Wong et al v. HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA) et al
Plaintiff: Frederic Chaussy and Philip Wong
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA) and HSBC Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv02446
Filed: May 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 29, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/22/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DECERTIFY CONDITIONAL FLSA CLASS. The claims alleged on behalf of all plaintiffs other than the four plaintiffs named in the Second Amended Complaint are dismissed without prejudice to refiling in an appropriate court. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 29, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from September 10, 2010 to October 22, 2010. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than October 15, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 25, 2010 to September 10, 2010, at 10:30 a.m. If the parties, or either of them, wish to update any of the information in the Statement filed June 18, 2010, an updated Joint Further Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than September 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 22, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment on or before March 19, 2010. No further requests shall be made by letter. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 5, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from May 29, 2009 to June 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 22, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference scheduled for April 17, 2009 is continued to May 29, 2009. The parties shall file an updated joint case management conference statement by May 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 15, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from February 20, 2008 to April 17, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 17, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO STRIKE; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. The Court dismisses the state law claims, specifically, the Second through E leventh Claims for Relief, without prejudice to plaintiffs' filing such claims in state court. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification is denied as moot, in light of the dismissal of the state law claims, and without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 21, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from November 14, 2008 to February 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 7, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CHANGE TIME FOR HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS TO JANUARY 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 31, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 231 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 15, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. The hearing is continued from October 10, 2008 to November 7, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 8, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER DENYING DEFERRED PORTION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RULE 11(C) SANCTIONS. The Clerk is directed to file Exhibits A through G to the Declaration of Jeannette Jennings and Exhibit A to the Declaration of Henry Yip in the public record. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 25, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND IN PART DEFERRING RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RULE 11(C) SANCTIONS. With respect to Exhibits A through G to the Declarati on of Jeannette Jennings and Exhibit A to the Declaration of Henry Yip, the Court affords defendants leave to (1) file in the public record redacted versions of each such exhibit, and (2) file a supplemental declaration stating why any portions there of not filed in the public record are privileged or protectable as a trade secret or otherwise entitled to protection under the law. Any such additional support shall be filed no later than September 23, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE; SETTING HEARING. The reference to Judge Nielsen is withdrawn. Plaintiff's motion for conditional certification and for other relief is set for hearing on March 14, 2008, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 7, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Plaintiffs' motion for conditional certification and other relief is referred to the Honorable Wm. Fremming Nielsen. Counsel will be advised of the date, time and place of the hearing on said motion by notice from Judge Nielsen's chambers. The February 8, 2008 hearing before the undersigned is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wong et al v. HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederic Chaussy
Represented By: Donald H. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Wong
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?