United States of America v. $70,000 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $70,000 in United States Currency, Remington Model 742 Woodmaster .308 Caliber Rifle (SN 6925744), Winchester Model X-70 c0/c0 Rifle (SN G1407073), Ruger Model 10/22 0.22 Caliber Rifle (SN 234-54451), Browning Gold Hunter 12 Gauge Shotgun (SN 113MM4921) and Norinco Mak-90 Sportster Mad 90 7.62X39MM Caliber Rifle (SN 46098)
Case Number: 3:2007cv03359
Filed: June 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 9, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER LIFTING STAY: Bench Trial set for 4/26/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Discovery due by 12/31/2009. Motions due by 2/4/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/16/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 37 Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States of America]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/31/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 30, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 30 Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States of America]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/14/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO OCTOBER 16, 2008, AT 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/10/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $70,000 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Patricia Jean Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $70,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Model 742 Woodmaster .308 Caliber Rifle (SN 6925744)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester Model X-70 c0/c0 Rifle (SN G1407073)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruger Model 10/22 0.22 Caliber Rifle (SN 234-54451)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Browning Gold Hunter 12 Gauge Shotgun (SN 113MM4921)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norinco Mak-90 Sportster Mad 90 7.62X39MM Caliber Rifle (SN 46098)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?