McConnell et al v. Pacificorp, Inc.

Plaintiff: Klamath Riverkeeper, Blythe Reis, Michael T. Hudson, Howard McConnell, Leaf G. Hillman, Robert Attebery, Frankie Joe Myers and Terance J. Supahan
Defendant: Pacificorp, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv02382
Filed: May 2, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2008 302 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ALL REMAINING CLAIMS AND PLAINTIFFS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
September 12, 2008 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO RECOVER COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES ASSOCIATED WITH THE SECOND DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFFS by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 191 Motion for Attorney Fees]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 9, 2008 273 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 8, 2008 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION FOR LATER EXPERT DEPOSITIONS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
February 5, 2008 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXCUSING PERSONAL ATTENDANCE OF PLAINTIFFS ATTEBERY AND MYERS AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/5/2008. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
May 2, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConnell et al v. Pacificorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacificorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klamath Riverkeeper
Represented By: Daniel Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blythe Reis
Represented By: Barbara L. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Hudson
Represented By: Daniel Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard McConnell
Represented By: Barbara L. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leaf G. Hillman
Represented By: Barbara L. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Attebery
Represented By: Barbara L. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Joe Myers
Represented By: Barbara L. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terance J. Supahan
Represented By: Barbara L. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?