Ambat et al v. City & County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Mercy Ambat, Zainabu Anderson, John Arita, Dennis Carter, Sharon Castillo, Joanna Crotty, Tequisha Curley, Alisa Davis-Zehner, Marla Denzer, Patti Flynn, Teresa Fox, Jon Gray, Tori Jackson, Lisa Janssen, Michael Jones, Richard Lee, Sandra Maclin-Gibson, Sukhwant Mann, Gloria Martin, Arturo Medrano, Marc Nuti, Kevin O'Shea, Anthony Peppers, Vincent Quock, Wendy Rodgers-Wells, Lana Slocum, Ernest Smith, Tonyette Smith-Al Ghani, Mattie Spires-Morgan, Kenneth Tan, Anjie Versher, Bonnie Westlin, Yvette Williams, Roland Zanie and Michael Zehner
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco, Thomas Arata, Stephen Tilton, Roderick Wallace, John Minor, Edward Ruppenstein and Johna Pecot
Case Number: 3:2007cv03622
Filed: July 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 436 FINAL ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 431 AMENDED ORDER RE: SPECIAL MASTER INQUIRY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER RE: SPECIAL MASTER INQUIRY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER on Distribution of Settlement Funds. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/1/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER on Receipt of Special Masters Report. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/27/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2016: # 1 Appendix Sealed Exhibit A) (tfS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2016: # 2 Appendix cover letter) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF THE HONORABLE JAMES MCBRIDE AS SPECIAL MASTER TO ALLOCATE AND ORDER DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS AMONGST PLAINTIFFS AND COMPENSATION FOR SPECIAL MASTER SERVICES 418 .(Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 415 Stipulation to Retain Jurisdiction over Distribution of Settlement Funds (with Judicial signature). (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/21/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER, Motions terminated: 401 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Removal of Case from Trial Calendar filed by City and County of San Francisco. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/3/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER RE: STANDING OF PLAINTIFFS 393 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 379 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER RE: PARTIES' BILLS OF COSTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER RE FILING OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT re 307 Letter filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/23/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN DEFENDANT'S FAVOR ON CLAIMS OF GENDER DISCRIMINATION re 301 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice upon settlement. Within 90 days from the date hereof, that settlement has not in fact occurred, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this cause shall worthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE DATES (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL. Trial is reset for 6/28/10. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' RETALIATION CLAIMS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER CLARIFYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS re 177 , 192 , 201 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO EXCLUDE RIC ZAYAS AS WITNESS AND STRIKE ZAYAS DECLARATION(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER allowing oversize brief re 251 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting re 171 MOTION permission to file oversize brief MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/13/10. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting leave to seal re 174 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER PERMITTING EXTENSION ON DATES FOR COMMENCING DEPOSITIONS OF EXPERT WITNESSEs (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER to permit filing (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR FURTHER DEPOSITION OF CAPTAIN PECOT[Docket No. 148] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER permitting extension on Disclosure of Expert Witnesses and Exchange of Reports (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER TO DISCLOSE EXTENT OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL'S REPRESENTATION[Docket No. 142] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY REQUESTS[Docket Nos. 133, 136, 138] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER re: 3rd amended and consolidated complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING OF SUBSEQUENTLY FILED CASES : 08-2406, 09-2652 are administratively closed. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER extending deadlines (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR INSPECTION and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO COMPEL FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION re 116 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE AND FOR A MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT re 6 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER dismissing Davis-Zehmer (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER dismissing Curley (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Ortega v. City and County of San Francisco, C-09-2652 MMC, is referred to the Honorable Susan Illston for consideration of whether the case is related to Ambat v. City and County of San Francisco, 07-3622 SI. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 7, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER re:Dismissal as to Michael Zehner (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER dismissing pltf. Marc Nuti (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF JEREMY DE JESUS. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/28/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/23/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Further Settlement Conference set for 6/10/2009 10:00 PM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/30/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER dismissing pltf. Kenneth Tan. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/16/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER dismissing Pltf. Mercy Ambat re 72 . Signed by Judge Illston on 2/17/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Settlement Conference Rescheduled for 3/17/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 2/12/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 68 Case Management Conference - Initial,,,, Motion Hearing,,, Settlement Conference set for 3/6/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/5/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER consolidating cases re 35 . Signed by Judge Illston on 10/14/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambat et al v. City & County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercy Ambat
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zainabu Anderson
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Arita
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Carter
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Castillo
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Crotty
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tequisha Curley
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Davis-Zehner
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marla Denzer
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti Flynn
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Fox
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Gray
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tori Jackson
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Janssen
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jones
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lee
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Maclin-Gibson
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sukhwant Mann
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Martin
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Medrano
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Nuti
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin O'Shea
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Peppers
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Quock
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Rodgers-Wells
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Slocum
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Smith
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonyette Smith-Al Ghani
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattie Spires-Morgan
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Tan
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anjie Versher
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Westlin
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Williams
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Zanie
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Zehner
Represented By: Noah W. Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Arata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ruppenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johna Pecot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?