Baas et al v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kassondra Baas and Kelly Lofquist
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv03108
Filed: June 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING 129 Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/4/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 121 Motion (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 105 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; denying 117 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING THE PARTIES' MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/20/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 79 Motion to Certify Class (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Vacating Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 17, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/7/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baas et al v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassondra Baas
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Lofquist
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?