Intelligraphics, Inc. v. Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.
Plaintiff: Intelligraphics, Inc.
Defendant: Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv02499
Filed: May 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/13/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 REDACATED ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS [Docket Nos. 118, 119, 120, 133]. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 01/28/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER TO UNSEAL COURT'S AMENDED JANUARY 29, 2009 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR SANCTIONS [Docket No. 226]. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 02/0909. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEALre 226 Courts Amended January 29, 2009 Order Re: Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/29/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL COURT'S JANUARY 28, 2009 ORDERS re 221 Order on Motion for Sanctions, 222 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/28/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER GRANTING CONSENT TO SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Brandon Baum of Mayer Brown substituted with Michael Molano of Sheppard Mullin. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/7/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER RE: MARVELL SEMICONDUCTOR'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Hearing on the Motion for Sanctions is set for Jan. 23, 2009 at 9:30 AM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/17/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting re 116 Stipulation filed by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/12/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATED THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/3/2008. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting re 96 Stipulation Rescheduling Deposition of Scott Lawson and Intelligraphics, Inc. filed by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/29/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting As Amended re 94 Stipulation Second Supplemental Scheduling Orderfiled by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2009 01:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 4/20/2009 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/11/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intelligraphics, Inc. v. Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intelligraphics, Inc.
Represented By: Frank F. Sommers, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?