Bautista-Perez et al v. Gonzales et al
Plaintiff: Jose Bautista-Perez, Oscar Guardado-Gonzalez, Denis Caballero-Espinoza, Jose Alvarado-Menjivar, Oscar Rene Ramos, Maria Salazar, Jose Benjamin Quinteros and Maria Josefa Cruz
Defendant: Alberto R. Gonzales and Michael Chertoff
Case Number: 3:2007cv04192
Filed: August 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER dismissing case. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/5/10. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 145 Motion to Dismiss (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER re Hearing on 145 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/15/10. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 114 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 121 Motion for Summary Judgment. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 CORRECTED ORDER granting motion for leave to file surreply. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/13/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting briefing schedule and continuing the motion hearing date to 11/23/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/16/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: motion schedule. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/31/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 98 Motion to Certify Class. tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER re-setting the hearing on the Motion for Class Certification and Bifurcation to 6/29/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/11/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 102 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Continuing Hearing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on February 24, 2009. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on January 27, 2009. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding class certification motion schedule. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/18/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding discovery and motion schedule. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/08/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Denying 49 Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer Venue. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bautista-Perez et al v. Gonzales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Bautista-Perez
Represented By: Jonathan Myles Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Guardado-Gonzalez
Represented By: Jonathan Myles Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis Caballero-Espinoza
Represented By: Jonathan Myles Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alvarado-Menjivar
Represented By: Jonathan Myles Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Rene Ramos
Represented By: Jonathan Myles Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Salazar
Represented By: Jonathan Myles Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Benjamin Quinteros
Represented By: Jonathan Myles Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Josefa Cruz
Represented By: Jonathan Myles Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto R. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Chertoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?