Churchill v. Bargetto et al
Plaintiff: Marilyn Churchill
Defendant: John Bargetto and Bargetto's Santa Cruz Winery
Case Number: 3:2007cv03007
Filed: June 8, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DEEMING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHDRAWN; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING re 59 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Further Expert Disclosure, or in the alternative,to Exclude such Experts filed by Bargetto's Santa Cruz Winery, John Bargetto. Hearing date of 12/5/8 at 9:30 AM before Judge Spero is vacated. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/3/8. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/13/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TRIAL AND RELATED DATES. The Stipulation is denied, without prejudice to the parties' raising such request at the Case Management Conference scheduled for November 7, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 27, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Churchill v. Bargetto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Churchill
Represented By: David P. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bargetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bargetto's Santa Cruz Winery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?