Michael and Barbara Shields; Caroll and Tylena Barnes; Ronald and Joan Derbyshire; Gina Edwards; Priscilla Weiss; Erasmus and Shirley Puffer; Lawrence Lyle; Darrell and Karen Hobbs; Roy and Laura Paige; Linda R. Boyle; Carroll an Joyce Clabaugh. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1128 Opt Out Letters from : Arnold, Lonnie and Lorna; Cudmore, Pat and Sandy; Beckman, Ralph Dennis Jr. and Susan L; Dunaway, Kenneth C. and Kathleen L.; Carter, Hughbert Jr. and Mary E.; Converse, Constance; Craven, Joan; Blair, Kathleen; Cerankoski, Harry and Barbara; Cruse, Jose D. Jr. and Rosalinda A.; Dietz, Robert H. and Elizabeth R.; Brandt, Heather and William; Davis, Keith and Day, Molly; Henricksen, Glenn F. and Christensen, Ruth L.; Erickson, Alfred L. and Connie R.; Hale, William D. and Anderson, Barbara J.; Bowen, John and Patty; Culver, Randy and Lori; Chatman, Andrew and Mable; Allsop, Harold Cory and Annette; Dowd, Peter and Monica; Edey, Doreen and David; Curtis, S. Teresa and Michael; Bruland, Richard A. and Sharon Y.; Aarstad, Susan A. and John T.; Boon, David and Yvonne; Ahlstrand, Gary M. and Deanna M.; Anderson, Kim and Dennis; Brink, Gregory and Mariah; Cole, Suzanna; Dungan, Richard and Mary; DeGrandpre, Raleen; Butz, Richard E. and Carolyn K. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1126 Opt Out Letters from: Johnson, Mark R. and Karla A.; Johnson, Mark and Laura; Johnson, Robert and Julie; Foulger, Trent and Wendy; Giles, Glade E. and Marilyn J.; Hasselfeld, James R. and Diana; Hill, John A. and Bliss S.; Fenchel, Eric and Susan; Griffin, Richard D. and Gwyne E.; Greer, Helen E. and Joey W.; Foti, Pete and Jamie; Hilman, Alen and Paula; Howard, Elizabeth J.; Jordan, J. Randal and Patricia A.; Freshour, Ronald G. and Barbara A.; Grove, Charlie and Susan; Hammer, Rossie B. Jr. and Carol J. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1125 Opt-Out Letters: Carl Van Katwijk, Dustin Ezell, Rosemary Ezell, Joseph H. Ware Jr., Lori Watkins Ware, Jinxi Zhu, Shijun Hou, Peter Sahmel, Francky Sahmel, Angela R. Congdon, Craig W. Congdon, William Moody, Sandra Moody, Tiffany Mitzel, Paul Howard, Luis P. Franco, Julie D. Franco, Jeanette Ivan, Miles Smith, Rey L. Roa, Juvylin C. Roa, Michael J. Gordon, Katherine C. Gordon, Jessica Christensen, Cathy Santamaria, Tanya Robinson aka Guerrero, Cory Robinson, Lorrie Tomilin, Margaret M. Read, Elena Hodge, Beverly Brown, Dee Dee L. Pule, Anna-Carin Ivarsson, Bjorn Karlsson, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1123 Opt Out Letters from: Maloney, Mary R. and Daryle R.; Ostler-McGrew, Kristine and McGrew, Jason; Low, John and Christine; Morris, Gretchen A.; McClain, Judy; Mitchell, Donald K. and Nanette L.; Kean, Robert Thomas and Elizabeth A.; Klovdahl, Jennifer and Garrett; Means, William and Pamela; Laragan-Uranga, Kim; McCullough, Lesa and Steven; Minniti, Susan; Megrath, Donald H. and Yvonne C.; Lansberry, Donald R. and Villene E.; Morris, Henry M. and Cecelia G.; Moeller, Clifford D.; Kemp, Roger A. and Cathryn B.; Moreau, Henri; Long, Mike and Catherine (Long Family Trust); Miller, John A. and Elvire L.. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1122 OPT-OUT LETTERS: from Steven and Peggy Davidson; Richard and Dianna Enea; Louis and Judith Ann Rotar; Colleen Deneen; Aaron and Maria Zelaya; Masayuki and Joyce Miyagi; Wayne Vieler; Patricia Peterson; Joseph Mikula; James and Yvonne Carmichael; Ralph Moriconi; Michelle Yelland; Thomas and Mary Seibt; Jasmine de Jesus and Lazaro; Marie Brown; Ilson Winningham; Carl and Mary Jane Swedberg; Jermaine and La Tanja McClain-Jackson; Stephen Charles Durkee; Phyllis and Barry Rodgers; Maria Frisby; Bonnie and Michael Schoonover; Robert and LaVerne Lindsey; Timonth Smith and Annette Madden; Phyllis and Barbara Leaf;George and Gillian Palejko; Rudy and Linda Kobbeltvedt; Gary and Phyllis Whelchel; Stephen and Margaret Bakes; Steven and Teri Freitag; Kenneth Kremensky; Beverly Kaye; Diane and Charles Fitzgerald; Thomas and Glynis Barsotti; John and Stephanie Traphagan; Neil and Tammy Steensma; Paula J. Jones; Michael G. Dunn; Eugene Sakai; Thomas and Elizabeth Dressel. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1121 Opt Out Letters from: Rutt, Gary L. and Diana L.; Piper, John G. and Anna M.; Peterson, Leona J.; Pardo, Anselmo and Mary Ellen; Roper, Richard and Cheristine; Press, Stephen and Judy; Robertson, Timothy Michael and Sarah Anne (Kerfoot); Rosco, Russell D. and Bonnie R.; Owzarski, Sherrilyn True and Thomas P.; Perkins, Michael J. and Judith M; Olsufka, Paul S.; Porter, Rita; Pettner, Maurice A. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1120 Opt Out Letters from: Stemple, Gary C. and Sharon J.; Sporman, Kathryn L.; Scott, Dean L.; Sharp, Gary A. and Lisa A.; Shakir, Ameer H. and Yamasaki, Keiko; Souter, John C.; Samsel, Kathleen L. and Clawson, Janet I.; Marsh, Micheal and Sanchez, Jose Adrian; Stillman, Douglas E. and Diane; Torres, George and Chunk Suk; Tomlinson, Darrell and Linda; Van Vleet, Ernest and Judy; Wallace, William J. and Norma; Wallach, Sanra L.; Weir, Eugene A. and Roderick, Judith A.; Williams, Deborah; Wilcox, Dale C. and Eileen W.; Woodside, James A. and Bleiman, Sheila L. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1119 Opt-Out Letters: David Carpenter, Harold L. Collin, Susan G. Collin, Guadalupe Cruz, Carina Cruz, Maria Gutierrez, Maria Duran, Matt Ward Hannaford, Nyta Lynn Hannaford, Davor Karlovic, Lorraine Karlovic, Chinpal Jong, Katalina Jong, Jytte B. Langmann, Lionel B. Newton, Vivki L. Lewis, Carol J. MacDonald, Kenneth Nelson, Lyudmila Nelson, Thuong Nguyen, Chantal Gendron-Nguyen, Norman Olsen, Elaine Olsen, Bruce Pearn, Kristian Poulsen, Susan Poulsen, Earl Rellamas, Carol Rellamas, Jeromw L. Spaulding, Joyce A. Spaulding, Judy Storey, Tracey Baden, Jane H. Warner, Mielin Warner, Elizabeth Weir, Clifford Stuart Weir (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1118 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Mark T. Beales, Denise J. Achelis, Thomas & Candace Haskell, Robert & Dana Spangler, Ben & Bethany Hart, Nancy Adams, Rhonda Rohrbach, Edgardo V. & Norraine G. Lagrimas, Adrianne C. Powell, Alyce E. Johnson, Loren & Penny Schmidt, Steven & Rachel Kudera, Anne & W. Dale Holden, Richard & Deborah Darst, John R. & Monica M. Armstrong, Johnny Thomas & Lori Jean Bishop, Billy & Lisa Marie Jacobsen, Donald Davis & Hattie Hurt (Deceased), Gregory Marshall & Theresa Perkins-Marshall, Rebecca Roberts(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1117 Opt-Out Letters from Brian & Sharon Wartman; Ralph Sipes; Steve & Peni Hendryx; Stanley & Beth Wagstaff; Douglas & Elaine Allman; Janet & Gerald Green; Warren & Jean Stenhouse; Darlene Garcia & Daniel Vargas; Harry & Lois Weinert; Patrick & Dawn Yale; Ronald & Marla Marchek; Duane & Diane Larson; Lyle & Marlene Pfeifer; Oliver & Connie Clausing; Wilson & Patricia Doak; Karen Wilson; Penny Dezen & Martha Lord; Jenny McDonald & Nancy Norder; Dennis & Kathy Domagala; Andrew Lasseter. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1116 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Marilyn Junelle Schrum & Dayleen Kroontje, Gerald & Jo Thomas, Vince 7 Tiffany Barzee, Patricia A. Wilks, Teresa S. Jackson, Fred Ille & Jacquelin Hines, Larry & Donna Schmitz, John H. & Gay Rarick, Henri Moreau, (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1113 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Kenneth & Donna Oliver, Dan & Bonnie Pfau, Kevin & Diane Gissel, Sharon Natalie Liljenwall, Michael & Debbie Widerstrom, Julie & Sean Gallagher, Steven A. Bailey & Susan R. LeMaster, Kimberly Hyder & Samantha A. Petshow, Carl D. & Deborah S. Green, Donald S. & Dorothea L. Zorosinski, Matthew M. & Suzanne E. Hill, Viki Marie Bigler, John & Karen Payne, Tacy Dommerich & Glenn Frederick Fleener, Katherine & Marvin Kehler, J. Michael & Marguerite Smith, Vera Kroeger (Ernst Kroeger is deceased), Henry & Tiffany Chung, Avtar Sandhu & Allison McMillan, Michael Paul Mattammal, Katherine I. Davis (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1112 Opt-Out Letters from Charles & Carol Laughlin; Lyle Rayfield & Barbara Carolus; Bonnie Loop; Scott & Lisa Kay Minter; Peter & Lexie Clinton; Christine Swanson; Eileen Kay Dyer; Gerald & Gloria Craig; Darrell & Margaret Bang; Kent & Ginnie (Virginia) Robertson; Joyce Hubeek; Susan Berg; Orville & Shirley Fallstone; Rosalie Jaurigue; Norma Silva; Thomas & Roberta Hurt; Arthur & Janice Thenell; George & Donna Wannamaker; Virgil Mellott; Kathleen Barnett; Kent & Shona Woodward. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1110 Opt-Out Letters from Marta Vasquez & Kambiz Moghaddam; Sharon & Marian Seamons; Brian & Kathryn Keating; Brian & Sharon Wartman; Jean Hagedorn; Ron & Diane Crump; Jeffrey & Dawn Newman; Keisha Parker; Roger & Rosemary Roepke; Scott & Carolyn Nuffer; Joseph Colello & Jennifer Mahoney; Nicklis & Janet Simpson; Lynn Sherry Carter; Keith Dagenhart & Terri Morinaka; Danielle & Jason Berthon-Koch; Sahwn Lockridge-Hermsen & Donald Hermsen; Heinz Hengstler & Christine Moon Hengstler; Judi Sacosky; Karen & Mark Petersen; Ronald Bartley. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1109 Opt-Out Letters: Mark H. Albright, Michele W. Allbright,Duane Anders, Cynthia Anders, Jack L. Birkby, Rufus C. Crow Jr., Judith H. Crow, Sandy M. Falon, James L. Falon, Don Feeney, Randi Koutney, Shawna Fuller, Mary C. Klune, Gloria Herrera, Edythe M. Holmes, Robert Jellison, Linda Jellison, Gerald J. Meuter, Karen K. Meuter, Clarence Newton, Kathy Newton, Michelle Nicholas, Michael L. Owen, Melissa J. Owen, Billie Phelph, Valerie Poyser, Cindy Lawton, Rodney J. Robinson, Marsha A. Robinson, Aaron Tovar,Wilder Marilyn (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1108 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Alan & Kim Bronson, Robert & Marcia Bertalot, Kenneth & Donna L. Jacobs, Marco Escalante & Dongni Li, Steven D. McDowell, E. Kent & Janet L. Oswalt, David & Sherry Scott, Ryan & Joyce Collins, Myron & Joann Weld, Howard A. Wells, Jr., & Margaret W. Wells, LaVera C. & Charles B. McCord, Christine M. & James F. Hutchens, Larry & Catherine Ellis, Wayne A. & Marjorie J. Smith, Gene & Lee Ann Kunze, Gary W. & Joan M. Pomerenke, Scott & Sarah Krzysik, George G. & Patricia A. Spear, Diane Hart(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1107 Opt-Out Letters from Karl G. Kraber, Myung Ja Kim Van Patten, Laura Atkins & Jeanette Christy Trotter, Hemanth & Marina Kumar, Sam T. & Neva J. Wood, Stanley & Angela Yang, Raymond D. & Rachel A. Ponce, Michael & Anna Survell, Frederic E. & Jo Ann Roof, Christopher & Frances Servis, James Jajeh & Diana Saadeh Jajeh, Michael & Madeleine Anastasious, Bruce & Denise Farrell, William D. & Dorothy M. Bentley, Jyll Reese, David Maxwell, Denise L. Porter, Kary Ka Wai Cheng, Timothy & Laura Larson, Ashley Day Minnich. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1106 Opt-Out Letters from Steve & Ruth Lee; Michael & Mavis Czekanski; Robert & Janis Foster; Edward Serna Jr. & Dorothy Dumlao Serna; Debra Brook; Morgan & Maria Rees; Gary & Michele Wong; Eva & Leslie Ayres; Hilda Mills & William Strauss, Jr.; Marc & Cheryl Blau; Ronald & Doris Crider; Matthew & Cheryl Duchow; Diane Dent; Michael & Connie Jirouch; Virginia Guadiana; Jeff & Susan Cliburn; Steven DeFolo & Winona Forme; Joe & Cindy Schorno; Christopher & Bridgette DuChane; Leida Cadiz. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1105 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Florence Ruby Bourne, Joe & Patricia Finley, Ronald E. & Sharon J. Franz, Michele Tanis, Mary & Barry Edmunds, Roland & Stacey Barber, Brian Payne, Jean D. & George S. Wirts, Albert L. & Dorothy M. French, Michael C & Sandra L. Shelleman, Catherine Walp, Hunter & Kathy Duvall, Eric & Jane White, Allyn & Judith C. Snowhite, Steve & Dixie Fultz, Radu & Cristina Nicoara, Scott & Marjorie Pfeffer, Jane C. Hood & John W. Krogman, Anthony & Aimee Corso, Phillip E. Cochran (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1104 Opt-Out Letters from Charles Alan & Phyllis Wilkerson, Russel D. & Cynthia A. Fillis, Cathlyn Gendreau, Mark A. & Kathryn J. Petroni, Jennifer & Roger Brown, Walter & Patricia A. Pisarczyk, Lonnie R. & Donna J. Mills, John Siefken & Marna Abrams, Matthew & Sandra Bench, Po Chiu & Kathy Lin, Roger M. & Sharon A. McKinley, Raymond & Barbara Levine, John A. & Shelagh C. Lustig, Maribeth G. Zwick, Archelle D. & T. Monique Funnie, Pat & Irene O'Brien, Sarah Allsop-Fine & Michael Wilson, Patricia & Donald Doersch, Luzanne Grainger, Stan & Linda Davis, Lela & H. Curtis Wilson. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1103 Opt-Out Letters: William F. Easter II, Susan M. Easter, Robert Faville, Denise Faville, Ronald Ethe, Stephanie Ethe, Jay Harman, Deborah Harman, Ty Hart, Aimee hart, Mitch Herbert, Kelly Herbert, William Jaehrlich, Helen Jaehrlich, Donald R. Johnson, Renee A. Johnson, Howard Mion, Grace Mion, Patsy G. Matheaus, Margaret S. Nelson, Chris Perkins, Alicia Perkins, Deborah Salas, Jesus Salas, Ruth Salway, Wendy Smoke, Stanley Smoke, J.Kay Thorne, Janice A. Thorne, Kevin Townsend, Susan Towensend, Doreen Traxel, Thomas Traxel, Gary Wilson, Phillips Dawn (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1102 Opt-Out Letters from Justo M. Aquino & Gloria P. Ruple, Grady & Christine Mathews, Daljeet Singh & Theresia C. Sandhu, Peter & Kathy Breen, Nan Dame & Carl Mortimer, Anna Faye Lema, Mark & Pam Eveleth, Mitchell & Jennifer Holohan, Nelvun E. Joseph, Jonathan & Patricia Kuchy, Kay Crista, Robert & Gisela Juengling, Gary & Robin Fayette, Tiffany True & James Brown, Susan Johnson, Terry C. & Vida Kathy Kingry, Thomas S. Guffey, Teresa Woods, Peggy Miller & Ray Stephens. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1101 Opt-Out Letters from Teresa & Markus Mika, Merrill T. & Barbara M. Smedley, Lowell & Carol Beckendorf, John A. & Krista L. Karns, Robert & Jean Detar, Phillip A. & Patricia A. Rodriguez, Chad Demaree, Cynthia Nowicki Moore, Jeanette B. Edgerly, Teri A. Dillard, Jim & Linda Johnson, Alan & Norma Lyons, James Hugh & Anne Elizabeth Clarke, Tyree & Nicole Beckom Long, Enedina Rodriguez Gonzalez, Ralph & Nadine Paulin, Scott & April Paulin, Marlowe Allenbright. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1098 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Jennifer & Michael Rogers, Sandra McCombs, Arlon & Cynthia J. Elmer, Bernard & Sondra Jefferies, Terry & Wilma Eivins, John & Nancy Turek, Lynne E. Spolek, Franklin & Elena Zimmerman, Melvin R. & Ethel J. Konnecke, Bryan K. & Rhonda Smith, Michael & Cindy Jeffries, Martin Reckleben & Monica Reckeben (maiden name Gonzalez), Lynda S. Scoville, Frances R. Laird, Harold & Karen Stott, Thomas D. Henry (deceased) & Lynn D. Henry, Delmar & Margaret-Ann Fangmeier, Jerry & Donna Cunningham, Patricia Hare, Rene Anthony Hernandez(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1097 Opt-Out Letters from Roger W. & Marian K. Haserot, Carol A. Putnam & Darnell L. Hampton, Manuel A. Armas, Sr. & Rosemary Armas, Donna Van Stralen, Thomas Nobles, Salam Harati & Shohreh Afrakhan, Joyce & Michael Thornton, Edgar DeWayne & Karen Lee Beverly, Denise Clarke, Kenneth B. & Linda M. Lauren, Stephanie Hensel, Sharon J. & Jerry W. Mair, Alison Murray, Sandy L. Hames, Roy J. Foltz & Patricia A. Foltz, Jan & Stacey WilkBrooks, Capucine Dill, Willie L. Howze & Colette S. Sutherland, Daniel K. & Ann L. Robbins, Linda McCoy, Travis L. Holden & Wen-Wen Cheng. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1096 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Lois E. Sapp, Marilyn Melvin, Jeremy Robert & Lisa Bonnell, Joe & Juanita Pyle, Daniel & Betcsy Rizik, Michael & Joyce Wood, Kelly Zigler, David L. & Wanda L. Martin, Sue Zan Vincent, Patrick J. O'Rourke & Charla Ranch,Sannon Holbrook, Robert W. DiRocco, Jerry C. Winters, Ralph & Sheryl Tobelmann, Pamela I & Ward C. Narron, Thieu Ton & Janice Nguyen, Lawrence E. & Christine S. Spohn, Tessie Rose & Tom Nay, Janice M. Hayden, Jay & Jodi Bowlden(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1095 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Christy Jones, Karen L. Haig, Hyejung Kim, Gary & Rochelle Cavaretta, Lyle C. & Kaylene A. Vance, Randy & Robyn Wardell, Phil & Cheryl Rayburn, Judy A. & Ross L. Bair, Thomas & Janis Vetter, Douglas & Kathryn McMurray, Kyle & Lynsay Ludwig, Mike & Kathy Prater, Raymond L. & Symone McKenzie, Martel C. & Linda L. Fish, Milton & Pat Holloway, Dennis & Alice Granger, Patricia Gerlach & George Gerlach (deceased), Amelia Bauer, David & Jill Campbell, Kathleen M. & Clark M. Poole, Jeremy & Kerri Taylor. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1093 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Amy-Beth Heinkel, Nick A. & Judith A. Dorsett, Ronald L. & Pamela J. Fleming, Robert & Brenda Deeds, Rick & Kathy Qunell, Gary & Deborah Schenck, Jim & Shelly Fickel, Stephen L. & Charlene A. Gerhauser, James R. & Mary Leta Grundy, Perry D. & Kathleen S. Smith, Matthew & Sacha O'Hara, Floyd & Jeanette Snyder, Leonard N. & Vanessa B. Moore, Stanton C. & Joanna K. Case, Cindi & Hans Brandal, Richard & Carol Grubb, Malika J. Oudes, Anthony S. & Rosemarie A. Hafner, Patrick & Melissa McGlinn (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1092 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Randall B. & Yolanda F. Williams, Francis & Susan M. Balchak, Helen Butler, James & Ranae Evans, Donald G. & Susan J. Anderegg, Eric & Jody Wasinger, W. John & Judith Kautto, Warren & Karen Arenkill, Simon J., Lynda K. & Amy L. Bendik, John L. & Carolyn J. Anders, Troy & Katie Gooch, Allan K. & Donna J. Heys, Lennis M. & Teresa L. Camfield, Gary & Susan VanDyk, Charles & Karen Cooper, Ray D. & Mary J. Shults, Charles E. & Jan Toole, Sandra J. Steier, Craig & Judy Davis, Robert B. & Elaine L. Smith(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1091 Opt-Out Letters from Larry & Carol Brown; Richard & Linda Koenigs; Donald & Judith Harwood; Robert & Laura Shoemaker; Guy & Gaynell Parker; Thomas & Barbara Graham; Gayle & Jay Cleary; Tricia Suarez & Harold Walters; Ron & Sue Ledford; Cathleen Connell; Judith & Marvin Wakefield; Leona Harvey; Richard & Marjorie Haddon; Evelyn Hills; Jimmy & Eunice Powell; James & Karen Adams; Ronald & Judy Poplawski; Randy & William Killeen; Laurie Miller & Shawn Kampmann; Burke & Barbara Cannon. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1089 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Steve & Donna Roddick, Joan M. Karkeck, Cindy Nelson, Darlene M. Carlson & Comfrey Lim, Isabella Maksutenko, James S. & Valorie Lynne Gervasi, Lorna Farnham, Jeffrey L. & Kristy A. Blake, Don & Diane Isom, Steve & Marilyn Petermeyer, Geoffrey James & Cheryl Yvonne Manley, Brenda K. Hutchins, Nathan R. Aoyagi, Vivian Roop, Brian D. & Vanessa S. Ward, Mary & Robert K. Oster, Richard A. & Leslie C. Huston, Eric & Tami Cholly, Tracy Zarecky Parker (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1087 OPT-OUT LETTERS: By Oran Smith, Wayne M. & Eliza G. Miller, Ester E. Edwards, Janet & Edgar A. Berg, Lisa K. Hume, Marcello & Rosemarie Codog, J. Lynne & Jim Jones, David DaSilva, William & Linda Crawford, Petra Pohl & Robert Alai, James C. & Carol L. Wooldridge, Pamela Fitch, Gail Clark Cook & Dennis Cook, Henry D. & Ava Woodson, William C. Thompson (Deceased) & Connie L. Thompson, Kenneth J. Taylor, Bruce & DJ Tibert, Roy L. & JO L. Ball, Renee K. McGuire, Kevin & Anzara Miller (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 1075 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Brent & Judith Jeffreys: (Attachments: #1 Cynthia Romero, #2 Glenda Ames & Margie Rogers, #3 Robert & Ingrid A. Rosenbaum, #4 Joann & Albert Thompson, #5 Susan E. Clift, #6 Liliana K. Bouvet, #7 Leslie & Wade Braker, #8 Artie S. & Clara C. Ella, #9 Noel & Antoniette Tamayo, #10 Marilyn M. Jones, #11 Willard Jay & LaRee S. Grant, #12 Carol Olsen, #13 Kurt & Tuesday Claxton, #14 Mike L. & Rena P. Morin, #15 Lois Johnson & Kristi Little, #16 Paul Dulgov & Kai Lee, #17 Donna M. Webb & Kenya N. Webb Davis, #18 Richard Sherrod & Cheryl Ella Sherrod, #19 Lisa Uribe)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1264 Letter of Objection from Robert A. & Kay L. Goyden. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Objection from Diana & Jose Larios)(rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1145 Opt-Out Letters: from Ron and Lynnetta Engelkes, Forest Harness and Qing Yun Wang, Dorothy DeNoyelles, Otto Kalensee, Woody & Shannon McEvers, Shari J. Hannah, Robert & Terri Pillow-Noriega, Angela and Scott Piasecki, John C. & Linda L. Berdahl, Dean and Kyra Hider-Jackson, Thomas R. and Penny C. Hendrix, Anne M. Lawler, Paul Ouellette, Jeanne Ouellette, Daniel J. & Joydean Roach, Jeffrey C. Anderson, Gary L. & Kimberly Jo Christensen, David & Vickie Sigafoos, Jessie May Puen, Chris Cid and Brenda Cid, William F. Leivonen, Jr. & Joan A. Leivonen, Allyn and Debra Brown. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1143 Opt-Out Letters: from Timothy L. Eleanor R. Miller, Glenn and Linda Fishel, Leonard G. and Mary K. Lukens, Gayle Siegfried, Robert Chunn, William H. and Geraldine Flint, Florence & Jim Frichette, Luther P. & Claire L. Hintz, Douglas and Maryann Zapotocky, Thomas W. & Lucille J. Schwartz, Joe C. Conley II, W. Nathan and Carolyn J. Wilson, Ken and Terri Bish, Michael and Dorothea Foley, Justin Paskett, Frances A. Carrasco, Terrie Burns and Michael Bohdan, Josephine Lewis, Rosetta Patillo Burnett, Jesse J. and Linda S. Stout, Mike Quirk. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1140 Opt-Out Letters: from Terry A. Wagner, Kim A. Hobart, Bruce S. Binder, George E. & Karen Lyn Bryan, Arne E. & Vicki A. Nelson, Richard C. & Adair B. Farnes, Gordon and Susan Erickson, Jessica Huber, Sheila M. Brumley, Michelle Escala, Laurence McGriff, Peggy M. Prior, Ernest and Yvonne Williams, Paul and Janet Hagen, Tohru H. Yamada, David D. Cobb, Vickie L. Gomez, Michele D. Dow, Ron Webb, Fred and Marine R. Jacard-Caploe, Laurie R. Cameron, Cheryl M. Leslie. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1134 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Carole L. Cohen, Patricia L. Farber, Stephanie Y. Chin, Joseph T. Doggett & Cynthia L. Doggett, Terry Pietsch & Sally Pietsch, Michael T. Scholzen & Judith M. Scholzen, Leo F. McNamara & Frances McNamara, Kristin Vargas, Alan Neal, Lynn R. Oakleaf, Freddie R. Lopez & Penny S. Lopez, Sylvia C. Jones, Beverley Bell, Richard Couser & Pernella Couser, Bernita S. Brazier, Earl Lavagnino & Patricia Lavagnino, Erlinda A. Breen, Norma Kinter, Stanley A. Kaplan & Lois E. Kaplan.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1131 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Raymond Shank; Ernest Briggs and Nancy F. Briggs; Mark E. Winter and Cynthia L. Winter; Rachael Prater; James Harrold and Caroline Harrold; Judith K. Brown; Kevin W. Eaton and Janice S. Wikgren; Ramona Butler; Marcia Kasabach; Randolph Silva and Joyce Silva; Pamela Walter and Michael Walter; Joni T. Wickens-Green and Elmon A. Green; Joseph Martin and Denise Martin; William J. Walz and Franz Aubry; Jack Trentham and Patricia Trentham; John Lopez and Doris Shurden-Lopez; Lee Burke Maxey and Youfeng Shen; Patrick L. Barnes and Patricia A. Barnes; Claire Kinsley; Jerry Hiura and Charlene Hiura; Larry Martin and Wanda Martin; Karen A. Wick; Patrick Rutherford and Alice Rutherford; Leigha Davis; Robert Cornelison and Mary Cornelison; Ann Mortimore; John F. Toale; Frank Cannizzaro and Nancy Cannizzaro; David Brown and Gloria Brown; Lucie Villones; Charlene D. Sapien; Antonio Tapia and Cynthia Tapia; Denise Cook; Jamie M. Rodriguez and Hermilo F. Rodriguez; Thomas P. Davis; Don Minimo and Roumelia Minimo; Gayle Walz and Lorene Romero; Denise Dacles; Leon Groode and Judith Davidson. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1130 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Gerald Mercola & Kathleen Presnell, Teresa Hernandez, Bernard Karmatz, Douglas Hoppe & Eileen Hoppe, Yvonne Marinus, Francis Elton Carson & Helen R. Carson, Jack Lyons & Jeannette Lyons, John Ashburn & Saundra Ashburn, Walter M. Gewing & Anna S. Gewing, Al Gyory & Cecelia Gyory, Cynthia Frazer, Derrill Evans & Maria Lourdes Evans, Timothy Clark & Patricia M. Clark, Roxane M. Liu & John Y. Liu, William Ellsworth, Helen McAfee, Kim K. McWilliams & Audrey Sue McWilliams, David W. Basista & Grace Lau-Basista, Robert J. Kottre & Geraldine J. Kottre, and Kong F. Yee & Judy L. Yee. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1127 OPT-OUT LETTERS from David Rose, Darrell Karty & Annamira Karty, Edward Barker & Barbara Overton, Cindy Jacques, Carl James Coleman & Carol Lynn Coleman, Ashish M. Diwan & Archana Micky Diwan, Glenn A. Pierce, Paul Gilbert & Sherry Gilbert, Pam Bradley & Kirk Bradley, Makieba Scott Williams & Thomas Williams, Sr., Shonna L. Stuber (Sandoval), Walter A. Busenius & Susan K. Busenius, Michael Nault & Tamara Koehn, Eugene R. DeLoney & Marjorie A. DeLoney, William M. Lee & Mary C. Lee, Efren L. Techaira & Rosie S. Techaira, Harry G. Carrow & Rita Gordon-Carrow, Raymond M. Carlile & Frances K. Carlile, Cynthia Kearney, Yvette Carlton & Sherri Lykes.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1124 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Francine G. Bernard; Norma L. Harvey; Frank H. Utley and Irene E. Utley; Robert Putzi and Gabriele Putzi; John Ohta and Tomi Ohta; John Schneider and Judy M. Schneider; Marilyn S. Anderson; Donna L. Halverson; James L. Phillips and Nancy J. Phillips; Robert J. Hall; Constance A. Hanser; Cade Smith and Mary Smith; Simona Arcan and James Jeffery Caldwell; Melissa Baron; Josephine Hagen and Raymond Hagen; Larry L. Burgess and Phyllis A. Burgess; Ronald Otis Lynn and Frances Ann Lynn; Howard H. Louie and Kelly M. Louie; Robert Kyes and Katrina Kyes; Loretta Chopey; Mario G. Verano; Antoinette M. Hessler; Victor Burachek and Natalia Burachek; Russell Whelan and Robin Whelan; John Curran and Clorinda Curran; Todd Yates and Melissa Yates; Robert W. Clements; Hiroshi Hashimoto and Susan Hashimoto; Robert L. Fong and Christine R. Fong; Lyn Pagsolingan; Glenn Hjalmer and Glenn Hjalmer; John Nool and Helene Nool; Benjamin R. Menke; John W. Booth and Christopher R. Booth; Richard E. Wenzel and Susan P. Wenzel; Juan Cruz. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1114 Opt Out Letters from: Lillibridge, Jeanne; Lovejoy, John; McGhee, Gary and Lisa; McIntosh, Diane and Baldwin, Randall; Nelson, Philip and Allison; Pauli, Sonja; Qualheim, Erling and Seter, Erika; Raahauge, Jason and Ginna; Roberts, William B. and Irene V.; Rockwell, Carol Anne (The Carole Anne Rockwell Trust); Rodriguez, Nicolas and Merrie Jo; Rudeen, Robert G.; Sander, Reva and Greenman, Floyd; Sarazen, Philip and Bernadette; Seaton, Ernest A. Jr. and Sharon N.; Shelton, James and Ruth; Simonis, Cecelia; Swan, Gregory and Mary; Tom, Anthony; Meyer, Michael and Trapp, Sandra; Treuting, Edward R.; Turk, Marvin and Joyce; Vogt, Norman W. and Borden, Norma J.; Westerland, Frances; Wright, James A. and Sandra K. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1111 Opt Out Letters from: Aguirre, Ning; Apte, Avinash and Kamalini; Beltran, Natalie F.; Berardo, Brian A. and Pamela D.; Bonham, Susan; Bonta, Cynthia; Bowman, Amy J.; Bunker, Jan Marie and Simon, Nathaniel Birch; Bunnell, Raymond and Anna; Campbell, Russell Lee; Carlson, Eliza; Carter, Theodore R. and Judy P.; Cole, Donald E.; DePaola, Thomas G. and Diane; Dunham, Charles F. and Joan; Griffin, Barbara D.; Gruel, Nancy and Walter; Gwaltney, Ben and Dianne; Hadwin, Milo R. and Karen D.; Harrigan, Mario and Tara; Helfrich, Dean and Gayle; Huard, Lisa A.; Johnson, Kirk and Michelle; Kerness, Ilene S; Leidolph, Catherine C. and Lynn J. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1100 Opt-Out Letters: Janet Kirtland, James R. Grifin, Julie A. Griffin, Len Bates, Rebecca Bates, Gerald Geisler, Kelly Geisler, Peter R. Cameron, Anne B. Cameron, Wayne Buren, Connie Buren, James L. Richardson, Theresa R. Richardson, April Featherkile, Woldiemar Peters, Maureen Peters, Steven K. Johnson, Cynthia Johnson, Steven Chatelain, Jacqueline Chatelain, Dustin Summerville, Danielle Summerville, Charles Fleming, Mary Fleming, Terry L. Crandall, Cheryl A. Crandall, Sandra L. Barker, Alexei V. Basargin, Vernell Mills, Donna Mills, Steven B. Roquemore, Kirsten Roquemore, Gary W. Flanders, Rita Mayrant (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1099 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Daniel A. White and Cynthia R. White; Charles M. Hogate, III and Teresa F. Hogate; Susan M. Dabanian and Gregory M. Dabanian; John Herndon and Clifton Herndon; Gary Mengis and Donna Mengis; Lee A. Wanetik; Larry V. Richmond; Robert Garcia and Sandra Garrido; Frank Pierson and Angela Pierson; Jan G. Wintermeyer; Vandelia Curtis and Antrell B. Curtis; Roger W. Harris and Nancy B. Harris; Byron Mobus and Charlotte Mobus; Ronald D. Keffer; David Halliday and Betty Halliday; Donald E. Krager and Erna D. Krager; Henry Gardner and Colleen Gardner (The Colleen Gardner Trust); Jerry Wood and Janice Wood; Christopher S. Ervin and Leslie A. Ervin; Wallace Holland and Pamela Holland; Benjamin Da Rosa and Shirley Da Rosa; Luther Y. Mui and Rebecca A. Mui; Abraham Lackow and Norma Lackow; Virgil Hensiek and Valeta Hensiek(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1088 Opt-Out Letters from Richard & Samantha Seegull, Walter & Michele Patrick, Bienvenido C. & Minerva M. Aquino, Colleen Taylor, Gordon & Shirley Shibao, Albert & Beverly Napier, Dolores Darnell, Elmer J. & Mary Jane Schultz, Steven & Jennifer Rydin, Darrell & JoAnne Brown, George & Kerrie Brandau, Bernard D. & Brenda K. Chavez, Amy Wang & Scott York, Dennis & Candida Jensen, Cathy Hill Yovanov, Bill & Anne Friend, Arthur & Henrietta Hamilton, Andrea K. Johnson. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1086 Opt-Out Letters - Korey & Nieves Richardson. (Attachments: #1 James & Traci Williams, #2 Sharad K. & Bindya S. Singh, #3 Noah & Severa Howeth, #4 Capt. S.D. & Sandy Overton, #5 Hal B. & Susan A. Mar, #6 James & Carol Hanzelka, #7 Roger Pavon & Maria Chua Pavon, #8 Jorge Fernandez, #9 Robert Lee & Ginger I. Dougal, #10 Karren J. Fullmer, #11 Hubertine Kennedy, #12 Maxine Kennedy, #13 Allan Abreu and Myra Alcaide, #14 Robert E. & Barbara A. LeCroy, #15 Doug & Jenny Shinn, #16 Lynn E. Gardner, #17 Ray & Edwina Tardeo)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1084 Opt Out Letters from: Baur, Daniel C.. (Attachments: #1 Bonwell, Charles and Marcia, #2 Cabe, Carol, #3 Carmickle, Isaac L. and Nancy C., #4 Chung, Terence and Sarah, #5 Collins, Gregory D. and Eleanor V., #6 Colvin, Danielle J., #7 Cori, Richard and Lillian, #8 de Jesus, Bien and Linda, #9 Edwards, Patricia, #10 Fuller, John E., #11 Gevara, Nick M., #12 Gibson, Ted O., #13 Gupta, Profull and Louise, #14 Harris, Cecelia, #15 Juelson, Bonnie Ruth, #16 Kennell, John P., #17 Klipper, William S. and Sandra R., #18 Komp, Gregg T. and Juliet F., #19 Krugman, Thomas and Sandra, #20 Lending, Jennie L., #21 Reyes, Erlinda and Bayani, #22 Roehrick, Daniel J. and Mildred J., #23 Roth, Gregory and Rita, #24 Rusby, William and Ann, #25 Shield, Jewel and Jan, #26 Wallman, Harry and Esther)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1083 Opt Out Letters from: Agular, Christopher and Jennie. (Attachments: #1 Bakke, Gordon and Elaine, #2 Bisagno, Mike and Shonna, #3 Brewer, Simon, #4 Britton, Daniel E. and Anita M., #5 Burke, Dan and Cheryl, #6 Christensen, Kathryn and Jay, #7 Couch, Gordon and Dorothy, #8 Cusenza, Joseph Richard and Mancuso, Gabrielle Alexandra, #9 Delaney, Maria and Robert, #10 Dody, Katherine and Silvey, Pamela, #11 Elton, Robert W. and Carole A., #12 Hart, Beverly B., #13 Huzyk, Lydia and Daniel, #14 Johnson, Gerald and Virginia, #15 Luhn, Carol and Seward, #16 Mathia, Geoffrey R., #17 Norelius, Theresa, #18 Ramirez, Victor and Jessie, #19 Sigel, Rochelle, #20 Simpson, Terry and Cohen-Simpson, Colleen, #21 Stoess, Howard and Rita, #22 Tritto, Aaron and Renella, C. Denise, #23 Yule, George and Ingrid)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1081 Opt-Out Letters from Bruce & Anne Everett, as well as: (Attachments: #1 Barney Taylor & Bertha Taylor, #2 Mark & Jennifer Olsen, #3 Tracy Patterson, #4 Frank & Pam Griffin, #5 Vicki Gibbons, #6 Jean Michaud, #7 Douglas Coates, #8 Beau & Dianna Alexander, #9 Arthur Nishimoto, #10 Julia Johnson, #11 Paul & Cora Liam, #12 Michael Glenn & Sharon Glenn, #13 Steve & Antje (Ann) Turk, #14 Lynn Gardner, #15 Glen & Norma Brynsvold, #16 Brendan Milton & Lorena Milton, #17 Wallace William Smith & Linda Lee Smith, #18 Kenneth Root & Susan Root, #19 Jack & Linda Hill)(mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1080 Opt-Out Letters - William & Shirley Richards. (Attachments: #1 Dan & Shirley Kluver, #2 David W. Bumpus and Susan L. Key, #3 Julie (Bettis) Lovewell, #4 Donald L. & Jo Anne Yates, #5 G. Denise Rankin, #6 LeGrand & Jolene Bingham, #7 Conard J. & Gail Willett, #8 Ryan M. Spainhower, #9 Craig & Tammy Pettigrew, #10 Karolyn L. & James E. Murray, #11 David W. & Charlene Sue Wilson, #12 Kimberly L. & Matthew D. Leckband, #13 Terry L. & Sally E. Butler, #14 Juneanne A. Gergen, #15 Kandace K. Karnath, #16 Sam & Ylon Howell ; Jeffrey S. & Tonya C. Bostic, #17 Terry & Kristine Oxley, #18 Jonathan F. & Collette M. Turner)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1079 Opt-Out Letters. (Attachments:Alma G. Naylor #1 Barbara A. Gelderman, #2 Brett & Debbie Crompton, #3 Calvin & Mary Leichty, #4 Christopher & Jodi Butler, #5 David & Dorothy Call, #6 Davina Lin, #7 Derek A. Groff, #8 Donald E. Armstrong, #9 Douglas & Annemarie Edwards, #10 Evan & Beverly Mattinson, #11 James & Carol Peterson, #12 Jerry & Lorri Faile, #13 Karen & Charles Peters, #14 Laura Mabbott Chabries, #15 Marlene Ardoin, #16 Robert & Nedra Fincham, #17 Ruth Ann Reeder, #18 Steven & Debra Cooper, #19 Steven & Patricia Black, #20 William & Roberto Gillane)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1078 Opt-Out Letters from Kathryn Trabitz & Eugene Trabitz, as well as:. (Attachments: #1 John Bloom & Diedre Bloom, #2 Jeffrey & Tonya Quackenbush, #3 Mark Maxfield & Eileen Maxfield, #4 William & Phyllis Lugenbeal, #5 Robert Ronning & K M Alden, #6 James & Lois Miller, #7 David & Jeniece Roher, #8 Karen DellGrottaglia, #9 Frank Bushey & Diana Bushey, #10 Stanley Olson & Margaret Olson, #11 Danielle Flowers, #12 Arlene Fincher & Antoinette Herrera, #13 Anthony & Erin Capobianco, #14 Kawika Villa, #15 Autumn O'Mahoney, #16 Mark & Anne Gay Fawcett, #17 Rick & Darlene Lane, #18 Timothy Staley & Josefina Staley, #19 Elizabeth Eyle)(mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1077 Opt-Out Letters - Bert & Karen Calvert. (Attachments: #1 Eric C. & Victoria D. Watson, #2 Roseanne M. & Stephen J. Elson, #3 Richard & Denice Whitworth, #4 Doreen L. Taylor, #5 Kenneth B. & Joan I. Liebscher, #6 Suzanne Cornell, #7 William F. McCall, #8 Bruce R. Kellam, Jr. & Lois A. Kellam, #9 Thomas & Irene Ryan, #10 Margaret Baldwin, #11 Richard & Cyndy Jacobsmeyer, #12 Don LaBerge & Bonnie LaBerge, #13 Kelly & Julie Bonsall, #14 Lloyd & Mary Venburg, #15 Nancy A. Staley and Larry L. Stewart, #16 Marvin & Mirna Estrada, #17 Kris Hunter, #18 Gary Frank & Geary Ellen Armosino, #19 Teresa L. Ragusano)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1076 Opt Out Letters from: Agobert, Attucks M. and Rudenko, Michele T.. (Attachments: #1 Austin, Robert Kirk and Dawna, #2 Bell, Natalie and Salazar, Sergio, #3 Cervantes, Miguel F. and Marilyn, #4 Copeland, Lorrie, #5 Crews, Gary A. and Terra J., #6 Foster, Timothy and Marty, #7 Huettl, Charles L. and Cheryl U., #8 Johnson, Frederick A. and Margaret L., #9 Kamstra, Robert and Sally, #10 Knecht, Douglas and Vickie, #11 Lewis, David and Irene, #12 Maby, Gary and Brenda, #13 Martin, Harvey L. and Helen M., #14 Nickley, Randy and Sharon, #15 Okada, Eleanor A., #16 Ontjes, James L. and Patricia S., #17 Ott, Dale T. and Kathleen A., #18 Parcher, Elaine and Darrell, #19 Portincasa, Lou Ann, #20 Razon, Ernest, #21 Redman, Martin and Barbara, #22 Risley, Gary and Diane, #23 Schild, Stephen L., #24 Schreiner, Marilyn, #25 Trainer, Marcia, #26 White, Lora T. and Daniel J., #27 Williams, Jefferey and Sharon)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1074 Opt-Out Letter from William & Phyllis Lugenbeal as well as from:. (Attachments: #1 Ronald & Diane Hoffman, #2 Charles & Deborah Boyack, #3 Donald Irwin & Helen Irwin, #4 Lisa Jones, #5 Timothy Leach, #6 Sherry Jacobs, #7 Jay Negus & Christine Negus, #8 Mark Silveira & Donna Ladonga-Silveira, #9 Bruce Rennie, #10 Miles Milbank & Kathryn Milbank, #11 Teresa Fox, #12 Malvero Woods, #13 Clyde Stevick & Wendy Stevick, #14 Theresa Reynolds, #15 James & Suzanne Bailey, #16 Gail & Kevin Kirst, #17 Frederick Coburn & Marion Jean Coburn, #18 Theresa Ferguson, #19 Mark & Patricia Donovan)(mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1073 Opt Out Letters from: Bjeletich, John and Nancy. (Attachments: #1 Campbell, Kathy L, #2 Collins, Patrick D and Megan B., #3 Daley, Susanne C. and Stephen T., #4 Foerster, Paul and Janne, #5 Garrett, John and Christina, #6 Griffin, Loren L. and Barbara L., #7 Jewett, Thomas R. and Linda H., #8 Johnson, Justin and Seeger, Rebekah, #9 King, Don, #10 Kinoshita, Michael and Stephanie, #11 Kono, James, #12 Kopp, Stephen M and Kay M., #13 Morris, Glen and Mary Lou, #14 Ramey, William and Amber, #15 Sinclaire, Rob and Martie, #16 Stevens, Lawrence and Rose Cada, #17 Stevenson, Robert and Patricia, #18 Tanner, Alexis and Lorraine, #19 Wells, Jean C. and Douglas E., #20 Williams, Alice, #21 Williamson, Richard A. and Bianchi-Williamson, Shelly)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1072 Opt-Out Letters. (Attachments: Carolynne Terrell #1 Chris & Susan Westergard, #2 David & Victoria Hatfield, #3 Derrick & Christy Vandeberg, #4 Edward Jahr, #5 Elisa R. Reyes, #6 James & Sharon Magnusson, #7 Jeff Dutra, #8 John & Su May Halim, #9 Joy M. Lake, #10 Kevin Jahr, #11 Leland & Judith Fossgreen, #12 Leonard R. Moon, #13 Loy & Emily Despain, #14 Marlin & Eva Jensen, #15 Maxine Chan, #16 Mike & Dawn Arnone, #17 Paul & Patricia Scheurer, #18 Terry & Marilee Evans, #19 Velma M. Aiken)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1071 Opt-Out Letters: Dusty Tillery; (Attachments: #1 Donna and Robert Teel, #2 Nancy Townsend, #3 Michael and Marcia Tribe, #4 Martinus Vandenbrink, #5 Sharon Whitfield, #6 Barbara-Lee Winterfeld, #7 Max and Sandra Wells, #8 Lynn and Deanna Wright, #9 Virginia and David Yanev, #10 John and Arlene Yinger, #11 Richard and Valerie Zitman)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1070 Opt-Out Letters: Dwayne and Janice Markley; (Attachments: #1 Lucille and James Mendoza, #2 David and Carol Metcalf, #3 Randy and Rebecca Michelsen, #4 Debra Mooney, #5 Carol Morgan, #6 Joyce Mourer, #7 Gary and Patricia Nelson, #8 Theodore and Norma Jean Norton, #9 Alan and Susan Peck, #10 James and Anne Price, #11 Clem and Carolyn Rawlings, #12 Gloria Robinson, #13 Drake Robles and Phyllis Allison, #14 Lilyvette Rodriguez and Robert Crisostomo, #15 Anita Romaine, #16 Marcie Rose, #17 Annette Rich, #18 John and Carol Sanders, #19 Karl and Diane Schott, #20 Charles and Dianne Schwartz, #21 James and Roberta Simpson, #22 Linda Sokolowski)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1069 Opt-Out Letters: Patricia Fletcher; (Attachments: #1 John and Edith Frank, #2 Dean and Yvonne Fritz, #3 Claude and Maureen Fontaine, #4 Frits and Dorothea Fynaut, #5 Susan Gallagher, #6 Luz-Maria Garcia, #7 Alfredo Haynes and janice Hill, #8 Kirk and Kay Hauck, #9 William Hodge, #10 Craig and Sarah Huntley, #11 Doug Hupp, #12 Tanya Jimale, #13 Freddrick and Maria Knox, #14 Richard and Ginger Kent, #15 Joyce Kuelbs, #16 Roger and Donna Lampson, #17 William and Kathy Laurie, #18 David Ray and Tanya Layne, #19 Blossom Lee, #20 Virginia Lee, #21 Vicki Leonard, #22 Gary and Linda Leuzinger, #23 James and Connie Lewis, #24 Charles and Carmen Lindberg, #25 Svenn and Elaine Lovlie)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1068 Opt-Out Letters: Robert and Barbara Alexander; (Attachments: #1 John and Petra Artrip, #2 Gary and Carol Benevento, #3 Gloria Bennewitz, #4 Gary and katherine Blake, #5 Noel and Bienvenida Bofetiado, #6 Jane and Richard Bohy, #7 Janet Boyce and Kenneth Johnson, #8 Gerry and Mary Brown, #9 Dwayne and Margaret Bruns, #10 Allan and Karen Burns, #11 Kim and Shannon Caron, #12 Kenneth and Joy Caudel, #13 Andrew and Lydia Clemens, #14 Robert and Ruth Colebank, #15 John and Meg Davis, #16 Pam Delamorton, #17 Myron and Letitia Denson, #18 James Dir, #19 John and Betty Drew)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1067 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Bess Wong & Rick Applegate: (Attachments: #1 Richard & Carol Sorvig, #2 Judith A. Mitchels, #3 Wilbur C. & Diane M. Lemon, #4 Kathleen Quiniola & Gayle Wilson, #5 James E. & Melynda A. Gissel, #6 Robert E. & Lynda M. Johnston, #7 Larry B. & Sharon Miner, #8 James H. & Beverly J. Collins, #9 Don A. & Faye R. Gilkison, #10 Sarina M. & Tavis D. Elliott, #11 John & Robbyn Seymour, #12 Lorraine F. Bushnell, #13 Patricia Brichford, #14 James D. Smith & Scott Alan Clements, #15 Andre & Nancy Jimenez, #16 Larry & Julie Wible, #17 Marilyn Daniels & Walter Daniels, deceased, #18 John F. & Valerie G. Rusch, #19 Dennis W. & Catheleen R. Lowry)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1066 Opt-Out Letters - Ken Allen. (Attachments: #1 Ralph M. & Judy Kay Harris, #2 Kenneth & Charlene Mehlhoff, #3 Gregory J. & Christine Taylor, #4 Devan & Katie Kress, #5 Wanda L. Davis Kinney, #6 Nelda J. Jones and Janet K. Carroll, #7 Christine L. Partlow, #8 F. Paul French & Donna French, #9 Hajime Tsuha, #10 David M. McHenry & Dolores I. McHenry, #11 Gary Larks & Elizabeth Watt, #12 Jack Lun Chack Fong, #13 Gilbert R. Cota & Libertad Velasco, #14 Chet & Tracey Davis, #15 Wayland & Coralee Wise, #16 Ronald I. & Peggy L. Bowen, #17 Jeffery S. & Michelle R. Marchant, #18 Jon McDaniel & Heather McDaniel)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1065 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Stephen A. Cunningham: (Attachments: #1 Steven & Leslie Kobbe, #2 John Bytendorp & Debra Rakes, #3 Robert & Marleen Stowe, #4 Melvin & Wendy Landes, #5 Kimberly Jewkes (Pavlacka) & Kevin Jewkes, #6 Bradley L. & Linda Capshaw, #7 Robert N. & Agnes A. McLean, #8 Donna & Damen Bleiler, #9 Bettie Bennett, #10 Ralph & Nancy Benson, #11 Robert & Karen Stai, #12 Wayne & Shirley Shelledy, #13 Eric E. & Jacqueline Kay Johnson, #14 Kenneth W. & Frances M. Jones, #15 Janis L. & Joseph W. Trussell, #16 Sandra J. Everett, #17 H. Timothy & Judith C. McCardell, #18 Robin & Steven Bolender, #19 Alan & Kathy Petersen)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1063 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Tim E. & Nina E. Fenkell: (Attachments: #1 Ralph & Karen Walker, #2 Maria Dedet-Blaettler, #3 Harry T. McCray, #4 Terry & Cynthia Kiyama, #5 Ricardo & Francine Menjivar, #6 Manish Maheshwari, #7 Sharon I. Wills, #8 Robert A. Kretz, #9 Robert W. & Mary J. Dutrow, #10 Rhonda Berry, #11 Carl Kalauokalani, #12 Diane J. & James E. Dillamon, #13 Lawrence L. & Carol A. Werhan, #14 Natasha & Michael Rychly, #15 Cathy M. Palmer, #16 F. Paul Schutz, #17 Kyle W. Kelly, #18 Shay & Kira Heward & Alan & Melody Heward, #19 David & Regina Golightly)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1062 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Bruce J. & Joan Whited: (Attachments: #1 Kurt J. & Renee Allen, #2 Rita M. Duncan, #3 Stephen J. & Jane C. LaLane, #4 Gordon H. Gloria A. Reynolds, #5 George & Marjorie Massart, #6 Noah & Jennifer Borstad, #7 Thomas & Kristina Aberle, #8 Steven D. & Deborah C. Smith, #9 Michelle Broome, #10 Craig & Donna McClun, #11 Richard & Stephanie King, #12 Samuel & Nidia Santos, #13 Martin & Teresa Pollock, #14 Curt Read, #15 Norman Henery & Winona Ogan Henderson, #16 James E. & Charlene G. Redden, #17 Leroy F. & Susan J. Berven, #18 Lynn & Jeanette Good, #19 Gabriel Gandia, Sr., & Gayanne Gandia)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1061 Opt-Out Letters - Michelle and Milton Shigemasa. (Attachments: #1 Ervin & Gloria Malkowski, #2 Judity E. Greathouse and Brendan MDF Casey, #3 James & Alice McElroy, #4 Rebecca L. Smith, #5 William F. Kluth, #6 Robert & Laurie Barrett, #7 Cecil & Kathy DeLashmutt, #8 Linda Monrad, #9 Erwin & Sharon Wichner, #10 Martyn & Rosemary Hodgson, #11 Dean & Madeline Etzkorn, #12 Robert E. & Margaret L. Sackett, #13 Ranita Hillis, #14 Timothy & Teri Hansen, #15 Dennis & Amy Metcalfe, #16 Dan & Donielle Gonzales, #17 Mark & Kathleen Saugstad, #18 Yvonne Evans, #19 Jeanne Nelson)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1059 Opt-Out Letters - Robert L. and Carolyn J. Kibler. (Attachments: #1 Paul & Shirley Dix, #2 Ronnie C. Preece, #3 David & Mary Desmarteau, #4 Roland W. & Gail Isaac, #5 Douglas & Deanna Biegel, #6 John & Katherine Wenos, #7 Lyle Schliebe & Joyce Balcom, #8 Charles W. & Mary E. Jasperson, #9 Russell & Lorraine Kimura, #10 Donald H. Farness, #11 Paula R. Puryear Hirn, #12 Antone J. Pedersen & Myrna W. Pedersen, #13 Warren Strycker, #14 Thomas & Judy Stephenson, #15 Dell & Maurine Felix, #16 Susan V. Schang, #17 Gregory E. Petersen, #18 Teh-Liang Joseph & Shiow-Huey Sophy Chow, #19 Gregory & Kathy Low)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1058 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Gary R & Patricia A. Gunning: (Attachments: #1 Donna & Harold Myhre, #2 Bette Van Gasken & Lauren Tuggle, #3 Philip & Ann Kane, #4 Marie J. Thomas, #5 Philip & Lois Braden, #6 John D. & Kathryn A. Brown, #7 David Locey, #8 George P. & Mary L. Hewlett, #9 Lionel F. Souza & Kathryn M. Spilker, #10 Larry A. & Barbara B. Irwin, #11 Lars & Darlene Anderson, #12 George L. & Edith M. Edmundson, #13 Christina Schwarz, #14 Michael & Maria O'Neill, #15 Donald F. & Debra L. Davis, #16 Clara R. Dempsey, #17 Michael D. Larson, #18 Dennis L. & Donna L. Harpe, #19 Gregg G. & Deborah K. Newstrand, #20 Jenny Tsang)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1052 Opt-Out Letters - Robert F. & Gail E. Mann. (Attachments: #1 Evan Frasure & Analyn Frasure, #2 Paulette & John (Jeff) Blain, #3 David & Judith Kirchner, #4 Jimmy Williams, #5 Venice Ostwald, #6 Don Walser & Jessica Walser, #7 Earl Davis & Linda Davis, #8 Francis Thomas & Robert Thomas, #9 Ralph Carr Jr. & Anita Rodriguez-Carr, #10 Cassandra McCurry, #11 Doug Bentley & Marzee Bentley, #12 Robert W. Kendall, #13 Gary & Shirley Tonn, #14 William R. & Karen A. Symms, #15 Robert G. Coleman & Shelley S. Coleman, #16 Ronald L. Opp & Carol L. Opp, #17 Crstal Pokorny & Jocelyn Pokorny, #18 Douglas H. Wickham & Mary C. Wickham)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 1043 Opt-Out Letters - Douglas D. Wolfe & Corine M. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Dennise H. Smith, #2 Harvey Shackleton and Mary Shackleton, #3 Cornelia W. Mann, #4 Leslie Cooke, #5 The Barney Family Trust dated 8/20/04, #6 Benjamin & Susie Patrick, #7 Martha Stockard, #8 William & Arlene Bingham, #9 Ernesto B. Sayo & Joji R. Sayo, #10 Kenneth L. Whitman & Mary Crouch-Whitman, #11 Lynn Miller, #12 Ricardo C. Costello & Ann M. Costello, #13 Fredrick & Karen Green, #14 Lori Folweiler, #15 Robert M. Panzer & Diana H. Panzer, #16 Mike & Marilyn Ballas, #17 Gregory & Eva Popovich, #18 Eric & Stacye Watkins, #19 Edward & Agnes Kroeker)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 983 OBJECTIONS to Settlement by Zoe Smith-Fallgren. (Willett, Stephan) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1139 Opt-Out Letters: from Uk and Sang-Ah Shin, Tini Franklin, Will and Margit Sherwood, Peggy Maynes, Lee Boekelheide, Margaret Bechard, Carmen Cruz-Bradshaw, Denise Napier, Robert & Jeanne Hoyme, Brian and Lori-Jean Soldati, Johnnye B. Blackwell, Robert and Pamela Skipper, Sharon K. Weyland, Dean and Penny M. Byrne, Carole Whitcome, Doug and Kim Roylance, Marilyn Jean Cosgrove, Donald Gary Cosgrove, LaVada Terrell, Edward Carl Strine, Roesli and Leslie Antonis, Laurie Chersinoff and Jaime Ivey. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1138 Opt-Out Letters: from Patrick and Linh Gramata, Jesus and Janet Martinez, David G. and Mary Sanders, Lehi Petersen, Carol L. Cremer, Karl & Debbie Sarpalius, Charles W. and Patsy R. Bassett III, Leroy and Phyllis Scott, Leo R. and M. Dolores Guillory, Terry A. & Nancy Sparks, Fernando & Carmen Antonio, Joseph A. Petrovich, Charles Smith, Dana and Karin Flaten, J.M. & L.J. Harding, Carl and Martha Gillette, Richard A. and Ruby L. Lane, Zandra and William Brant, Richard M. and Shannon M. Cain and Deidre and William Lewis. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1135 Opt-Out Letters: from David Ochi, Charles K and Mary W. Pennington, Jr., Manuel Rito, Jim & Robin Marks, John J. & Joanne O'Reilly, William and Gladys Caddy, Gary & Dianne Crooker, Robert and Helen LaTourette, Danny L. Ruckman, Cynthia Doell, Lisa and Phillip Thomas, Julio A. & Luz M. Maldonado, Robert Yarrigle and Janet Doyle, Gay Teurman, Robyn Lyn Earl, Lloyd and Muriel Willoughby, Christopher M. Roberts, Kristine M. Boggis, Elizabeth Richardson, Lynne Garbe-Recknagel and Siegfried Recknagel and Orville and Marilyn Chugg. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1133 Opt-Out Letters: from Al and Felicia Macias, Tamee Roberts, David C. Jordan, Ramona M. Kaloi, Sheila Ryan Weintraub, John D and Susan Scott, Patricia Madero Espinoza, H. Wayne and Shirley A. Wilkinson, Teresa M. Tidwell, Larry and Lynette Hiebert, Mac E. & N. Raydene Heitzhausen, Joseph & Nancy Witt, Andy and Jennifer Agren, David Shum and Karen Goff, Shirley Bard, Rick Davis, Lisa Kohler, Edward J. Cameron Jr. and Pauline A. Cameron, Vickie L. Hershberger, Virginia Danielsen, Robert D and Sandra C. Seto and David and Jo Dee Preston. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1094 OPT-OUT LETTERS from Paul and Lois Carrigan; Judith H. White and Frederick R. White; Nancy Steiner; Chris O'Rourke and Karen O'Rourke; Lynda Kay Mac Kay; Kelly M. Lundgren; Pedro A. Barragan and Kim B. Barragan; Anne Wardell; Renee Zito and Thomas J. Zito; Gwen Swenson; Robert N. Lumley and Janell L. Lumley; Eric Webb; Claudia Goodman and Gary Goodman; Frederick Reese and Tedi Reese; Joseph D. Lillibridge; Sharon L. Groom; Robert W. Dupar, Sr. and Jessie J. Dupar; Charles T. Young and Debbie Young; Lynne Carraway and Pamela Carraway; Donald W. Wright and Nancy K. Wright. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1082 Opt-Out Letters: from Martha & Peter Philippoff. (Attachments: #1 Elva J. Gonzalez-Robles and Salvador Robles, #2 Evelyn & Ronald Gross, #3 Douglas W.and Michelle M. Holmes, #4 Iulai & Mildred L. Vavao, #5 Stanley & Anne Long, #6 Edwin Ray Anderson, #7 Dominic Gunder, #8 Carlos & Elizabeth Long, #9 Susan Terrell, #10 Joe DeRitis, #11 James J. & Joan M. O'Connell, #12 Judith Dixon, #13 Shafin and Shaiin Merali, #14 Ralph & Virginia M. Villabrille, #15 Greg and Kerry Ann Hamilton, #16 Elizabeth Janna Van Hunnick, #17 Rex L. & Linda M. Turley, #18 Stephen and Kathi Dobbins, #19 Jack and Priscilla Murphy) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1064 Opt-Out Letters. (Raye A Haskell, Attachments: #1 Victor and Gina Papini, #2 Kaye Chegwidden, #3 Loretta Ferem, #4 Janet and Donald Edmonds, #5 Carol Glaser, #6 John Brough and Judy Otteson, #7 Douglas and Penny Flattum, #8 Guilda A. Mora, #9 Janina Rezler, #10 Sharon Seibert dba Seibert Chiropractic, #11 Denise Doyle, #12 Eric and Stephanie Ancheta, #13 Rose Marie Johnson and Jo Ann E.D. Brandt, #14 Ralph and Brenda Adams, #15 Angelique M Aylsworth, #16 Jaqueline L Maize and Wendell Maize, #17 Margi Kenoyer, #18 Laura J Carey, #19 Suzanne and Carmelo Maldonado)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1060 OPT-OUT LETTERS. (Todd and Shari Crow, Attachments: #1 Albert Kodama and Linda Allen-Kodama, #2 Jaqueline A Shupe, #3 Jesse and Brenda Nickelson, #4 Constandinno N Petsas and Judy M Petsas, #5 Courtland G Rhib, #6 Sheryl L Williams, #7 William and Phyllis Wrightson, #8 Michael Abbott and Susan Mayors, #9 Emily Olanoff)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1057 Opt-Out Letters. (Attachments: Alexis E. Wade #1 Antonio & Bertha Martinez, #2 Barbara & Bill Schaffer, #3 Carole J. Cuccia, #4 Chet A. Parket, #5 Frank & Arlene Petro, #6 George & Susan Ohler, #7 Gloria J. Urone, #8 James W. McGraw, #9 Julie Chen & Stephen Chai, #10 Leah Smith, #11 Lillia Hanford, #12 Mia & Michael Sendlakowsk, #13 Perry & Lillian Mayer, #14 Robert & Karen Duffy, #15 Robin Fagundes, #16 Sharlene Van Brunt, #17 Walter & Linda Underwod, #18 Wilson Paz)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1056 Opt-Out Letters. (Attachments: Albert & Ann Leon #1 Amber Lee, #2 Anita Weston, #3 Bryan & Yvonne Reed, #4 Christina Cole, #5 Donald & Paula Gardner, #6 Edwin & Janette Breiddal, #7 Elver S. Boyle, #8 Iacauna & Cymara Dantas, #9 Jane & Cecil Combs, #10 Jerome & Kum Williams, #11 Kim & Kimberly Salian, #12 Kiwon Yang & Beatrice De Rusha, #13 Lisa & Roger Spencer, #14 Lorene J. Soderstrom, #15 Maurice & Heathers Tyers, #16 Rea Crane, #17 Richard & Randi Wood, #18 Samuel & Crystal Lewis, #19 Stanley C. Teausant)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1055 Opt-Out Letters: Aalia Pastrana; (Attachments: #1 Carol Paz, #2 Melo Jean Del Pozo, #3 Ronnald Popp, #4 Cindy Ragus (aka Cynthia Glasgow-Ragus), #5 Sylvester and Theresa Richardson, #6 Richard and Velma Riggs, #7 Carol Russell, #8 John and Delia Russo, #9 Lynn Sanders, #10 Richard and Diane Scott, #11 Lawrence Kyunghee Silva, #12 Noel and Gilda Silver, #13 Rick and Corrine Smith, #14 Barry and Deobra Solomon, #15 Jesse and Amelia Stone, #16 Stephen Stotesbery, #17 Terry Summa, #18 Nello and Debra Tanner, #19 Robert and Elisabeth Thompson, #20 Robert and Janice Thompson, #21 Benjamin and Filipina Veneracion, #22 Edward and Betty Wahl, #23 Gary and Terry Writ, #24 Echo Wieland-Moss, #25 Bonnie-Caprice and LeRoy Wing, #26 Harold and Genella Williamson, #27 Ronald Worden, #28 Charles and Berit Willsie)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1054 Opt-Out Letters: Eric Leroy and Danielle Johnson; (Attachments: #1 Jennifer Jordan, #2 Jerry and Christine Jones, #3 Yoichi and Josephine Katayama, #4 Suren and Kumud Kapadia, #5 Smita and Vikesh Khoot, #6 Walter and Christina Kotecki, #7 Ken and Pam Lim, #8 Scott and Barbara Lubbers, #9 Roger Lucero, #10 Anthony Malfatti, #11 David and Susan Marling, #12 Elizabeth Martinez-Kaehler, #13 Stephen and Catherine Mock, #14 Harry and Virginia Meadows, #15 Joel and Arlene Mounce, #16 Catherine Myers, #17 Alice Najar, #18 Laura Novello, #19 Marlowe Odhner and Terianne Cladianos)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1053 Opt-Out Letters: Frank and Carol Debrick; (Attachments: #1 Michael and Robin Decker, #2 Greg Deckrow, #3 Laurie and Jean Marc Decuyper, #4 Gerald Mark Edwards and Debra May Crampton, #5 Diane Farrington, #6 Priscilla Fraser and Ina Mae Niven, #7 Delme Fry (aka Elizabeth Delme Fry), #8 Bart and Tracy Fullmer, #9 Michael and Barbara Goggin, #10 Manuel and Martha Gutierrez, #11 Kevin and Kimberly Hendricks, #12 Frank Henigman, #13 William and Denna Hofmann, #14 Mike Hong and Kyung Ah Kwon, #15 William and Paulette Hordyk, #16 David and Rosemarie Howell, #17 Albert Leon and Ann Etta Huber)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1051 Opt-Out Letters. (Attachments: Bruce K. & Doris B. Jacobson #1 Elpidio & Maria Masbad, #2 Frank E & Rebecca S Mock, #3 Ken Allen, #4 Lori B. Peterson, #5 Lynn & Kay Sagers, #6 Marjean Otis & Mary Clifford, #7 Michael & Doris Brannan, #8 Michael Hennahane, #9 Patricia Thompson, #10 Paul & Carol Brugger, #11 Philip & Lynn Roberts, #12 Ralph M. Swift, #13 Ruth C. Hill, #14 Sonya Howes, #15 Steve & Denise Buckles, #16 Terrie J. Hansen, #17 Thor & Marilyn Lindberg, #18 Timothy & Vivian Mangan, #19 Troy & Barbara Coyle)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1050 Opt-Out Letters: Omar and Delia Adefuin; (Attachments: #1 Lorenzo and Karen Adela, #2 Kenneth Angliongto, #3 Mary Arao, #4 Donald Beatty, #5 Charles Besondy, #6 Pier Blandon, #7 Betty Brant, #8 William and Denise Brasher, #9 John Bredstrand and Gwenda Jones, #10 Dasie Braun, #11 Derek and Dianne Boniface, #12 Ellen and Richard Cavagnaro, #13 Bethanie Christopher, #14 Alicia and Herb Chu, #15 Carolyn Cicotte, #16 Jay and Pam Clark, #17 Jacqueline Cothran)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1047 Opt-Out Letters. (Dennis M. Marcisz and Jane M. Clemens, Attachments: #1 Mario and Wendy Mallegni, #2 Keith Duescher, #3 Jason and Wendy Lin, #4 Richard and Patricia Stebbins, #5 Maria C Rodriguez, #6 Julius and Beverly Ann Gyori, #7 Horst Nelle, #8 Alfred and Joan Barnard, #9 Louis D. Griffin and Nancy W. Griffin)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1044 Opt-Out Letters. (Attachments: Angelina M. Hook #1 Arthur & Ferne Loolpe, #2 Barbara Buchanan, #3 Christopher Arriaga & Cassie Pennington, #4 Coleen Headley & Joan Evans, #5 Cynthia Carley, #6 David M. Hall, #7 David Snow, #8 Errett Fuchs & Beverly Rapp, #9 Eva Gordon Herrick, #10 J Steven & Janet Soulier, #11 Jerome Hauber & Maria da Silva, #12 Jesse & Brenda Nickelson, #13 John & Carla Christenson, #14 Lawrence JT Young, #15 Marina Shudic, #16 Phillip & Arline Dixon, #17 Steven & Amy Black, #18 Suzanne M. Rose, #19 Tony Armendariz)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1042 Opt-Out Letters. (Attachments: Barbara J. Clausen #1 Bill Manning, #2 Charles & A. Jane Reinhardt, #3 Charles & Mary Briggs, #4 Clarice B. Schorzman, #5 Dan & Carolynn Kincaid, #6 Diedra D. Booker, #7 Frank & Rachel Janowicz, #8 Gail G. Conway, #9 Gary & Sue Lederman, #10 James Monroe, #11 Khaled and Leila Sellami, #12 Leticia & Humberto Villarreal, #13 Linda Underwood, #14 Marva M. Canada, #15 Ray & JoAnn Prestegard, #16 Robert & Irene Fairchilds, #17 Rose Family Trust, #18 Stephen & Jean Sukovez, #19 William & Barbara Laffoon)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1040 Opt-Out Letters. (Carol Waterbury, Attachments: #1 Star Von Laue, #2 Kenneth J Abell, #3 Lynette Howlett and Sondra Wilson, #4 Victor D Dobyns, #5 Eugenie Krager, #6 Duane S. Bietz and Eunice F. Bietz, #7 Michael J Price and Maureen Borg, #8 James W Majeske and Carolyn L Majeske, #9 James D Foster and Laurel J Foster, #10 Carey Diment)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 1037 Opt-Out Letters. (Margaret Antico, Attachments: #1 Elaine C Hardin, #2 Cheryl Slape, #3 Gregory Berkowitz, #4 Bob and Margaret Shepard, #5 Greg and Elizabeth Vesely, #6 Robin Parker, #7 Ann McMahon, #8 Linda J Sowell, #9 Darshalle Diamond)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1046 Opt-Out Letters: Gordon and Judy Cox; (Attachments: #1 Elaine Cronin, #2 Scott and Carma Daniels, #3 Carol Layton, #4 Mervin Layton, #5 Robert and Jean Silva)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1034 Letter dated 07/05/11: from David Richard Coleman & Tracey Jane Coleman. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1033 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Laurence R. Warren & Kathy R. Warren. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1032 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Mary Ellen Walsh. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1031 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Robert & Karen Brooks. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1030 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Agustin C. Palma & Lucita Palma. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1029 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Robert E. Mahan & Audrey L. Mahan. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1028 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Robert Edgar & Leslie Edgar. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1027 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Denis Carrade & Mary Singler. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1026 Letter dated 07/01/11: from Martin Hronec & Linda Hronec. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1025 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Amelia Lee. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1024 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Jeff & Rose Lunsmann. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1023 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Richard & Constance Yee. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1022 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Roxine P. Kolbuke. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1021 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Christine shoberg/Brian Berry. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1020 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Annabell Abeleda. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1019 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Susan Garcia-Swain. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1018 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Roscoe E. & Susan M. Martin. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1017 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Boutros Abi-Nader & Georgia Abi-Nader. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1016 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Timothy & Carol Perkins. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1015 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Theodore J & Norma J. Brown. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1014 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Brent Kringle & Carol Kringle. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1013 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Edmund & Zena Law. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1012 Letter dated 07/02/11: from Eric L & Sandra L. Clarke. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1011 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Gary J. & Elinore M. Freeman. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1010 Letter dated 07/05/11: from William K. Halderman & Anna M. Halderman. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1009 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Concepcion Laborin. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1008 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Shaob Kamran, Firdous Kamran. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1007 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Chad & Catherine Kassirer. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1006 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Ruth Webster & Marvin Webster. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1005 Letter dated 07/02/11: from Robert S. Evans & Carl A. Burton. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1003 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Theodore E. & Kay S. Robinson. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1002 Letter dated 07/02/11: from Gregory L. Holden, Sr., & Wanda M. Holden. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1001 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Richard R. Marshall. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 1000 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Agustin C. Palma & Lucita A. Palma. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 999 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Anita Lopez & Mark Reinhold. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 998 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Mary H. Joseph. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 997 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Gloria R. Del Rosario. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 996 Letter dated 07/03/11: from William C. & Margaret E. Sawyer. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 995 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Veronica McKnight. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 994 Letter 06/30/11: from James & Suzie Werts. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 993 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Cynthia Galloway & Cindy Ryan. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 992 Letter dated 06/24/11: from Mrs. Jan Johnstone. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 991 Letter dated 07/04/11: from William H. Slay III & Charmaine J. Metcalf. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 990 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Sandra Wetrich. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 989 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Ralph Saunders & Kathleen Saunders. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 988 Letter dated 07/05/11: from James Allen Rose & Pamela Mary Rose. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 987 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Marie S. Beals & Richard C. Basinger. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 986 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Sam Statham. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 985 Letter dated 07/05/11: from William J. Trautman & Linda J. Trautman. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 984 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Sergio M. Reyes & Michele S. Reyes. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 982 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Pamela K. Rohrkemper. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 981 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Terri L. Lewis. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 980 Letter dated 07/05/11: from James David Gibson & Shirley Ann Gibson. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 979 Letter dated 07/02/11: from Judith L. Ashton. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 978 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Bert & Lila Greenberg. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 977 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Steven M. Tuma. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 976 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Edward W. & janet S. Braillard. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 975 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Randall & Frances Bonser. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 974 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Linda Krugman. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 973 Letter dated 07/01/11: from Dante & Eleanor Venturi. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 972 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Oliver & Carolyn Wilson. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 971 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Alan E. Aceves & Michele E. Aceves. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 967 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Alden Marks & Kimberli Marks. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 965 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Ken and Mary Aichholz. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 964 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Lourdes C. Rabara. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 962 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Alvin K. Hagiwara & Katherine S. Hagiwara. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 957 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Gayle Todd. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 955 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Robert F. Murray & Roberta E. Murray. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 954 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Ronald A. Brooks & Audrey L. Brooks. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 953 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Terri L. Toole. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 952 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Linda Haney. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 951 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Linda Woods & George C. Woods. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 950 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Larry & Pam Combs. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 949 Letter dated 07/04/11: from David & Carol Hutchinson. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 948 Letter dated 07/02/11: from Douglas R. Wood & Sheryl O. Wood. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 947 Letter dated 07/02/11: from Willard A. Reinke & June E. Reinke. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 946 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Zabeth Cooper. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 945 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Dorothy J. Bray. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 944 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Nanette D. Sullivan & Foster H. Jessup. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 943 Letter dated 07/04/11: from William R. Shoemaker & Barbara Armington. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 942 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Dwight Allen Harper & Irene Kathryn Harper. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 941 Letter dated 07/02/11: from Geral Carsman & Linda Carsman. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 940 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Ben Inouye & Ruby Inouye. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 939 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Martin & Frances Weeks. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 937 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Wray & Arlene Winterlin. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 935 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Mary Beth Moore. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 934 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Doug & Leslie Duncan. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 933 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Steve & Linda Hodge. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 932 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Morgan McDonald. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 931 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Theodora Johnson. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 930 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Joseph O. DeLeon & Shirley A. DeLeon. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 929 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Teri Frangie. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 928 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Patrick H. Miller & Francine N. Miller. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 927 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Kenneth I. Repp & Halina C. Repp Revocable Trust. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 926 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Gary & Jolie Rivait. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 925 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Suzanne M. Angeo & Greg G. Angeo. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 924 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Frank R. Crabtree & Dona R. Crabtree. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 922 Letter dated 07/02/11: from Carole McGrath. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 919 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Kirsten Dumford, Karen Smith. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 917 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Marlene M. Halden Rice. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 916 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Susan Merrill. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 915 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Jane V. Woodbeck. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 914 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Leland Dance & Gail Dance. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 912 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Lyle & Janice Kreger. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 911 Letter dated 07/05/11: from David L. Davis & Thelma B. Davis. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 909 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Carol/Jackie Gann. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 908 Letter dated 07/04/11: from William & Karen Douglas. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 907 Letter dated 07/05/11: from William T. Jones & Carol Y. Jones. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 906 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Ray Virgil Farrell & Linda Diane Farrell. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 905 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Alvin Weiss & Mary Weiss. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 904 Letter dated 07/02/11: from Willard & Beverly Buchanan. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 903 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Janet L. Rose. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 902 Letter dated 07/05/11: from V. Dean & Barbara A. Sims. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 901 Letter dated 07/03/11: from David & Germaine Zenk. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 900 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Frederick Graebe & Hildegard Graebe. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 899 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Barbara Brown. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 898 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Barbara Bowden & Bert Laurence. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 895 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Chris Morales & Diane DuBois. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 894 Letter dated 07/02/11: from James & Jessica C. Pelletier. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 893 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Charles R. & Michele E. Brown. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 891 Letter dated 07/02/11: from Darryl & Sheena Victoria. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 889 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Michael Green. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 888 Letter dated 07/02/11: from Maryann Coole. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 886 Letter dated 07/05/11: from William Irvine & Karen J. Franzenburg. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 885 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Irene Sanchez. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 884 Letter dated 07/05/11: from L'Dean McCue & Nancy McCue. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 882 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Chris Del Grande. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 881 Letter from Joshua S. Kantor. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 880 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Dale & A. Louise Moscrop. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 879 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Clifford & Dorothy Yip. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 878 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Arthur & Virginia Mulligan. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 877 Letter dated 07/05/11: from George R. & Sheila Adkins. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 876 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Richard & Lulu Robertson, WorldMark Diamond Owners. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 875 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Robert & Linda Erbe. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 874 Letter dated 07/05/11: from John & Colette Rule. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 873 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Andres & Mercy Ruiz. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 872 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Jon Olson & Kimberly Olson. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 871 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Hans E.S. Krieger & Margaret Krieger. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 870 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Edward Lapp & Gloria Lapp. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 869 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Judy O'Brien. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 868 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Robert L. Ames & Linda C. Ames. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 866 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Sharon A. Peterson & Jon W. Peterson. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 864 Letter dated 07/03/11: from Ewell M. Thompson & Maureen J. Thompson. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 863 Letter dated 07/02/11: from John Logsdon & Melinda Rayne. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 860 Letter dated 07/04/11: from Victor Jin. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 858 Letter dated 07/01/11: from Steve Skold & Sharon Skold. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 856 Letter 07/04/11: from Candice Quist-Potter, Douglas Potter. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 854 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Jerry Hsieh. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 852 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Daryl and Carolyn Sheley. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 851 Letter dated 7/4/11: from Jason and Lynn Sherwood. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 1347 Letter dated 6/29/2011 from Estela V. Untalan. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 1041 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Tann & Helena J. Teeples: (Attachments: #1 Doug & Mary Rhinehart, #2 Doris A. Wach, #3 Ronald & Eleanor Eccles, #4 Michael & Yvonne Gillette, #5 Randall K. & Carol R. Koerselman, #6 Jan Luscombe, #7 Carol & Tim Mease, #8 Phung Truong & Tina Vo, #9 Edward & Kara Lynn Rankin, #10 William O. & Marilyn Whitaker, #11 Fred W. Brock, Jr., & Mary Ellen F. Brock, #12 David A. Dahn & Carol M. Schraad-Dahn, #13 Donna Dillon, #14 Thomas L. & Teresa A. Sutro, #15 Vicki Sandefer, #16 Robert & Stacy Dahowski, #17 Dale A. & Charlotte A. Griffin, #18 Stephen & Carmel Jette)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 1039 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Rebecca Spence: (Attachments: #1 Clarence J. & Robin M. Williams, #2 Tracy Villarreal, #3 Joshua & Carolina Holt, #4 Andrea & George Vasali, #5 Suzanne Bentley, #6 Bruce & Beryl Simmerok, #7 John M. & Kathleen M. Coles, #8 Samuel & Wendy Livingston, #9 Teddy & Carol Leong, #10 Robert Hayes & Terry Collins, #11 Bernardino & Marjorie Ramos, #12 Paul D. Veerkamp, #13 Spencer K. & Marilyn S. Rigby, #14 Larry E. & Lee Ann Palmer, #15 Shirley Whyte, #16 Jerry A. Bailey, #17 Walter J. Bates & Leesa D. Burr-Bates, #18 Manuel & Rosario De Leon, #19 Connie Hooper)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 1004 Letter dated 07/05/11: from Celeste & Jerry Binnings. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 1, 2011 Filing 1115 Opt-Out Letters: Charles D. Bodeen, Lena M. Bodeen, Barbara Barry, Russell Carpenter. Fred Collin, Cheri Collin, James R. Crouse, Chrys M. Crouse, Stephanie Daniel, Sharon Gustafson, Robert Housman, Connie Housman, Douglas Keller, Betty Keller, Jonathan Levine, Elizabeth Pritzker, William Otani, Cair Otani, Elmer W. Pumphrey III, James E. Richardson, Mary T. Richardson, George Skorich, Darrell Sloss, Doris Sloss, Jann L. Smith, Christine Soland, Arne Soland, Marion K. Stanley, Kathleene L. Stanley, Raymond Swalley, Marjory Swalley, Jerry D. Tonkin, Judith D. Tonkin, Constance Van Metre (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 Filing 1038 OPT-OUT LETTERS: Elena Oswald: (Attachments: #1 Debra L. Wilson, #2 Donald K. & Lynne E. Burr, #3 James W. Cameron, #4 Phillip & Susan Sword, #5 Lyle E. & Barbara J. Cabe, #6 Toby & Kelly Taylor, #7 Lee & Angela Pounds, #8 Brian & Charlene Tahara, #9 Eric J. & Mayra G. Contreras, #10 Ms. Thelma L. Lamar, #11 Robert D. Adams, #12 Lawrence & Nancy Schmitt, #13 Lee H. & Sharon E. Loomis, #14 Douglas L. & Terri J. Miller, #15 Larry O. & Patricia Jenkins, #16 Allen G. & Elaine R. Dempsey, #17 Cheryl Lingren)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 30, 2011 Filing 1036 Opt-Out Letters: Carlos & Mardell Xavier: (Attachments: #1 Alan R. Sullivan, #2 John & Beverly McKnight, #3 George E. & Sally A. King, #4 Michael E. Fox, #5 Philip L. & Melody V. Higley, #6 Alan & Barbara Larick, #7 Donald R. & Charlotte E. Benusa, #8 Michael E. Fox, #9 Don H. & Gwendolyn Lee, #10 James & Sandra DeAngelo, #11 Barbara Zielstra, #12 Nea & Susan Ninteman, #13 Larry K. & Carolyn J. Kingry, #14 G. Bill & Peggy J. Jimenez, #15 Robert & Leslie Crain, #16 Michael E. Fox, #17 Donald & Delores Freeman)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 1035 Opt-Out Letters. Marek & Elzbleta Filipczuk, (Attachments: #1 Connie M. Smith, #2 Jim & Sandy Vivian, #3 Gregory L. & Louise R. Miller, #4 Joseph & Jane'se Lymp, #5 George L. Van Cleave, #6 Carol Ringus, #7 Allen & Edith Weinrub, #8 Haiguang Chu & Dehui Weng, #9 Harold Alan Welles & Carita G. Welles, #10 Sandra L. & Cody J. Mccausland, #11 John D. & Rita M. Purson, #12 David Abramsky & Joan Greenberg, #13 Jerry & Sharon Bragg, #14 Lawrence E. & Mary L. Curran, #15 Pamela Johnson-Bennett, #16 Timothy Hudson & Maria Barandica, #17 Eldon Howard & Beverly Jean Capener, #18 James W. & Kathleen A. Lunte, #19 Arlyn A. Espinoza)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 970 Letter dated 6/22/2011 from Bruce Rockwell and Charlotte Rockwell. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 969 Letter dated 6/22/2011 D. Roger and Bonnie Conrad. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 968 Letter dated 6/21/2011 from Mark Blosser and Virginia Blosser. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 966 Letter dated 6/23/2011 Michael Crabbs. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 963 Letter dated 6/21/2011 from Paul C. Noetling and Pamela A. Noetling. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 961 Letter dated 6/21/2011 from Marilynn O'Brien and Frank O'Brien. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 960 Letter dated 6/17/2011 from Stephen Fielding and Carol Fielding. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 959 Letter dated 6/18/2011 from Carol Webber. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 958 Letter dated 6/21/2011 Karen Buck and Walter R. Buck. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 956 Letter dated 6/23/2011 from Judith K. Pelletier and Gerald Pelletier. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 938 Letter dated 6/20/2011 from Susan L Knudson and Robert Knudson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 936 Letter from John Marshall and Marily Reynolds Movius. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 923 Letter from David J. Rose and Corinne R. Rose. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 921 Letter from dated 6/23/2011 from Tom and Penny Huck. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 920 Letter from Rebecca Domeier. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 918 Letter dated 6/24/2011 from Shirley Hackert and Roxene Harrison. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 913 Letter from Joe and Kil Rodgers. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 910 Letter from Robert and Donna Green. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 897 Letter dated 6/21/2011 from Goerge & Rosetta L. Hamlin. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 896 Letter dated 6/22/2011 from Robert and Barbara Yungeberg. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 892 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from Wendy Oughton. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 890 Letter dated 6/21/2011 from Glen M. Torrance. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 887 Letter dated 6/21/2011 from Beverly Eckert. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 883 Letter dated 6/18/2011 from Ruthanne Blevans. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 867 Letter dated 6/21/2011 from Lois I. Sanders. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 865 Letter dated 6/20/2011 from John A. Chapman and Mary C. Turnquist. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 862 Letter dated 6/22/2011 from Carl G. and Marie A. Bodin. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 861 Letter dated 6/18/2011 from Kenneth and Sally Trager. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 859 Letter dated 6/18/2011 from Lorijean Ginotti-McDonald. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 857 Letter dated 6/22/2011 from Francis & Betty Frye. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 855 Letter dated 6/19/2011 Kevin & Elizabeth Patchett. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 853 Letter dated 6/21/2011 from Kathy J. Puckett. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 850 Letter dated 6/19/2011 from Kevin and Elizabeth Patchett. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 849 Letter dated 6/21/2011 from Fred Gibbs and Susan Farnsworth. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 848 Letter dated 6/19/2011 from Darcie McAlister. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 847 Letter dated 6/20/2011 from Hung Ma and Hien Ma. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 846 Letter dated 6/20/2011 from Beverly Rushing and Sandra Kephart. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 845 Letter dated 6/16/2011 from Jim and Shirley Nicholas. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 844 Letter dated 6/14/2011 from Daniel Villegas and Beatriz Villegas. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 843 Letter dated 6/22/2011 from Janice A. Stevens. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 842 Letter dated 6/20/2011 from Myron D. Shenk and Carol L. Shenk. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 841 Letter from Kim Rowe and Kenneth W. McCracken. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 840 Letter dated 6/15/2011 from Barry and Barbara Cook. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 839 Letter dated 6/21/2011 from Michal Bouilly and Roger Bouilly. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 838 Letter from Armond and Deanna Scaccalosi. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 837 Letter from Joni and Don Olsen. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 836 Letter dated 6/18/2011 from Rodger Schmitt and Jill Schmitt. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 835 Letter dated 6/13/2011 Hannah Gordon. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 834 Letter dated 6/15/2011 from Linda Glines. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 833 Letter dated 6/21/2011 from Ken Crocker and Liz Crocker. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 832 Letter dated 6/20/2011 from Walter Barga. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011) Modified on 7/1/2011 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2011 Filing 831 Letter dated 6/19/2011 from Rodney O. Thompson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 830 Letter dated 6/20/2011 from Thomas and Beverly Rushing. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 798 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephan F Willett (Willett, Stephan) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 829 Letter dated 6/20/2011 from JoAnn Anderson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 828 Letter dated 6/12/2011 from Annette Schon and Susan Abrams. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 827 Letter from James L. Peterson and Donna S. Peterson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 826 Letter dated 6/16/2011 from Frederick Grawey and Jody Grawey. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 825 Letter dated 6/17/2011 from William Fennema and Lorrie Fennema. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 824 Letter dated 6/11/2011 from Pat Nipper. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 823 Letter dated 6/15/2011 from Lonny Schadler and Jean Snider Schadler. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 822 Letter dated 6/17/2011 from Todd V. Putnam and Diana E. Putnam. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 821 Letter dated 6/18/2011 from Richard C. Berg and Maurveen Berg. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 820 Letter dated 6/18/2011 from Henry Kimball and Evonne Kimball. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 819 Letter dated 6/17/2011 from Scott J. and Heidi M. Trinkle. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 802 Letter dated 6/11/2011 from Robert W. George and Lynn M. George. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 818 Letter dated 6/17/2011 from Earl J. Waits and Margaret J. Shepherd. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 817 Letter dated 6/16/2011 from Donald and Karen Voggenthaler. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 816 Letter dated 6/17/2011 from Roxanne L. Hanneman. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 815 Letter dated 6/17/2011 from Jeryl and Janelle Detweiler. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 814 Letter dated 6/17/2011 from Richard Cohen. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 813 Letter from Steven & LuAnn Blea. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 812 Letter from Martin D. Parish and Cynthia A. Parish. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 811 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from Benjamin Shelley. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 810 Letter dated 6/16/2011 from James M. Ascher & Susette L. McCann. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 809 Letters dated 6/13/2011 from Stuart R. Vogt, Jodi Wright Vogt and Joan Wright. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 808 Letter dated 6/15/2011 from John and Joann Breeden. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 807 Letter from David L. Neff and Elayne M. Neff. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 806 Letter from Gary & Phyllis Smith. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 805 Letter dated 6/17/2011 from Bernard (Barney) Rabold. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 804 Letter dated 6/18/2011 from Arthur Tefelski and Dorothy Tefelski. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 803 Letter dated 6/14/2011 from Don and Judy Golckner. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 801 Letter dated 6/14/2011 from Robert and Patricia Ackerman. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 800 Letter dated 6/14/2011 from Don and Carol Gravatt. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 799 Letter dated 6/15/2011 from Kathryn J. and Leslie R. Hintz. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 797 Letter dated 6/8/2011 from Rebecca Trask. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 796 Letter dated 6/13/2011 from David M. Hansen. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 795 Letter dated 6/12/2011 from Sherry L. Potter. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 794 Letter dated 6/14/2011 from Peter Haley and Toni Haley. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 793 Letter dated 6/15/2011 from Christine Pounds and Marlow Pounds. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 792 Letter dated 6/14/2011 from Vincent Warhol and Beverly A. Warhol. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 791 Letter dated 6/12/2011 from Susan and Mark Abrams. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 790 Letter from Walter K. Tannert and Ann J. Tannert. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 789 Letter from from John E. Filar III. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 788 Letter from Anita Berry Stoffer. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 787 Letter dated 6/12/2011 from Lawrence P. Bauman. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 786 Letter from Michael Hocking. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 785 Letter dated 6/14/2011 from Michael & Waldi Rook. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 784 Letter dated 6/16/2011 from Michael E. Rodacker and Sheryl A. Rodacker. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 783 Letter dated 6/13/2011 Corey D. Breneman and Joy A. Breneman. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 782 Letter dated 6/14/2011 Mike and Patty Miller. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 781 Letter from Michael W. Hill & Connie Kesterson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 779 Letter from Robert Muller & Barbara Muller dated 6/11/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 778 Letter from Jan and Chuck Volz (not dated). (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 777 Letter from James Larsen and Ann Larsen dated 6/11/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 776 Letter from Wentworth Clapham Jr. and Anita Stoll dated 6/10/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 775 Letter from Shirlee Valo dated 6/13/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 774 Letter from Laureen Harris dated 6/12/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 773 Letter from Kelly and Darleen Moller dated 6/9/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 772 Letter from Nicholas Canepa & Sheila Canepa dated 6/14/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 771 Letter from John and Beverly Przybylski dated 6/11/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 770 Letter from Donald Morgan (dated 6/14/2011) & Susan Morgan (dated 6/13/2011). (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 769 Letter from Robert and Janice Agnew dated 6/10/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 768 Letter from Carole Nomura dated 6/12/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 767 Letter from Ruben and Phyllis Kagawa dated 6/10/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 766 Letter from Jeffrey Whicker & Lynda Whicker dated 6/13/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 765 Letter from James & Patricia Jacobson dated 6/10/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 764 Letter from Marc & Turi Janes dated 6/9/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 763 Letter from Peg Leland (not dated). (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 762 Letter from Pat & Marley Jo Marinacci dated 6/12/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 761 Letter from Pat & Marley Jo Marinacci dated 6/12/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 760 Letter from Fred and Terry Timm dated 6/14/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 759 Letter from James Foss & Janine Ploegman dated 6/12/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 749 Letter dated 6/12/2011 from Maureen Trettel. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 748 Letter from Jun Ye and Jie Gao. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 747 Letter dated 8/13/2011 from Calle Ebano. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 746 Letter dated 6/14/2011 from Geoffrey C. Ullmann & Debra A. Ullmann. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 745 Letter dated 8/13/2011 from Avenida Neblina. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 744 Letter dated 6/10/2011 from Stephen Morgan. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 743 Letter dated 6/12/2011 from Lyle and Sandra Evertsen. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 742 Letter dated 6/13/2011 from Catherine and Neil Lucas. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 780 Letter from Amy and Joe Roszak dated 6/9/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 758 Letter from Mike Nicksic & Marilyn Nicksic dated 6/10/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 757 Letter from Leonard Sussman dated 6/10/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 756 Letter from R.G. Doll & Judith Doll (not dated). (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 755 Letter from Gabrielle Middleton and Gregory Snow dated 6/9/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 754 Letter from Michael Hurley and Patricia Hurley dated 6/13/2011. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 753 Letter dated 6/6/2011 Errol & Bonnie Maddox. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 752 Letter dated 6/10/2011 from Jamuel R. Logozzo and Jeannine M. Logozzo. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 751 Letter dated 6/10/2011 from Mar Cherf and Pam Hamann. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 750 Letter from Alfred Wong and Loretta Wong. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 741 Letter dated 6/8/2011 from Richard Foster and Lynda Foster. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 740 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from Nancy Sullivan. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 739 Letter from David Simon. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 738 Letter from Roy Miyamoto. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 737 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from James Schreiber and Kathy Schreiber. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 736 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from Wilson Smith. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 735 Letter dated 6/8/2011 from Robert Martindale and Teresa Martindale. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 734 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from Douglas and Sandra Hill. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 733 Letter dated June 5, 2011 from John B. Geier and Myrna J. Geier. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 732 Letter dated 6/10/2011 from Fred and Karen Aliano. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 731 Letter dated 6/8/2011 from Douglas Grant. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 730 Letter dated 6/10/2011 from Edward and Patricia Carrillo. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 729 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from Stephanie L. Thomas. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 728 Letter dated 6/10/2011 from James A. Roth and Marilyn M. Roth. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 727 Letter dated 6/10/2011 Zulmara Cline and Paul Cline. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 726 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from Herb Mallard and Sherry Mallard. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 725 Letter dated 6/8/2011 from Benjamin F. Hammack and Diane F. Hammack. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 724 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from Darrell Checketts and Nancy Checketts. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 723 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from Mary Ann Reschke. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 722 Letter dated 6/10/2011 from Richard Stainer and Marilyn Stainer. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 721 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from Roger and Jerry Hoff. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 720 Letter dated 6/11/2011 from Wilbur R. Wortham. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 719 Letter dated 6/8/2011 from Howard Green. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 718 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from Ruth Davis. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 717 Letter dated 6/9/2011 Dean Kent Bradford. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 716 Letter dated 6/10/2011 from Diana Pearson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 715 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from Keith Sheldon and Shelley Annette Witwer. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 714 Letter from Samantha Mora. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 713 Letter dated 6/8/2011 from Nancy Congleton. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 712 Letter dated June 8, 2011 from Bruce L. Rawlins. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 711 Letter dated June 11, 2011 from John Minnoch. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 710 Letter dated June 10, 2011 from Bob Hagen and Ling Wu. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 709 Letter dated June 9, 2011 from Myron Parr & Gwen Parr. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 708 Letter dated June 6, 2011 from Dennis Pleasant and Rachelle Pleasant. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 707 Letter dated 6/9/2011 from Richard Miller. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 706 Letter dated 5/26/2011 from Daniel Van and Vanessa Van. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 705 Letter dated 6/2/2011 from Craig S. Hunter. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 702 Proposed Order re #696 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 701 Proposed Order re #695 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 700 Declaration of Lance Blair in Support of #696 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, #695 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #696 , #695 ) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 699 Declaration of Kandice Scattolon in Support of #696 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, #695 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #696 , #695 ) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 698 Declaration of Clarke and Rebecca Wixon and Norman and Barbara Wixon in Support of #696 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, #695 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #696 , #695 ) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 697 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine in Support of #696 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, #695 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #696 , #695 ) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 696 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses filed by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 695 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation filed by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 694 Declaration of David Herrick in Support of #683 Order, Set Hearings, Terminate Hearings,,, filed byWyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Related document(s) #683 ) (Loeffler, Alan) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 703 Letter dated May 31, 2011 from Charles Stanger. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 704 Letter dated 5/30/2011 from Mary & Larry Pelegrin. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 693 Letter dated 5/24/2011 from Gene and Dorothy Morehouse. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 692 Letter dated 5/26/2011 from Georgina Oostema. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 691 Letter dated March 23, 2011 from Charles Stanger. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 690 Letter dated 5/21/2011 from Ralph & Karen Lentz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 689 Letter dated 5/23/2011 from Guadalupe Garcia. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 687 Letter dated 5/15/2011 from James R. Ferguson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 23, 2011 Filing 688 Letter dated 5/17/2011 from John D. Lee. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 23, 2011 Filing 686 Letter dated 5/18/2011 from Ronald Birchard. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 23, 2011 Filing 685 Letter dated 5/18/2011 from Dean R. Spencer. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 20, 2011 Filing 684 Letter dated 5/17/2011 from Todd Hammond. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011) (hdj, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER APPROVING CLASS NOTICE AND SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL HEARING AS MODIFIED HEREIN: FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL HEARING set for 8/5/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011) Modified on 4/19/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2011 Filing 682 RESPONSE to re #681 Order regarding Joint Status Report by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 681 ORDER RE #678 Status Report. Response due by April 20, 2011. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 18, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 Filing 680 Proposed Order re #678 Status Report, by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 Filing 679 Declaration of Charles A. Bott in Support of #678 Status Report, filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #678 ) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 Filing 678 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Section II.1.c of the Proposed Class Settlement between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER Status Conference set for 4/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Further joint status report to be filed by 04/18/11. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/4/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 676 Proposed Order re #673 Status Report, by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 675 Declaration of Charles A. Bott in Support of #673 Status Report, filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #673 ) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 674 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine in Support of #673 Status Report, filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #673 ) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 673 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Section II.1.c of the Proposed Class Settlement between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corporation. by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 672 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan Krasne Levine for James S. Helfrich and Jordan Factor (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
December 15, 2010 Filing 671 AMENDED COMPLAINT Sixth Amended against Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. Filed byNorman Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Rebecca Wixon, Barbara Wixon, Kandice Scattolon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 670 Letter dated 12/1/10 Re: Settlement from Matt Shiner. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING AS MODIFIED #661 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 667 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2010 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 12/3/2010). (Court Reporter Christine Triska.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 666 INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED - PLEASE DISREGARD - Modified on 12/3/2010 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2010 Filing 669 Letter dated 11/30/10 from Robin D. Miller. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 2, 2010 Filing 665 Letter dated 12/1/10 Re: Joint Application for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement from Matthew Shiner. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 664 RESPONSE in Support re #661 Joint MOTION for Settlement Application for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Memorandum in Support thereof filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 2), #3 Exhibit 2)(Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 29, 2010 Filing 663 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS RE #661 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 29, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 662 Proposed Order re #661 Joint MOTION for Settlement Application for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Memorandum in Support thereof by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 661 Joint MOTION for Settlement Application for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Memorandum in Support thereof filed by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2010 09:00 AM. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER GRANTING #659 Stipulation Continuing Settlement Documentation Filing Date. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/19/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 659 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Settlement Documentation Filing Date by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon, Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Loeffler, Alan) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 658 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-10-2010, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Connie McCarthy Kuhl, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2011. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ORDER GRANTING #656 Stipulation Continuing Settlement Documentation Filing Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 23, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 656 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Continuing Settlement Documentation Filing Date by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 14, 2010 Filing 655 RULE 54(b) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 14, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING #503 Motion for Approval of Settlement of Derivative Claims. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 653 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2010 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 9/10/2010). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 652 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. Amendment to #498 Stipulation, Corrected and Revised version of Exhibit 1 to Docket No. 498. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 651 ORDER GRANTING, AS MODIFIED HEREIN #639 Stipulation CORRECTING NON-SUBSTANTIVE ERRORS AND SUBSTITUTING CORRECTED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 643 Proposed Order re #641 Reply Memorandum by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 642 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine in Support of #641 Reply Memorandum filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #641 ) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 641 Reply Memorandum re #503 MOTION for Settlement Approval of Derivative Claims filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 640 Declaration of Matthew Shiner in Support of Approval of Settlement filed byBarbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 639 STIPULATION AND ORDER CORRECTING NON-SUBSTANTIVE ERRORS AND SUBSTITUTING CORRECTED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE by Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 638 Declaration of JUDITH H. RAMSEYER REGARDING DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE filed byPeggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 650 Letter dated 8/29/10 from Donald R. Vander Stoep. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 625 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jeffrey V. Commisso (Commisso, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 637 Letter dated 8/25/10 from Richard Gordon. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 636 Letter dated 8/25/10 from Tom Carllon. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 635 Letter dated 8/25/10 from Neva B. Khammari. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 634 Letter dated 8/24/10 from R.G. Doll. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 633 Letter dated 8/26/10 from Eddie Anderson and Mary Anderson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 632 Letter dated 8/26/10 from Dana Reedy and Rhonda Reedy. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 631 Letter (no date) from Eric Winch. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 649 Letter (not dated) from Daniel Denman V. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 648 Letter dated 8/25/10 from Mareile-Angy Ogle. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 647 **duplicate of #627**Letter dated 8/24/10 from David Robinson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 Filing 646 Letter dated 8/24/10 from Crystal Pokorny and Jocelyn Pokorny. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 645 Letter dated 8/24/10 from Morray Peterson and Arlene Peterson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 644 Letter dated 8/22/10 from Sharon Joy. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 630 Letter dated 7/23/10 from MeiMei Leung. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 629 Letter dated from Lynn Connors and Clifford Connors. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 628 Letter from Sherrie Lowery and Eddie Lowery Jr. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 627 Letter dated 8/24/10 from David Robinson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 626 Letter from E. Shannon Johnson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 608 Letter from Robin Miller dated August 27, 2010. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 624 Letter dated 8/24/10 from Donald Wright and Nancy Wright. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 623 **duplicate of #615**Letter dated 8/24/10 from Lo-Ying Wong and Kwan Wong. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2010 Filing 622 Letter dated 8/24/10 from Jocelyn Richardt. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 621 Letter dated 8/20/10 from Sherry Potter. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 620 Letter dated 8/13/10 from Jim Bob Pipes and Becky Pipes. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 619 Letter dated 8/22/10 from Wentworth B. Clapham, Jr. and Anita K. Stoll-Clapham. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 618 Letter dated 8/21/10 from Kathy Puckett. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 617 Letter dated 8/19/10 from Jim DeAngelo and Sandra DeAngelo. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 616 Letter dated 8/23/10 from Kevin Patchett and Elizabeth Patchett. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 615 Letter dated 8/24/10 from Kwan Wong and Lo-Ying Wong. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 614 Letter dated 8/25/10 from Ravinder S. Batth and Rajinder Batth. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 613 Letter dated 8/24/10 from Crystal Pokorny. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 611 Letter dated 8/5/10 from Ranjai Singh and Kiran Singh (no envelope) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 Filing 610 Letter dated 8/13/10 from Richard and Lynda Foster. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 609 Letter dated 8/23/10 from Anna Carin-Ivarsson and Bjorn Karlsson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 607 Letter dated 8/24/10 from Frances Garrido and David Salas. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 606 Letter dated 8/20/10 from Victor Siu and Laurie Siu. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 605 Letter dated 8/21/10 from Sara Leonor Davila B. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 604 Letter dated 8/22/10 from David Shum and Karen Goff. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 603 Letter dated 8/11/10 from Susan Edson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 602 Letter dated 8/22/10 from Ernest L. Maag. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 601 Letter dated 8/16/10 from Sandra L. McCausland. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 600 Letter (no date) from Randal Johnson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 612 Letter dated 8/19/10 from Geoffrey Manley and Cherry Manley. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2010 Filing 599 Letter dated 8/11/10 from Frank Domeier and Rebecca Domeier. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 598 Letter dated 8/18/10 from Beverly Thompson and Deryal Thompson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 597 Letter dated 8/11/10 from Thomas Davis and Eulalie Davis. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 596 Letter dated 8/17/10 from Lois Courtney and James Birken. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 595 Letter dated 8/15/10 from Edward J. Barker. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 594 Letter dated 8/15/10 from Edna Cate. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 593 Letter (no date) from Richard J. Hopkins and Sharon Hopkins. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 592 Letter dated 8/18/10 from Roger Reschke and Mary Ann Reschke. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 591 Letter from Robert H. Vincelette, Jr. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 590 Letter dated 8/15/10 from Larry McNeill and Lorna McNeill. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 589 Letter dated 8/19/10 from Chester Lindt and Anne Lindt. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 588 Letter dated 8/18/10 from Hyrum Johnson and Sarah Johnson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 587 Letter dated 8/19/10 from James L. Larsen. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 586 Letter dated 8/17/10 from Wendy Oughton. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 585 Letter dated 8/19/10 from Cynthia A. Millonzi. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 584 Letter dated 8/20/10 from Roddy H. Baze. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 583 ***duplicate of #582***Letter dated 8/19/10 from Colleen Cohen-Simpson and Terry Simpson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2010 Filing 582 Letter dated 8/19/10 from Colleen Cohen-Simpson and Terry Simpson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 581 Letter dated 8/19/10 from Fredrick J. Greeb. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 580 Letter dated 8/16/10 from Nicole Davis. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 579 Letter dated 8/15/10 from John Lardner and Cynthia Lardner. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 578 Letter dated 8/11/10 from Frank DeGal and Carole Dowling. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 577 Letter dated 8/18/10 from Judith A. Mitchels. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 576 Letter dated 8/11/10 from H.L. Feser. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 575 Letter dated 8/16/10 from K. Stickel. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 574 Letter dated 8/17/10 from Lloyd Skaalen and Francoise Brunet. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 573 Letter dated 8/16/10 from Pamela Filipelli. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 572 Letter dated 8/11/10 from James J. Carruth. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 571 Letter dated 8/14/10 from Wayland Wise and Coralee Wise. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 570 Letter dated 8/19/10 from Michael A. Peart. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 569 Letter dated 8/17/10 from Patty Brichford. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 568 Letter dated 8/16/10 from Franco Scarfone and Maria Scarfone. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 567 Letter dated 8/17/10 from Loretta Carl. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 566 Letter dated 8/17/10 from Kathy Schreiber and James Schreiber. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 565 Letter dated 8/17/10 from William Bentley and Dorothy Bentley. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 564 Letter dated 8/16/10 from Shenton Tan and Beatrice Leung. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 563 Letter dated 8/14/10 from Lesley Dunbar and Kenneth Dunbar. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 562 Letter dated 8/16/10 from Irene Reich and Mark Reich. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 561 Letter dated 8/11/10 from Tim Larson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 560 Letter dated 8/16/10 from Norman Robinson and Barbara Robinson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 559 Letter dated 8/15/10 from William Lemmon and Penni Lemmon. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 558 Letter dated 8/17/10 from Patricia Fewkes. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 557 Letter dated 8/16/10 from Walter Garcia and Pamela Garcia. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 556 Letter dated 8/16/10 from Bartley Porter. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 555 Letter dated 8/14/10 from Jacqueline Somerville and Jeanette Edwards-Callahan. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 554 Letter dated 8/13/10 from Myron R. Parr. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 553 Letter dated 8/12/10 from Ann Altenburg and Ted Altenburg. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 552 Letter from Fulvio Wimongelli and Margaret Barrand. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 551 Letter dated 8/14/10 from Joshua Holt and Carolina Holt. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 550 Letter dated 8/13/10 from Randy S. Crane. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 549 Letter dated 8/16/10 from Gary W. Wirt and Terry L. Wirt. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 548 Letter dated 8/13/10 from Amy Roszak and Joe Roszak. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 547 Letter dated 8/14/10 from Christine Pounds. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 546 Letter dated 8/16/10 from Mike Shaw. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 545 Letter dated 8/11/10 from Judith Huffman. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 544 Letter dated 8/14/10 from Donald Stacy and Brian Stacy. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 543 Letter dated 8/14/10 from Harold Welles and Carita Welles. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 542 Letter dated 8/13/10 from Lawrence Glaspey and Annie Glaspey. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 541 Letter dated 8/11/10 from Gayle Moutard. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 540 Letter dated 8/11/10 from Robert Wayne Rutherford. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 539 Letter dated 8/14/10 from Arline Dixon and Phillip Dixon. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 538 Letter dated 8/16/10 from Philip Higley and Melody Higley. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 537 Letter dated 8/16/10 from Timothy Hudson and Maria Barandica. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 536 Letter dated 8/11/10 from Lucy Garcia. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 535 Letter dated 8/8/10 from Matthew and Elizabeth Shiner. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 534 Letter dated 8/13/10 from James Bowcutt and Barbara Bowcutt. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 533 Letter dated 8/13/10 from Patrick and Patricia Barnes. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 532 Letter and from William and Lorrie Fennema. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 531 Letter dated 8/13/10 from Ken and Sally Trager. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 530 Letter dated 8/13/10 from Gregory C. Smith. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 528 Letter dated 8/6/10 from Gary and Terry Wirt. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 527 Letter dated 8/6/10 from Michael Garibaldi. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 9, 2010 Filing 529 Letter dated 8/2/10 from Dennis Evans. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 9, 2010 Filing 526 Letter dated 8/8/10 from Rick D. Anderson and Kari Lee Anderson. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 9, 2010 Filing 525 Letter dated 8/6/10 from Robert L. Bowlin. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 9, 2010 Filing 524 Letter dated 8/4/10 from Kelly C. and Sheila W. Dutton. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 523 Letter dated 8/4/10 from Neel Advani. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 522 Letter dated 8/3/10 from Terry Castro and Joe D. Castro. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 521 Letter dated 8/3/10 from Ann Foudy. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 519 Letter dated 7/30/10 from Zoe and Bruce Fallgren. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 5, 2010 Filing 520 Letter dated 8/2/10 from Lawrence L. Pelegrin. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 4, 2010 Filing 518 Letter dated 8/2/10 from Rose L. Martinez. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 3, 2010 Filing 517 Letter re settlement from Lee Nicholas Droege. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 516 Letter dated 7/29/10 from Catherine Stratton. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 515 Letter dated 7/29/10 from Craig Hunter. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 513 Letter re settlement from Robert Chicca. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 512 Letter dated 7/29/10 from James Barry Whittenburg. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 509 Letter dated 7/27/10 re settlement from Jerald Johansen and Lenore A. Johansen. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 505 Proposed Order re #503 MOTION for Settlement Approval by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 504 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine in Support of #503 MOTION for Settlement Approval filed byKandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #503 ) (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 503 MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2010 09:00 AM. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 29, 2010 Filing 508 Letter from James Landowski. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2010: #1 Exhibit 1) (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2010: #2 exhibit 2-3) (hdj, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2010 Filing 507 Letter dated 7/25/10 from Robert G. Frisbie and Kate E. Burnham. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 514 Letter dated 1/26/10 re settlement from Robert McDonald. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 511 Letter dated 7/25/10 from Robert G. Frisbie Molly K. Frisbie. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 27, 2010 Filing 510 Letter dated 7/21/10 from William A. Stull and Douglas A. Stull. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 506 Letter dated 7/22/10 from Diane Milleman. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 7, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. Per #502 Order. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER GRANTING #501 Stipulation Suspending Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines Pertianing to Claims Against Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corp. in Light of Proposed Settlement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 7, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 501 Proposed Order and Stipulation Suspending Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines Pertaining to Claims Against Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corp. in Light of Proposed Settlement, filed by Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Loeffler, Alan) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 6, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated / Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 2, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Agreement set for 9/10/2010 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #498 Stipulated Application for Approval of Form of Notice, Directing that Notice Be Issued and Setting Date for Approval Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 2, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 1, 2010 Filing 499 Proposed Order re #498 Stipulation, by Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell, Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
July 1, 2010 Filing 498 STIPULATION Joint Application for Entry of Order (1) Approving Form of Notice, (2) Directing that Notice be Issued, (3) Setting Date for Approval Hearing on Proposed Settlement Between Plaintiffs and Director Defendants by Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell, Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER DENYING #495 Stipulated Request to Exceed Page Limitations. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 30, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 30, 2010 Filing 496 Proposed Order re #495 Stipulation Regarding Request to Exceed Page Limitation by Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Loeffler, Alan) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 30, 2010 Filing 495 STIPULATION Regarding Request to Exceed Page Limitation by Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Loeffler, Alan) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER GRANTING #493 Stipulation Continuing Settlement Documentation Filing Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 25, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 493 STIPULATION and Order Continuing Settlement Documentation Filing Date by Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER GRANTING #491 Stipulation to Vacate Deadlines as to Director Defendants Only In Light of Proposed Settlement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 9, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 491 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Suspending Pre-Trial and Trial Deadlines Pertaining to Claims Against Director Defendants in Light of Proposed Settlement by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
May 24, 2010 Filing 490 NOTICE by Wyndham Resort Development Corp. to Take the Deposition of Dr. Lamb (Loeffler, Alan) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER GRANTING #488 Stipulation Extending Certain Expert Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/17/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 488 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Certain Expert Deadlines by Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER RESOLVING #484 Disputes re Class Notice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 12, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER DENYING #484 REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/10/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 10, 2010 Filing 485 Proposed Order re #484 Status Report, by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 4, 2010 Filing 484 STATUS REPORT of Class Plaintiffs and Defendant Wyndham Resort Development Corp. regarding the Parties' Proposed Methods and Form of Class Notice by Kandice Scattolon, Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 483 Letter from William M. Droze Requesting Clarification of Seventh Discovery Order [Dkt. 482]. (Droze, William) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 482 SEVENTH DISCOVERY ORDER re #480 Letter filed by Wyndham Resort Development Corp., #478 Letter filed by Barbara Wixon, Kandice Scattolon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon, Clarke Wixon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/27/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 481 Letter from Judith H. Ramseyer addressed to Judge Zimmerman. (Ramseyer, Judith) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 480 Letter from William M. Droze in Response to Elizabeth Pritzker's 04/23/10 letter. (Droze, William) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 479 Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording held on April 21, 2010, before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Transcriber Stacy Wegner, Telephone number (859) 539-2802; email address smwtyping@yahoo.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2010. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 478 Letter from Elizabeth C. Pritzker to the Honorable Bernard Zimmerman. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 21, 2010 Filing 477 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 4/21/2010 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 4/21/2010). (Tape #TC 15-10 Side A.) (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/21/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 476 Letter from Matthew G. Ball addressed to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 475 SIXTH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/16/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 474 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/15/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 473 STIPULATION and Order Governing Expert Discovery by Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon, Kandice Scattolon. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 472 Letter from ELIZABETH C. PRITZKER TO THE HONORABLE BERNARD ZIMMERMAN. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 471 Letter from Matthew G. Ball addressed to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 470 Letter from Elizabeth C. Pritzker. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER GRANTING #468 Stipulation To Amend Deadline for Discovery Motions. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/24/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 24, 2010 Filing 468 STIPULATION To Amend Deadline for Discovery Motions and Request for Order of Approval by Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon, Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Droze, William) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER GRANTING #466 Stipulation Amending Deadline to File Discovery Motions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/18/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 466 STIPULATION and Order Amending Deadline to File Discovery Motions by Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 17, 2010 Filing 465 Director Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint Fifth byPeggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
March 17, 2010 Filing 464 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byWyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Loeffler, Alan) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 463 NOTICE by Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon re #412 Order Plaintiffs' Discovery Certification (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER granting #460 Stipulation Amending Deadline For Scattolon Deposition and Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/18/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 461 NOTICE by Wyndham Resort Development Corp. re #412 Order Supplemental Discovery Certification (Quillian, J.) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 460 STIPULATION and Order Amending Deadline For Scattolon Deposition and Responsive Pleading by Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 16, 2010 Filing 459 NOTICE by Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell Director Defendants' Certification of Completion of Discovery Supplementation (Ramseyer, Judith) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 458 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/8/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 8, 2010 Filing 457 STIPULATION Amendment Regarding Supplemental and Further Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information by Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Droze, William) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 8, 2010 Filing 456 USCA ORDER (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 3, 2010 Filing 455 AMENDED COMPLAINT Fifth Amended Complaint against Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell, Trendwest Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. Filed byNorman Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Rebecca Wixon, Barbara Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING #440 Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 22, 2010 Filing 453 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine in Support of #452 Reply Memorandum, #440 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed byBarbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #452 , #440 ) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 22, 2010 Filing 452 Reply Memorandum re #440 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed byBarbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 451 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave To File Fifth Amended Complaint by Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Ramseyer, Judith) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 450 DECLARATION of Judith H. Ramseyer in Opposition to #440 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed byPeggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Related document(s) #440 ) (Ramseyer, Judith) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 449 Memorandum in Opposition re #440 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed byPeggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Ramseyer, Judith) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 448 Proposed Order re #446 Memorandum in Opposition, #447 Declaration in Support, Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint by Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Droze, William) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 447 Declaration of William M. Droze in Support of #446 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed byWyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Related document(s) #446 ) (Droze, William) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 446 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed byWyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Droze, William) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 10, 2010 Filing 445 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-28-2009, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CSR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/12/2010. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 1/10/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 444 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/8/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 6, 2010 Filing 443 STIPULATION Regarding Supplemental and Further Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information by Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon, Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Droze, William) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
December 29, 2009 Filing 442 Proposed Order re #440 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint by Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 29, 2009 Filing 441 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine in Support of #440 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed byBarbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Related document(s) #440 ) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 29, 2009 Filing 440 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2010 09:00 AM. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 439 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/17/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 17, 2009 Filing 438 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Wyndham Resort Development Corporation's Interrogatories by Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 17, 2009 Filing 437 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/19/09, before Judge Zimmerman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, Telephone number (530)941-2621; email: sgoekler25@yahoo.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2010. (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 436 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/10/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 9, 2009 Filing 435 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending time to Respond to Director Defendants' Interrogatories by Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
November 23, 2009 Filing 434 Director Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint byPeggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 433 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byWyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Loeffler, Alan) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 16, 2009 Filing 432 RESPONSE to re #428 Notice (Other) of Pendency by Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Loeffler, Alan) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 10, 2009 Filing 431 Statement Joint ADR Report Pursuant to Minute Order of August 28, 2009 by Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 9, 2009 Filing 430 RESPONSE to re #428 Notice (Other) Of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 429 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time To Submit Report Regarding Method And Form of Class Notice re #427 Stipulation filed by Barbara Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon, Clarke Wixon. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/6/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 428 NOTICE by Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-13 (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 427 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT REPORT REGARDING METHOD AND FORM OF CLASS NOTICE by Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 426 USCA Letter re: 09-80162. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying without prejudice #421 Motion to Stay. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
November 3, 2009 Filing 424 AMENDED COMPLAINT Fourth Amended Complaint against Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell, Trendwest Resorts, Inc., Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. Filed byNorman Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Rebecca Wixon, Barbara Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
November 2, 2009 Filing 423 Proposed Order re #421 MOTION to Stay re #420 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Certify Class MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING RESOLUTION OF RULE 23(f) PETITION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL MOTION to Stay re #420 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Certify Class MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING RESOLUTION OF RULE 23(f) PETITION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING RESOLUTION OF RULE 23 (f) PETITION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Commisso, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
November 2, 2009 Filing 422 Declaration of Stephen M. Hankins in Support of #421 MOTION to Stay re #420 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Certify Class MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING RESOLUTION OF RULE 23(f) PETITION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL MOTION to Stay re #420 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Certify Class MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING RESOLUTION OF RULE 23(f) PETITION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL filed byWyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 TO DECLARATION)(Related document(s) #421 ) (Commisso, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
November 2, 2009 Filing 421 MOTION to Stay re #420 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Certify Class MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING RESOLUTION OF RULE 23(f) PETITION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL filed by Wyndham Resort Development Corp.. (Commisso, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING #246 Motion for Leave to Amend; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING INP ART #252 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #299 Motion to Certify Class. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER GRANTING #418 Stipulation Extending Time to File Statement of Expenses and Objections. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/8/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
October 7, 2009 Filing 418 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to File Statement of Expenses and Objections by Barbara Wixon, Clarke Wixon, Norman Wixon, Rebecca Wixon. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART #374 Report and Recommendation on Motion to Enforce and to STrike; DENYING #345 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Sur-Rebuttal Report; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #382 Motion to Adopt and Modify Special Master Report; DENYING #312 Motion to Enforce and to Strike. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER DISCHARGING TO SHOW CAUSE RE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/14/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 Filing 415 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Peggy Fry, John Henley, Gene Hensley, David Herrick, John McConnell. (Ball, Matthew) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 Filing 414 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Wyndham Resort Development Corp. Re Third Amended Complaint. (Loeffler, Alan) (Filed on 9/14/2009)