Edwards et al v. Reynolds et al
Plaintiff: Randall L. Edwards and Betty Sue Edwards
Defendant: Michael J. Reynolds, Betsy Strauss and City of Santa Rosa
Case Number: 3:2007cv04710
Filed: September 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 AMENDED JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES. Defendants are awarded the sum of $9100. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 10, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES; VACATING MAY 15, 2009 HEARING. No later than May 29, 2009, plaintiffs shall file and serve on counsel for defendants any su pplemental opposition to defendants' motion for an award of fees. No later than June 12, 2009, defendants shall file any supplemental reply. As of June 12, 2009, the Court will take the matter under submission, unless the parties are otherwise advised. The hearing scheduled for May 15, 2009 is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 8, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' PETITION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 28, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of City of Santa Rosa, Betsy Strauss, Michael J. Reynolds against Betty Sue Edwards, Randall L. Edwards. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is hereby GRANTED. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 18, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; VACATING DECEMBER 1, 2009 ORDER; SETTING ASIDE JUDGMENT; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING AS PREMATURE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES; V ACATING FEBRUARY 13, 2009 HEARING. The Court's December 1, 2008 order granting defendants' motion for summary judgment is vacated, and the judgment entered on December 1, 2008 is set aside. No later than February 27, 2009, plaintiffs shall file their opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment; no later than March 13, 2009, defendants shall file a reply to plaintiffs' opposition. A hearing on defendants' motion for summary judgment will be conducted on April 3, 2009, at 9:00 a.m. Defendants' Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees is hereby denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 5, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; VACATING JANUARY 23, 2009 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. No later than January 9, 2009, defendants shall file and serve any opposition to plaintiffs' motion. No later than January 23, 2009, plaintiffs shall file and serve any reply to defendants' opposition. Plaintiffs' motion is scheduled for hearing on February 13, 2009, at 9:00 a.m.Further, the Janu ary 23, 2009 hearing on defendants' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees is vacated, and will be rescheduled by the Court, if necessary, after plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration has been resolved. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 19, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 JUDGMENT: Defendants' motion for summary judgment is hereby GRANTED, ***Civil Case Terminated. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING EXTENSION OF TIME.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/3/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards et al v. Reynolds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall L. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Sue Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?