Ball v. Sisto
Case Number: 3:2007cv02726
Filed: May 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR STATE COURT RETRIAL OR RE-SENTENCING. The Court's November 1, 2010 order partially granting the petition is modified to extend the time in which petitioner shall either be retried or resentenced an additional 90 days from January 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 21, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 25 CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 27, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: 1. The petition for a writ of habeas corpus is hereby DENIED as to petitioners claims of juror misconduct and trial court error concerning the waiver of petitioners right to a jury trial on the sentencing allegations.2. The pet ition for a writ of habeas corpus is hereby GRANTED as to petitioners ineffective assistance of counsel claim. Within the ninety days of the date of this order, the State of California either shall retry petitioner on the serious felony allegation or vacate his sentence and arrange for him to be sentenced without use of the serious felony finding (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 1, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING 11 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 5, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball v. Sisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?