United States of America v. Beretta et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: William C. Beretta, Jennifer Beretta, Max Day and Tom's Septic Tank Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv02930
Filed: June 5, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER EXCUSING ATTORNEY COX APPEARANCE AT CMC (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting request to appear by phone (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice upon settlement. Within 90 days from the date hereof, that settlement has not in fact occurred, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this caue shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/4/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re 66 Proposed Order to Excuse Personal Appearance filed by Max Day. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/28/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference for 2/5/2009 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/23/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER continuing pretrial and trial dates. Signed by Judge Illston on 11/11/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT and DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Beretta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Beretta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Beretta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom's Septic Tank Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?