Toschi et al v. County of San Mateo et al
Plaintiff: Michael Toschi and Tracy Toschi
Defendant: County of San Mateo, Don Dallimonti, Rhonda Dallimonti, Neil Cullen, Brian Lee and David Weidner
Case Number: 3:2007cv03625
Filed: July 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. The pretrial conference currently scheduled for May 7, 2009 is continued to July 21, 2009 at 3:00 p.m., and the trial currently scheduled to begin May 11, 2009 is continued to August 3, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 29, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The Pretrial Conference is continued to May 7, 2009 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 23, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER DENYING re 276 Letter filed by Rhonda Dallimonti, Don Dallimonti for Don Dallimonti to appear by phone for the settlement conference on 4/23/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/21/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAPORTE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ORDER SANCTIONING PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 14, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DALLIMONTI DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 13, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Settlement Conference set for 4/2/2009 at 9:30 AM. Updated confidential settlement conference statements shall be lodged with the Court by 3/26/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/6/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR LEAVE OF THE COURT TO CONSIDER PLAINTIFFS' LATE-FILED PAPERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 26, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER DIRECTING COUNTY DEFENDANTS TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 25, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT RHONDA DALLIMONTI. The hearing is continued to March 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 12, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAPORTE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER SANCTIONING DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 21, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendants shall disclose their rebuttal expert on the issue of damages no later than December 5, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 88 Motion to Compel; denying 93 Motion to Compel (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER AFFORDING DEFENDANTS OPPORTUNITY TO SUPPLEMENT REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Any such supplement to defendants' reply shall be filed no later than December 1, 2008, and shall not exceed five pages in length, independent of any declarations and/or exhibits. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 25, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AS TO BRIAN LEE AND NEIL CULLEN. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 8, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' SEPTEMBER 25, 2008 LETTER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 29, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 5, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toschi et al v. County of San Mateo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Toschi
Represented By: Lizabeth N. de Vries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Toschi
Represented By: Lizabeth N. de Vries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Dallimonti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Dallimonti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Weidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?