Wistron Corporation v. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Plaintiff: Wistron Corporation
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2007cv04748
Filed: September 14, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 266 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 265 filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. All claims and counterclaims in this action brought by Wistron against Samsung or by Samsung against Wistron are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees in connection with these claims and counterclaims. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/6/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 256 STIPULATION AND ORDER re [doc #253]. Pursuant to the Parties' Stipulation, IT IS SO ORDERED THAT the last day to serve final infringement contentions is moved from 12/29/2008 to 1/16/2009, and the last day to serve final invalidity contentions is moved from 1/19/2009 to 2/6/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/22/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 252 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 251 Pursuant to Stipulation, It is Ordered that the hearing date in this matter set for 12/18/2008 is moved to 1/22/2009 at 2:30 PM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/15/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008) .
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER re Claim Construction(vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying modification to pretrial schedule.(vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION AND ORDER to allow delivery on 9/16/2008 the parties required equipment for use during the Markman hearing on 9/17/2008 re 136 Stipulation filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/12/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wistron Corporation v. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wistron Corporation
Represented By: Timothy Paar Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?