Darosa v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Plaintiff: Fernando Darosa
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv03114
Filed: June 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER dismissing case. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Within 90 days from the date hereof, that settlemnt has not in fact occurred, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/23/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 94 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference (Date Filed: 12/19/2008). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2008)
December 18, 2008 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Kari Erickson Levine (Levine, Kari) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 18, 2008 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Counsel in Opposition to #91 Letter re Court's October 31, 2008 Discovery Order filed byFernando Darosa. (Related document(s) #91 ) (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 17, 2008 Filing 91 Letter from Andrew McNaught Re Response to Plaintiff's 12-16 Letter Brief. (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 16, 2008 Filing 90 Letter Brief re #89 Letter (Defendant's motion for reconsideration and modification of discovery order) filed byFernando Darosa. (Related document(s) #89 ) (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 89 Letter from Andrew McNaught Re Motion to Enforce the Court's October 31, 2008 Order Re Various Discovery Motions. (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 88 Letter from Jonathan D. Martin. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 4, 2008 Filing 87 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2008 before Illston (Date Filed: 11/4/2008). (Court Reporter Columbini.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/4/2008)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER RE VARIOUS DISCOVERY MOTIONS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #43 , #46 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SEALING ORDER re #82 . Signed by Judge Illston on 10/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 82 STIPULATION & ORDER REGARDING FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (FILED JOINTLY) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #81 by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 81 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #82 . *** STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING FILING DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (FILED JOINTLY) by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 10/28/2008) Modified on 10/29/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/27/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 79 STIPULATION for Protective Order and [Proposed] Protective Order by Fernando Darosa, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ***ERRONEOUS ATTACHMENT***ORDER re: initial disclosures. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/21/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008) Modified on 10/23/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Illston granting #76 Ex Parte Application to file late (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 84 EXHIBIT 23 to #46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byFernando Darosa. FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) #46 ) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 76 Ex Parte Application re #74 Reply Memorandum seeking leave to file one day late filed by Fernando Darosa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 75 Second Supplemental Declaration of Counsel in Support of #46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities supplemental, with Exhibit 23 (Exhibit Filed Under Seal) filed byFernando Darosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23 -- cover page (exhibit filed under seal))(Related document(s) #46 ) (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 10/21/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2008 Filing 74 Reply to #56 Opposition to #46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byFernando Darosa. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 10/21/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 Filing 73 Supplemental Declaration of Counsel in Support of #53 Discovery Motion, with Exhibit N filed byFernando Darosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N -- Dustin RT II Excerpts)(Related document(s) #72 ) (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 Filing 72 Reply to #64 Opposition re #53 MOTION to Compel discovery, quash subpoena of pre-2005 medical records and award sanctions, filed byFernando Darosa. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 Filing 71 Declaration of Kenneth U. Ayers in Support of #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Related document(s) #43 ) (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 70 Reply Declaration of Jonathan D. Martin in Support of #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Related document(s) #43 ) (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 Filing 69 OBJECTIONS to Evidence submitted by Plaintiff in Support of His Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 Filing 68 Reply Memorandum re #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 67 Proposed Order re #64 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Compelling Discovery, Quashing Medical Subpoena, and for Sanctions by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 66 Appendix re #64 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Compelling Discovery, Quashing Medical Subpoena, and for Sanctions filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Related document(s) #64 ) (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Andrew M. McNaught in support of #64 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Compelling Discovery, Quashing Medical Subpoena, and for Sanctions filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Related document(s) #64 ) (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 10/10/2008) Modified on 10/14/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2008 Filing 64 Memorandum of point and authorities in support of Opposition to #53 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Compelling Discovery, Quashing Medical Subpoena, and for Sanctions filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 10/10/2008) Modified on 10/14/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 63 Supplemental Declaration of Counsel in Opposition re #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities with exhibits filed byFernando Darosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20 daRosa RT Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 21 -- Freitas RT Excerpts (supp))(Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 62 Memorandum in Opposition re #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byFernando Darosa. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 61 Proposed Order re #56 Memorandum in Opposition Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Jonathan D. Martin in support of #56 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) #56 ) (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Frank Mellon in support of #56 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Related document(s) #56 ) (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Margie Roper in support of #56 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Related document(s) #56 ) (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 57 OBJECTIONS to re #56 Memorandum in Opposition to Evidence Submitted by Plaintiff in Support of His Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 56 Memorandum in Opposition to #46 Plaintiff Fernando DaRosa's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2008 Filing 55 Letter Brief re #52 Letter Brief in Opposition filed byFernando Darosa. (Related document(s) #52 ) (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 54 Declaration in Support of #53 MOTION to Compel discovery, quash subpoena of pre-2005 medical records and award sanctions, with exhibits filed byFernando Darosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Ayers RT, #2 Exhibit B -- Roper RT, #3 Exhibit C -- Kato RT, #4 Exhibit D -- Mellon RT, #5 Exhibit E -- Smith Sanction Order (page 1), #6 Exhibit F -- Smith Sanctions Order (page 2), #7 Exhibit G -- EEOC notice, #8 Exhibit H -- July & August VOTs (attached to letter to EEOC), #9 Exhibit I -- Received January 2006 VOT (attached to letter to EEOC), #10 Exhibit J -- Kaiser HR master file, #11 Exhibit K -- Khrmit print screens, #12 Exhibit L -- Pl.'s RFPs, #13 Exhibit M - Pl.'s Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice)(Related document(s) #53 ) (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 53 MOTION to Compel discovery, quash subpoena of pre-2005 medical records and award sanctions, filed by Fernando Darosa. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2008 09:00 AM. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 10, 2008 Filing 52 Letter Brief re motion to compel further responses to First Set of Special Interrogatories filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Illston granting #49 Ex Parte Application (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 50 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Leave To File Formal Discovery Motion by September 15, 2008 by Fernando Darosa. (Keller, Christopher) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 49 Ex Parte Application For Leave To File Formal Discovery Motion By 9/15/08 filed by Fernando Darosa. (Keller, Christopher) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 48 Declaration in Support of #46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Counsel, with Exhibits, filed byFernando Darosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Dustin RT II, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Dustin RT I, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Roper RT, #4 Exhibit 4 -- Ayers RT, #5 Exhibit 5 -- Mellon RT, #6 Exhibit 6 -- Kato RT, #7 Exhibit 7 -- Freitas RT, #8 Exhibit 8 -- July 6, 2005 VOT, #9 Exhibit 9 -- July and August VOT, EEOC attachment, #10 Exhibit 10 -- Master HR Record, #11 Exhibit 11 -- Khrmit screen prints, #12 Exhibit 12 -- December 7, 2005 Memo, #13 Exhibit 13 -- January 24, 2006 VOT, #14 Exhibit 14 -- Fax confirmation of VOT, #15 Exhibit 15 -- Received fax of VOT, #16 Exhibit 16 -- Termination documents, #17 Exhibit 17 -- EDD documents, #18 Exhibit 18 -- HR emails, #19 Exhibit 19 -- EEOC documents)(Related document(s) #46 ) (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 47 Declaration in Support of #46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities of plaintiff Fernando daRosa filed byFernando Darosa. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) #46 ) (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Fernando Darosa. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2008 09:00 AM. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 45 Proposed Order re #44 Declaration in Support, #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 44 Declaration of Jonthan D. Martin in Support of #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) #43 ) (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 5, 2008 Filing 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 42 Letter from Andrew M. McNaught. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment)(Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Illston granting #39 Ex Parte Application to file formal discovery motion.(The letter briefs will not be ruled on.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 21, 2008 Filing 40 Letter Brief requesting resolution of discovery disputes (Second), re Rule 30(b)(6) deposition notices and refusal to meet and confer over Requests for Admissions filed byFernando Darosa. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
August 20, 2008 Filing 39 Ex Parte Application for leave to file formal noticed discovery motion re subpoena for confidential pre-2005 medical and counseling records filed by Fernando Darosa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting leave to file formal noticed discovery motion)(Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #35 Case Management Conference - Further Settlement Conference set for 9/17/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 8/15/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 14, 2008 Filing 37 Letter from Jonathan D. Martin In Response to Plaintiff's Letter Brief of 8/7/2008. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
August 7, 2008 Filing 36 Letter Brief Requesting Resolution of Discovery Disputes over Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production of Documents filed byFernando Darosa. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/7/2008)
July 16, 2008 Filing 35 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/11/2008 before Illston (Date Filed: 7/16/2008). () (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2008)
July 3, 2008 Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Plaintiff's] filed by Fernando Darosa. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
July 3, 2008 Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc.'s Further Case Management Statement filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
June 4, 2008 Filing 32 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference (Date Filed: 6/4/2008). () (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2008)
May 21, 2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2008 02:30 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER continuing cmc to 7/11/08. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/20/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
May 16, 2008 Filing 30 Proposed Order Continuing Case Management Conference. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 16, 2008 Filing 29 STIPULATION To Continue May 23, 2008 Case Management Conference. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/16/2008)
May 9, 2008 Filing 28 NOTICE by Fernando Darosa of Association of Additional Counsel, Christopher J. Keller, CA Bar No. 178491 (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 27 ANSWER to #24 Complaint [FIRST AMENDED] byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/14/2008) Modified on 3/17/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Settlement Conference set for 6/4/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/3/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting leave to file 1st amended complaint. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/22/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 21, 2008 Filing 24 STIPULATION For Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Fernando Darosa, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/21/2008)
February 20, 2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2008 02:30 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
February 20, 2008 Filing 23 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/15/2008 before Illston (Date Filed: 2/20/2008). Case continued to 5/23/08 @ 2:30 p.m. for Further Case Management ConferenceORDERED AFTER HEARING: By the end of February 2008, counsel shall either file a stipulation to amend the complaint or file a formal motion for leave to amend.This case shall be referred to a magistrate-judge for settlement purposes. The settlement conference shall occur in early June 2008, or as otherwise agreed to by the parties.() (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/20/2008)
February 20, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Settlement (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
February 12, 2008 Filing 22 CERTIFICATION OF ENE Session on 2/6/2008, case not settled, ENE complete. Signed by Evaluator, Marjorie Gelb, dated 2/8/2008. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 21 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Fernando Darosa, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
January 3, 2008 Filing 20 Letter dated 1/2/2008 from Evaluator, Marjorie Gelb. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2008)
December 28, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: ENE Hearing set for 2/6/2008. Please report to ADR Reception on the 16th Floor of the Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA for the exact location of the session. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2007)
December 11, 2007 ADR Remark: ADR Remark: Mediator will attempt to call both parties on Wednesday, December 12, 2007 to set up a date for the pre-mediation telephone conference. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2007)
December 3, 2007 Filing 19 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Marjorie Gelb as ENE Evaluator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
November 19, 2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 9/5/2008. Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2008 02:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 1/26/2009 08:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2008 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2009 03:30 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 11/19/07. (Attachments: #1)(ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 19, 2007 Filing 17 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/16/2007 before Illston (Date Filed: 11/19/2007). Case continued to 2/15/08 @ 2:30 p.m. for Further Case Management ConferenceCase continued to 10/31/08 @ 9:00 a.m. for Motions(Motion due 9/5/08, Opposition 10/3/08 Reply 10/17/08 )Case continued to 1/13/09 @ 3:30 p.m. for Pretrial Conference(PRETRIAL PAPERS DUE 12/23/08)Case continued to 1/26/09 @ 8:30 a.m. for Trial (jury: Days)Discovery Cutoff: 8/29/08 Designate Medical Experts by: 8/8/08, Non Medical Experts by: 11/10/08, Expert Discovery Cutoff: 12/12/08ORDERED AFTER HEARING: The ENE session shall occur within 90 days () (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2007)
November 15, 2007 Filing 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options of Kaiser Foundation Health Plan (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Illston on 11/14/07. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 14, 2007 Filing 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Fernando Darosa, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 11/14/2007)
November 13, 2007 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
November 9, 2007 Filing 12 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Fernando Darosa, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/9/2007)
November 8, 2007 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
October 31, 2007 Filing 10 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2007)
September 14, 2007 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2007 02:00 PM. (Attachments: #1) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2007)
September 11, 2007 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint #1 for Damages by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/11/2007) Modified on 9/12/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 09/10/07. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 7, 2007 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
September 6, 2007 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Martin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 6, 2007 Filing 4 Proposed Order Continuing Status Conference by Fernando Darosa. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
August 27, 2007 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan on 8/22/2007, filed by Fernando Darosa. (Friedman, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
August 21, 2007 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF)
June 13, 2007 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due 9/24/2007 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2007 at 4:00 PM.. (Attachments: #(1) BZ Standing Order). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2007 (tn, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages & Demand for Jury Trial - [No Summons Issued] against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 44611000864]. Filed by Plaintiff Fernando Darosa. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2007)
June 13, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darosa v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Darosa
Represented By: Christopher James Keller
Represented By: Jeremy L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew More McNaught
Represented By: Kari Erickson Levine
Represented By: Jonathan David Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?