Brooks v. Haggett, et al.
Plaintiff: Walter Brooks
Defendant: John Haggett, San Francisco Police Department and 1st Watch Supervising Lieutenant
Case Number: 3:2007cv02615
Filed: May 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Amended Complaint due by 11/28/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/19/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER VACATING TRIAL. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/25/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER RE: Jury Refreshments. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 8/17/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/18/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/12/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MARSDEN MOTION re 179 Notice (Other) filed by Walter Brooks; ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/2/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE STATUS REPORT; ORDER VACATING TRIAL Status Report due by 12/7/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/29/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DONNA RYU FOR TRIAL. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/15/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 151 Motion ; granting 153 Motion ; granting 160 Motion for Hearing (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE & CONTINUING HEARING re 160 MOTION for Hearing DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS ARTHUR LUNA filed by John Haggett. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/10/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER RE POTENTIAL WITNESS ARTHUR LUNA. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/2/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Haggett, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Brooks
Represented By: James F. Hannawalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Haggett
Represented By: James F. Hannawalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st Watch Supervising Lieutenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?