Hwang v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Esther Hwang
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Heather Fong, Jesse Serna and Nelson Agtiga
Case Number: 3:2007cv02718
Filed: May 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The parties having advised the Court that they have agreed to a settlement of the action, it is ordered that plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to thi s Court, within ninety days, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, this order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING DEFERRED PORTION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ORDER BIFURCATING TRIAL OF MUNICIPAL LIABILITY CLAIM; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Defendants' motion for summary judgment, to the extent the Court deferred ruling thereon , is denied. Trial of the instant claims is ordered bifurcated, such that plaintiff's federal claims against defendants Serna and Artiga, as well as plaintiff's state law claims, will be conducted in advance of and separately from the feder al claim against the City. The parties are directed to include in their Joint Pretrial Statement, a joint proposal or, if necessary, separate proposals, on the timing of the trial on the federal claim against the City. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 30, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO FILE PRETRIAL SUBMISSIONS. The pretrial submissions presently due September 29, 2008 are now due October 3, 2008. Further, any responses to motions in limine shall be filed no later than noon, October 8, 2008, and a chambers copy of each such response shall be provided no later than 4:00 p.m., October 8, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 26, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Plaintiff is ordered to file in the public record, no later than September 29, 2008, a redacted version of the Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 23, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. To the extent defendants seek summary judgment on the Seventh Cause of Action, the motion is granted. To the extent defendants seek summary judgment on the First, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, Eighth, and Ninth Causes of Action, and on the claim for punitive damages, the motion is denied. To the extent defendants seek summary judgment on the Second and Third Causes of Action, the Court defers ruling on the motion. Hwang is afforded leave to file, no later than September 23, 2008, supplemental opposition. As of September 23, 2008, the deferred portion of defendants' motion will be taken under submission. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 15, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER VACATING SEPTEMBER 12, 2008. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment and/or partial summary judgment, the Court deems the matter suitable for decision on the parties' submissions, and vacates the hearing scheduled for September 12, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DECLARATION OF LT. DANIEL J. MAHONEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 5, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hwang v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Hwang
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fong
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Serna
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Agtiga
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?