Hostway Corporation v. IAC Search & Media, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Hostway Corporation alleged that defendant IAC Search & Media, Inc. purported to terminate the parties' Advertising Services and Search Services Syndication Agreement without cause, and only five months into the contracts' two-year term.

Plaintiff: Hostway Corporation
Defendant: IAC Search & Media, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv03759
Filed: July 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2007 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) by Hostway Corporation (Towle, Charles) (Filed on 8/8/2007)
August 3, 2007 Filing 27 REDACATED Declaration of Namit Merchant in Support of 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Redacted filed byHostway Corporation. (Related document(s) 4 ) (Towle, Charles) (Filed on 8/3/2007) Modified on 8/6/2007 (klh, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2007 Filing 26 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing NOT held on 7/27/2007 before Joseph C. Spero re 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Hostway Corporation. Motion hearing continued to 8/1/7 at 1:30 PM. (Tape #Not Recorded.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/30/2007)
July 30, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Motion Hearing continued to 8/1/2007 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007)
July 26, 2007 Filing 25 Declaration of Dmitriv Ryaboy in Support of 13 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Temprary Restraining Order filed byIAC Search & Media, Inc. ***FILED UNDER SEAL*** (Related document(s) 13 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 26, 2007 Filing 24 Declaration of Namit Merchant in Support of 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Supplemental Declaration filed byHostway Corporation. (Related document(s) 4 ) (Towle, Charles) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 26, 2007 Filing 23 Declaration of John Han-Joo Lee in Support of 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byHostway Corporation. (Related document(s) 4 ) (Towle, Charles) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 7/26/7, Granting 18 Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 25, 2007 Filing 21 Proposed Order Granting 18 Defendant IAC Search & Media, Inc.'s Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5 to File Documents Under Seal by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Hendricks, Douglas) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 20 Declaration of Douglas L. Hendricks in Support of 18 Defendant IAC Search & Media, Inc.'s Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5 To File Documents Under Seal filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Hendricks, Douglas) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 19 Declaration of Andrew Moers in Support of 18 IAC Search & Media, Inc.'s Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5 to File Documents Under Seal filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Hendricks, Douglas) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 18 MOTION to Seal Declaration of Dmitriy Ryaboy in Support of Defendant IAC Search & Media, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Temporary Restraining Order filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2007 03:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Hendricks, Douglas) (Filed on 7/25/2007)
July 25, 2007 Filing 17 Declaration of Dmitriy Ryaboy in Support of 13 Defendant IAC Search & Media, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Temporary Restraining Order FILED UNDER SEAL filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Hendricks, Douglas) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 16 Declaration of Scott Hayashida in Support of 13 Defendant IAC Search & Media, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Temporary Restraining Order filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Hayashida Decl# 2 Exhibit B to Hayashida Decl# 3 Exhibit C to Hayashida.pdf)(Hendricks, Douglas) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING of Declaration of Dmitriy Ryaboy in Support of 13 Defendant IAC Search & Media, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Temporary Restraining Order filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Hendricks, Douglas) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 14 Declaration of Andrew Moers in Support of 13 IAC Search & Media, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Temporary Restraining Order filed byIAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-1 to Moers Decl# 2 Exhibit 1-2 to Moers# 3 Exhibit 1-3 to Moers Decl# 4 Exhibit 1-4 to Moers Decl# 5 Exhibit 1-5 to Moers Decl# 6 Exhibit 1-6 to Moers Decl# 7 Exhibit 2 to Moers Decl# 8 Exhibit 3 to Moers Decl# 9 Exhibit 4 to Moers Decl# 10 Exhibit 5 to Moers Decl# 11 Exhibit 6 to Moers Decl)(Hendricks, Douglas) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition to 4 Plaintiff's Temporary Restraining Order filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Hendricks, Douglas) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 7/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 12 AMENDED Minute Entry: Scheduling Conference held on 7/24/7 before Mag. Judge Joseph C. Spero re: Pla's Motion for TRO.**Minutes amended that Dft has agreed to maintain the status quo until after the TRO hearing*** (Tape #Not Recorded.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/25/2007)
July 24, 2007 Filing 11 Minute Entry: Scheduling Conference Re: Pla's Motion for TRO, held on 7/27/7 before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Hearing on the Motion for TRO is set for 7/27/7 at 3:30 PM. Opposition due by 7/25/7 by 3:00 PM. (Date Filed: 7/24/2007). (Tape #Not Recorded.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/24/2007)
July 24, 2007 Filing 10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by IAC Search & Media, Inc... (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 24, 2007 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT IAC SEARCH & MEDIAREGARDING CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Dft shallelectronically file a consent or declination form by NOON on July 24, 2007 . (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 24, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Opposition due by 7/25/2007 by 3:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2007 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 23, 2007 Filing 28 EXHIBIT 1 re 1 Complaint filed by Hostway Corporation. ***FILED UNDER SEAL*** (Related document(s) 1 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas L. Hendricks for Defendant IAC Search & Media, Inc. (Hendricks, Douglas) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Filing 7 Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause by Hostway Corporation. (Towle, Charles) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Filing 6 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hostway Corporation.. (Towle, Charles) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Filing 5 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Declaration of Namit Merchant in Support of 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byHostway Corporation. (Related document(s) 4 ) (Towle, Charles) (Filed on 7/23/2007) Modified on 8/2/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2007 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Hostway Corporation. (Towle, Charles) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Hostway Corporation (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2007. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2007 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order for Judge Spero)(sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IAC Search & Media, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611008640; summons issued). Filed by Hostway Corporation. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2007 Summons Issued as to IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hostway Corporation v. IAC Search & Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hostway Corporation
Represented By: Charles Griffith Towle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAC Search & Media, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas L. Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?