Rohnert Park Citizens to Enforce CEQA v. California Department of Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Rohnert Park Citizens to Enforce CEQA
Defendant: California Department of Transportation, United States Department of Transportation and Federal Highway Administration
Case Number: 3:2007cv04607
Filed: September 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Setting schedule and hearing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on May 14, 2009. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 44 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 47 Defendants' Motion to Strike. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/14/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 9/26/08. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rohnert Park Citizens to Enforce CEQA v. California Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rohnert Park Citizens to Enforce CEQA
Represented By: Rose M. Zoia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?