Sample v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Arthur T. Sample
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2007cv04814
Filed: September 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White ADOPTING 41 Report and Recommendations and GRANTING 35 Motion for Attorney Fees. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees 35 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/2/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING 23 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs TO A RANDOMLY ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/27/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 30, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sample v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur T. Sample
Represented By: Betty Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?