Grisman et al v. YouTube, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs, owners of Dawg Music, allege that Defendants infringed on plaintiff's protected works and refused to deter infringing activities.

Plaintiff: David J. Grisman and Craig Miller
Defendant: YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC and Google, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv02518
Filed: May 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2007 Filing 8
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by David J. Grisman, Craig Miller (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 5/25/2007)
May 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/17/07. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 16, 2007 Filing 5
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2007)
May 15, 2007 Filing 4
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 5/15/2007)
May 11, 2007 Filing 3
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2007)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grisman et al v. YouTube, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Grisman
Represented By: Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Miller
Represented By: Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?