Lynch v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ulett Lynch
Defendant: Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, G.D. Searle, L.L.C., Mary Katriadakis and Susan Adamo
Case Number: 3:2007cv03745
Filed: July 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying (32) Motion for reinstatement of case in 3:07-cv-03745-CRB (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying motion to reinstate case. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on April 29, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010) Modified on 4/30/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re (24 in 3:07-cv-03745-CRB) Stipulation filed by Pfizer Inc., (3305 in M:05-cv-01699-CRB) Stipulation filed by Pfizer Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to (24 in 3:07-cv-03745-CRB) Stipulation, (3305 in M:05-cv-01699-CRB) Stipulation. Responses due by 3/12/2010. Replies due by 3/26/2010. Application to Reinstate Hearing set for 4/23/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/23/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/25/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
August 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re 3 Stipulation filed by G.D. Searle, L.L.C., Pharmacia Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Susan Adamo and Mary Katriadakis terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/08/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ulett Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Kelly R. Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Kelly R. Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.D. Searle, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kelly R. Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Katriadakis
Represented By: Kelly R. Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Adamo
Represented By: Kelly R. Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?