Pacheco v. Estrella
Plaintiff: Arturo Pacheco
Defendant: Robert Estrella
Case Number: 3:2007cv04415
Filed: August 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/9/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/10/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING 25 Order to Show Cause, ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/24/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/26/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 2/19/2009. ORDER VACATING HEARING RE: PLAINTIFF'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/10/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CORRECTING DISPOSITIVE MOTION FILING DEADLINE re 20 Case Management Scheduling Order,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/31/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacheco v. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?