McHugh v. Hillerich & Bradsby Company
Plaintiff: Mark L. McHugh
Defendant: Hillerich & Bradsby Company
Case Number: 3:2007cv03677
Filed: July 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER GRANTING 178 Stipulation Granting Extension of Time to Appeal Order Denying Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 6, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER GRANTING 166 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 4, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER SETTIING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/1/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING re 159 Stipulation, filed by Hillerich & Bradsby Company. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 09/14/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 134 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Hillerich & Bradsby Company. Oppositions due by 7/2/2010. Replies due by 7/14/2010. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 06/09/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING 131 Stipulation TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR HILLERICH & BRADSBY CO.'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/29/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING 125 Stipulation TO EXTEND PERIOD FOR HILLERICH & BRADSBY CO. TO SEEK ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/8/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING 121 Stipulation to Extend Time to Seek Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 9, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING 90 MOTION to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 24, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 73 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 76 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 75 Motion to Seal Document; GRANTING 82 Motion to Seal Document; GRANTING 90 Motion to Seal Document. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/9/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING 98 MOTION to Bring Equipment into Federal Courthouse for MSJ Hearing filed by Mark L. McHugh. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING 92 Stipulation TO CLARIFY PAGE LIMITATION FOR HILLERICH & BRADSBY COMPANY'S REPLY TO MARK L. McHUGH'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATI ON OF LACHES AND WILLFULNESS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/22/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING 85 Stipulation TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITATION FOR PLAINTIFF MARK L. MCHUGHS OPPOSITION TO H&BS CROSS-MOTION OF NONINFRINGEMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF LACHES AND WILFULNESS AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INF RINGEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/14/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING 83 Stipulation to File Extended Brief. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 1, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING 70 Stipulation Modifying Schedule for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 7, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re: Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/4/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 55 Stipulation Modifying Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 7, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 31, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 50 Administrative Request to Bring Into the Federal Courthouse Certain Equipment and Materials for Purposes of Claim Construction Hearing. Set-up of equipment shall be at 1:15 p.m. on OCtober 28, 2008.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING 43 Stipulation TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITATION FOR HILLERICH & BRADSBY COMPANY'S RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/24/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference continued to 3/21/2008 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/4/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McHugh v. Hillerich & Bradsby Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark L. McHugh
Represented By: Robert J. Yorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillerich & Bradsby Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?