Obiajulu v. San Mateo County Probation Department
Plaintiff: Vincent Obiajulu
Defendant: San Mateo County Probation Department
Case Number: 3:2007cv03870
Filed: July 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/14/2008. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE CMC from October 10, 2008 to November 14 2008 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Hon. Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/8/2008. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting re 47 Stipulation to Postpone Dispositive Motions hearing filed by Vincent Obiajulu Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/2/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting re 42 Stipulation to Reschedule CMC filed by San Mateo County Probation Department Further Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2008 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/8/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obiajulu v. San Mateo County Probation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Obiajulu
Represented By: Lawrence J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo County Probation Department
Represented By: Claire Ann Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?