Walker v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: David Walker
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan
Case Number: 3:2007cv03772
Filed: July 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2009 Filing 82 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 7, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
April 6, 2009 Filing 81 STIPULATION re #79 Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] FORM OF JUDGMENT by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 6, 2009 Filing 80 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/2/09, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, CRR, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2009. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF PENDING RESOLUTION (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 78 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan OF PENDING RESOLUTION OF LITIGATION (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 2, 2009 Filing 83 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/2/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/2/2009) re #70 MOTION for Protective Order with Regard to February 6, 2009, Order or, in the Alternative, for Certification Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and Stay of Proceedings filed by Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/2/2009)
April 1, 2009 Filing 77 Declaration of Laura Sullivan in Support of #70 MOTION for Protective Order with Regard to February 6, 2009, Order or, in the Alternative, for Certification Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and Stay of Proceedings MOTION for Protective Order with Regard to February 6, 2009, Order or, in the Alternative, for Certification Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and Stay of Proceedings (Re Identification of Claims Referred to Network Medical Review for Independent Physician Consultant Review) filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #70 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RE APRIL 2 HEARING (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 75 Reply Memorandum re #70 MOTION for Protective Order with Regard to February 6, 2009, Order or, in the Alternative, for Certification Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and Stay of Proceedings MOTION for Protective Order with Regard to February 6, 2009, Order or, in the Alternative, for Certification Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and Stay of Proceedings filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 74 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order with Regard to February 6, 2009 Order Or, In The Alternative For Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) and Stay of Proceedings filed byDavid Walker. (Kantor, Glenn) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE OPPOSITION AND REPLY DUE DATES (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 9, 2009 Filing 72 STIPULATION re #70 MOTION for Protective Order with Regard to February 6, 2009, Order or, in the Alternative, for Certification Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and Stay of Proceedings MOTION for Protective Order with Regard to February 6, 2009, Order or, in the Alternative, for Certification Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and Stay of Proceedings to continue deadlines by David Walker. (Kantor, Glenn) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
February 23, 2009 Filing 71 Declaration of Laura Sullivan in Support of #70 MOTION for Protective Order with Regard to February 6, 2009, Order or, in the Alternative, for Certification Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and Stay of Proceedings MOTION for Protective Order with Regard to February 6, 2009, Order or, in the Alternative, for Certification Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and Stay of Proceedings filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #70 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 23, 2009 Filing 70 MOTION for Protective Order #70 with Regard to February 6, 2009, Order or, in the Alternative, for Certification Pursuant to 28 USC 1292(b) and Stay of Proceedings filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/23/2009) Modified on 3/16/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED ORDER RE DISCOVERY; ORDER RE COSTS THEREFOR (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 68 Proposed Order AFTER HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' PROTECTIVE ORDER MOTION MODIFYING COURT'S PRIOR DISCOVERY ORDER by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 67 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 1/29/2009) re #53 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/29/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 66 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/28/09, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2009. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 65 CLERKS NOTICE Reschedulign Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 64 Request for Judicial Notice re #57 Memorandum in Opposition filed byDavid Walker. (Related document(s) #57 ) (Green, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 63 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing Time. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE JANUARY 22, 2009, HEARING (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 9, 2009 Filing 61 STIPULATION re #53 MOTION for Protective Order to Continue the January 22, 2009 Hearing Date by David Walker. (Kantor, Glenn) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
January 8, 2009 Filing 60 Declaration of John Dieguez in Support of #53 MOTION for Protective Order filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 8, 2009 Filing 59 Reply to Opposition re #53 MOTION for Protective Order filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 58 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Rebecca A. Hull (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 31, 2008 Filing 57 Memorandum in Opposition re #53 MOTION for Protective Order filed byDavid Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth K. Green)(Green, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/31/2008)
December 12, 2008 Filing 56 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/30/2008, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number 415 531 6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2009. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 12, 2008 Filing 55 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/30/2008, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number 415 531 6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2009. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 10, 2008 Filing 54 Declaration of Laura Sullivan in Support of #52 Declaration in Support, #53 MOTION for Protective Order filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #52 , #53 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 10, 2008 Filing 53 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 10, 2008 Filing 52 Declaration of Rebecca A. Hull #53 in Support of Motion of Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan for a Protective Order filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/10/2008) Modified on 12/11/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORY TO DEFENDANT METLIFE by Judge William Alsup [denying #40 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #41 Motion for Summary Judgment]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
October 30, 2008 Filing 50 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/30/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/30/2008) re #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Walker. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/30/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 49 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2008 02:00 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 48 Reply Memorandum re #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan's Renewed Notice and Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 47 Reply to Opposition re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byDavid Walker. (Green, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 2, 2008 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Rebecca A. Hull #45 In support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/2/2008) Modified on 10/3/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2008 Filing 45 Memorandum in Opposition re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
October 2, 2008 Filing 44 Memorandum in Opposition re #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan's Renewed Notice and Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byDavid Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth K. Green In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment)(Green, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
September 18, 2008 Filing 43 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 18, 2008 Filing 42 Declaration of Rebecca A. Hull in Support of #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan's Renewed Notice and Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #41 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 18, 2008 Filing 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan's Renewed Notice and Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 18, 2008 Filing 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David Walker. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH K. GREEN, #2 PROPOSED ORDER)(Green, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RESETTING DEADLINES FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 30, 2008. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2008)
June 27, 2008 Filing 38 NOTICE by David Walker re #36 Order (Green, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
May 9, 2008 Filing 37 NOTICE by David Walker of Association of Counsel, Robert F. Keehn (Green, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART JOINT REQUEST TO STAY DISCOVERY AND MOTION BRIEFING DATES. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 29, 2008. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008)
April 28, 2008 Filing 35 STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND MOTION BRIEFING DATES; AND PROPOSED ORDER by David Walker. (Green, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/28/2008)
March 11, 2008 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 02/13/08 before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING LIMITED DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 14, 2008. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 32 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 2/13/2008) re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. The case management conference set for 2/28/08 is VACATED. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
January 30, 2008 Filing 30 Reply Memorandum #23 in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/30/2008) Modified on 1/31/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2008 Filing 29 Memorandum in Opposition #23 to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byDavid Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth K. Green In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Green, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/24/2008) Modified on 1/25/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2008 Filing 28 EXHIBIT A re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment ;Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan's Notice and Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #23 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2008)
January 10, 2008 Filing 27 Proposed Order #23 Re Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/10/2008) Modified on 1/14/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2008 Filing 26 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan of Filing Administrative Record Re Motion For Summary Judgment (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/10/2008)
January 10, 2008 Filing 25 Declaration of Maria Goschy in Support of #24 Declaration in Support, #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment ;Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan's Notice and Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Maria Goschy In Support of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Related document(s) #24 , #23 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/10/2008)
January 10, 2008 Filing 24 Declaration of Joanne Carroll #23 In Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/10/2008) Modified on 1/14/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2008 Filing 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment ;Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan's Notice and Motion For Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/10/2008)
November 9, 2007 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Address by Glenn R Kantor (Kantor, Glenn) (Filed on 11/9/2007)
November 8, 2007 Filing 22 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/8/2007 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/8/2007). Defendant shall file admn record and msj by 1/10/08. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/8/2007)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2008 11:00 AM. Motions due by 1/10/2008. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/8/2007. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
November 1, 2007 Filing 19 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Keller, Christopher) (Filed on 11/1/2007)
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO ATTEND CASE MANAGEMENT BY TELEPHONE re [ #17 Proposed Order filed by David Walker]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/30/2007. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
October 29, 2007 Filing 17 Proposed Order Granting telephonic appearance at Initial Case Management Conference by David Walker. (Kantor, Glenn) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #15 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/9/07. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007)
October 15, 2007 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference on Reassignment set for 11/8/2007 03:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2007. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007) Modified on 10/15/2007 (dt, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Wayne D. Brazil no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on October 10, 2007. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 12 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Keller, Christopher) (Filed on 10/9/2007) Modified on 10/10/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2007 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE by David Walker. (Kantor, Glenn) (Filed on 10/9/2007) Modified on 10/10/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2007 Filing 10 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by David Walker (Kantor, Glenn) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 9 Plaintiff's CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Walker. (Kantor, Glenn) (Filed on 10/9/2007) Modified on 10/10/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2007 Filing 8 Defendant's Certificate of Interested Entities by Rebecca A. Hull (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/4/2007) Modified on 9/5/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2007 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
August 22, 2007 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Keller, Christopher) (Filed on 8/22/2007) Modified on 8/23/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2007 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File Docket Nos. 1 and 3. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2007)
August 6, 2007 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by David Walker. (Kantor, Glenn) (Filed on 8/6/2007) Modified on 8/7/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Filing 3 Notice of Interested Parties by David Walker (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2007 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2007. Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2007 04:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan (Filing fee $350, receipt number 34611008672). Filed byDavid Walker. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2007 (cjl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher James Keller
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Flexible Benefits Plan
Represented By: Christopher James Keller
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Walker
Represented By: Lisa Sue Kantor
Represented By: Robert F Keehn
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Represented By: Elizabeth Katherine Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?