Kanter v. California Administrative Office of the Courts Featured Case

Plaintiff sued her former employer, the California Administrative Office of the Courts, for discriminating against her by not approving her request for time off and a reduced work schedule to accommodate a son diagnosed with autism.

Plaintiff: Lucia Kanter
Defendant: California Administrative Office of the Courts
Case Number: 3:2007cv02423
Filed: May 4, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30
STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/10/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2007)
October 4, 2007 Filing 29
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lucia Kanter. (Dickson, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
September 25, 2007 Filing 28
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 9/25/2007 AT 2:00 P.M. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2007)
September 18, 2007 Filing 26
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Case Management Order "CORRECTION OF DOCUMENT #25" filed by Lucia Kanter, California Administrative Office of the Courts. (Andrich, Brooke) (Filed on 9/18/2007)
September 17, 2007 Filing 25
*** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #26. ***
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Case Management Order filed by Lucia Kanter, California Administrative Office of the Courts. (Andrich, Brooke) (Filed on 9/17/2007) Modified on 9/19/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24
ORDER re 20 Stipulation filed by California Administrative Office of the Courts. Case Management Conference of 9/18/07 vacated and reset for 9/25/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 9/4/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2007)
September 4, 2007 Filing 22
Proposed Order [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order by California Administrative Office of the Courts. (Andrich, Brooke) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
August 28, 2007 Filing 21
Proposed Order re 20 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference by California Administrative Office of the Courts. (Andrich, Brooke) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 21, 2007 Filing 17
CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference of 8/28/07 VACATED and RESET for 9/18/2007 02:00 PM, before Hon. Martin J. Jenkins, Courtroom 11, 19th floor, U.S. Courthouse, San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2007. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2007)
August 13, 2007 Filing 16
Certificate of Interested Entities by Kathryn Burkett Dickson (Dickson, Kathryn) (Filed on 8/13/2007)
July 20, 2007 Filing 15
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Dickson, Kathryn) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14
ORDER re 12 Stipulation filed by Lucia Kanter Initial Case Management Conference of 8/7/07 vacated, reset for 8/28/2007 02:00 PM, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 7/16/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2007)
July 17, 2007 Filing 13
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Andrich, Brooke) (Filed on 7/17/2007)
July 2, 2007 Filing 11
Certificate of Interested Entities by Brooke Desiree Andrich (Andrich, Brooke) (Filed on 7/2/2007)
June 5, 2007 Filing 9
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucia Kanter re 1 Complaint, Summons Issued, (Dickson, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/5/2007)
June 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8
ORDER re 7 Stipulation filed by California Administrative Office of the Courts. Def.'s time to answer complaint extended 20 days. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 5/29/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2007)
May 23, 2007 Filing 7
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER by California Administrative Office of the Courts. (Richardson, Greg) (Filed on 5/23/2007)
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Martin J. Jenkins for all further proceedings. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/11/07. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2007)
May 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3
ORDER OF RECUSAL - Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/9/07. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2007)
May 4, 2007 Filing 2
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due 7/31/2007 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2007 at 10:00 AM.. (Attachments: #(1) EDL Standing Order). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2007 (tn, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kanter v. California Administrative Office of the Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Kanter
Represented By: Kathryn Burkett Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Administrative Office of the Courts
Represented By: Greg James Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?