Aircraft Technical Publishers, Inc. v. Avantext, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aircraft Technical Publishers, Inc.
Defendant: Avantext, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv04154
Filed: October 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Laeson on 12/16/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 STIPULATION AND ORDER AND CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. The Trial will go before Magistrate Judge James Larson and Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/30/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009) Modified on 12/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 151 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 225 Motion to Strike (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 245 Motion to Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG DENYING as moot 149 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; GRANTING 163 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and to Dismiss Counterclaims. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009) Modified on 11/17/2009 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting in part and denying in part 100 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claim Construction; granting in part and denying in part 106 Plaintiff's Cross- Motion for Partial Summary Jud gment regarding Claim Construction; striking 110 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Laches Affirmative Defenses is STRICKEN and DENIED AS MOOT.This Order terminates docket nos. 100, 106 and 110. The Clerk shall STRIKE Docket nos. 110, 111 and 112 from the record. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT 226 *** ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 156 Motion to Seal Versions of the Reply and Exhibits 2 and 3. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/22/09 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009) Modified on 10/26/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/6/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 195 Motion to Seal Opposition and Declaration (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009) Modified on 10/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING 103 Motion to Advance Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment. The hearing re 68 Amended Motion to Enlarge Time to Submit Infringement Contentions and 100 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claim Construction will take place on 06/23/09 at 1:00 PM. The Claim Construction hearing set for 06/03/09 is VACATED (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009) Modified on 4/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG withdrawing 67 Motion to Amend/Correct; withdrawing 68 Motion; withdrawing 81 Motion for Sanctions (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008) Modified on 10/27/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/23/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008) Modified on 9/24/2008 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/22/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aircraft Technical Publishers, Inc. v. Avantext, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aircraft Technical Publishers, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Laurie D'Ambra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avantext, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Laurie D'Ambra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?